JONES v. FACEBOOK
Plaintiff: FREDERICK D. JONES, JR.
Defendant: FACEBOOK
Case Number: 4:2020cv00133
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 58 - For the reasons set forth in the Courts Order entered this day, the Court now enters FINAL JUDGMENT against Plaintiff and in favor of Defendant, such that Plaintiff shall take nothing by way of his Complaint. Plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/11/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
August 11, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY - The Court DISMISSES this case without prejudice and final judgment will now issue dismissing this matter (See Entry). Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 8/11/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list).(TMC)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - Mr. Jones shall have through July 10, 2020, in which to either pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action or demonstrate that he lacks the financial ability to do so by submitting an affidavit setting forth the income and assets he possesses, indicating that he is unable to prepay the fee, and stating his belief that he is entitled to redress. Should Mr. Jones seek leave to proceed without prepaying the filing fee, he shall use the form attached to this Order. Additionally, the Clerk is DIRECTED to seal the Complaint, [Filing No. 1], because it contains personal identifiers. Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 6/19/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (Attachments: #1 Blank Form)(TMC)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (REO)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FACEBOOK, filed by FREDERICK D. JONES, JR. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(REO) Modified on 6/19/2020 to seal per #3 (TMC).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JONES v. FACEBOOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FACEBOOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FREDERICK D. JONES, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?