POHLE v. PENCE et al
Plaintiff: DANIEL L. POHLE
Defendant: JOHN G ROBERTS, JOE BIDEN, JOHN BRENNAN, BARACK OBAMA, JOSHUA MINKLER, MIKE PENCE, ROBERT MUELLER, JAMES COMEY, HILLARY CLINTON, JOHN KERRY, Six Unknown Named Agents of the United States Federal Government, CHRISTOPHER WRAY and JOHN G. ROBERTS
Case Number: 4:2020cv00139
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Sarah Evans Barker
Referring Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Change Venue , filed by Defendant MIKE PENCE. (Findley, Bryan)
August 5, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Change Venue , filed by Defendant JOSHUA MINKLER. (Shields, Gina)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 Submission of Proposed Summons, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL L. POHLE. (TMC)
July 30, 2020 Filing 16 Correspondence REQUESTING COPY of Case Docket Sheet, filed by Daniel Pohle. Copy provided via US Mail. (Attachments: #1 Public Docket Sheet, #2 Envelope) (TMC)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - #13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to September 2, 2020, to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 7/28/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Change Venue, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL L. POHLE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to September 2, 2020, to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant JOSHUA MINKLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Pending Litigation, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL L. POHLE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (LBT)
July 14, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Recognize Service, filed by Defendant JOSHUA MINKLER. (Shields, Gina)
July 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Court to Recognize Service to All Defendants, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL L. POHLE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(TMC)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Proceed to Trial by Jury, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL L. POHLE. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LBT)
June 29, 2020 Filing 10 Submission of State Court Record from Jennings County Superior Court Clerk in case number 44D01-1910-MI-82. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(LBT)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - #4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to August 3, 2020, to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 6/24/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR***MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC) Modified on 6/22/2020 to edit text(TMC).
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 First MOTION for Extension of Time to August 3, 2020, to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant JOSHUA MINKLER. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shields, Gina)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Pending Motion, filed by Defendant JOSHUA MINKLER (Shields, Gina)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gina M. Shields on behalf of Defendant JOSHUA MINKLER. (Shields, Gina)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Jennings Superior Court, case number 40D01-1910-MI-000082, filed by JOSHUA MINKLER. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record (Complaint, Summons, Notice of Disqualification, Motion to Disimss, Various Other Motions, Amended Complaints, Various Summonses and Return Receipts), #2 Exhibit - Operative Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shields, Gina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POHLE v. PENCE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN G ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE BIDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN BRENNAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BARACK OBAMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSHUA MINKLER
Represented By: Gina M. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE PENCE
Represented By: Archer Riddick Randall Rose
Represented By: Bryan Findley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT MUELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES COMEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HILLARY CLINTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN KERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Six Unknown Named Agents of the United States Federal Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHRISTOPHER WRAY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN G. ROBERTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL L. POHLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?