JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. SMITH et al
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Defendant: MAIN STREET BAR N GRILL LLC, LENA MARIE SMITH and MAIN STREET BAR N GRILL LLC doing business as MAIN STREET BAR N GRILL
Case Number: 4:2020cv00179
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MAIN STREET BAR N GRILL LLC, LENA MARIE SMITH. (TMC)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - #2 Motion to Appear pro hac vice is granted. Ryan R. Janis for JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. added. The court FURTHER ORDERS that Ryan R. Janis register as a user of the courts electronic case filing system by September 1, 2020. Failure to register could result in the revocation of his admission pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 8/18/2020 (Copy mailed per distribution list). (TMC)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Initial Filing in lawsuit sent to Register of Copyrights. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 PHV Motion) (TMC) Modified on 8/20/2020 to replace document and correct document description (TMC). (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/20/2020) (TMC). Modified on 8/21/2020 to edit document description (TMC).
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney(s) Ryan R. Janis to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100.00, receipt number IP070348), filed by Plaintiff JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope). (AKH)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAIN STREET BAR N GRILL LLC, LENA MARIE SMITH, filed by JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number IP070348) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope). (AKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC. v. SMITH et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAIN STREET BAR N GRILL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LENA MARIE SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAIN STREET BAR N GRILL LLC doing business as MAIN STREET BAR N GRILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOE HAND PROMOTIONS, INC.
Represented By: Mark D. Janis
Represented By: Ryan R. Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?