KENTUCKY LODGE NO. 681, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO v. ANDERSON et al
Plaintiff: KENTUCKY LODGE NO. 681, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO
Defendant: COOK COMPRESSION and DYLAN ANDERSON
Case Number: 4:2021cv00066
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Jane Magnus-Stinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by COOK COMPRESSION identifying GAS EQUIPMENT GROUP, DOVER PUMPS & PROCESS SOLUTIONS SEGMENT, INC., DOVER CORPORATION as corporate parents for COOK COMPRESSION. (Woods, C.) Modified on 5/27/2021 to add party names (TMC).
May 19, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE to File Corporate Disclosure Statement to COOK COMPRESSION. (RAGS) (TMC)
May 18, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Answer of Defendant Cook Compression, A Dover Company, filed by COOK COMPRESSION.(Woods, C.)
May 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Laurence Woods, III on behalf of Defendant COOK COMPRESSION. (Woods, C.)
April 26, 2021 Filing 6 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (TMC)
April 26, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
April 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued by Clerk as to COOK COMPRESSION. (TMC)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KENTUCKY LODGE NO. 681, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO. (Suetholz, David)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David O'Brien Suetholz on behalf of Plaintiff KENTUCKY LODGE NO. 681, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO. (Suetholz, David)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by KENTUCKY LODGE NO. 681, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO. (Filing fee $402, receipt number 0756-6528104) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Suetholz, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENTUCKY LODGE NO. 681, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO v. ANDERSON et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK COMPRESSION
Represented By: C. Laurence Woods, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DYLAN ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENTUCKY LODGE NO. 681, INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF MACHINISTS AND AEROSPACE WORKERS, AFL-CIO
Represented By: David O'Brien Suetholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?