KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC. v. WEISS et al
Plaintiff: KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.
Defendant: MAYOR OF THE CITY ALAN WEISS, CITY COUNCIL MEMBER WALT WILSON, CITY COUNCIL MEMBER KAREN ABBOTT, CITY COUNCIL MEMBER REBECCA BARHORST, CITY COUNCIL MEMBER KURT MOLLAUN, CITY COUNCIL MEMBER BRETT HAMILTON, CITY COUNCIL MEMBER VINCE KARSTETER, CITY COUNCIL MEMBER ERIN MARQUA, CLERK TREASURER MARY JO LYNCH, FORMER MAYOR DOUG HEDRICK, EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR AL ABDON, PRESIDENT OF REDEVEL MIKE MCLAUGHLIN, CODE ENFORMCEMENT JAY MCMULLEN, FORMAL CODE ENFORCEM AL PUTNAM, CITY MANAGER STEVE LAMPERT, ALAN WEISS, WALT WILSON, KAREN ABBOTT, REBECCA BARHORST, KURT MOLLAUN, BRETT HAMILTON, VINCE KARSTETER, ERIN MARQUA, MARY JO LYNCH, DOUG HEDRICK, AL ABDON, MIKE MCLAUGHLIN, JAY MCMULLEN, AL PUTNAM and STEVE LAMPERT
Case Number: 4:2021cv00177
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Debra McVicker Lynch
Referring Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2022 Filing 24 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants KAREN ABBOTT, AL ABDON, REBECCA BARHORST, BRETT HAMILTON, DOUG HEDRICK, VINCE KARSTETER, STEVE LAMPERT, MARY JO LYNCH, ERIN MARQUA, MIKE MCLAUGHLIN, JAY MCMULLEN, KURT MOLLAUN, AL PUTNAM, ALAN WEISS, WALT WILSON. (Beeman, Alex)
January 3, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants KAREN ABBOTT, AL ABDON, REBECCA BARHORST, BRETT HAMILTON, DOUG HEDRICK, VINCE KARSTETER, STEVE LAMPERT, MARY JO LYNCH, ERIN MARQUA, MIKE MCLAUGHLIN, JAY MCMULLEN, KURT MOLLAUN, AL PUTNAM, ALAN WEISS, WALT WILSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 4, 2020 ILP, #2 Exhibit B - August 13, 2020 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - April 26, 2021 Letter)(Beeman, Alex)
December 6, 2021 Filing 22 DEMAND for Trial by Jury, filed by Defendants KAREN ABBOTT, AL ABDON, REBECCA BARHORST, BRETT HAMILTON, DOUG HEDRICK, VINCE KARSTETER, STEVE LAMPERT, MARY JO LYNCH, ERIN MARQUA, MIKE MCLAUGHLIN, JAY MCMULLEN, KURT MOLLAUN, AL PUTNAM, ALAN WEISS, WALT WILSON. (Stephenson, James)
December 6, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by James S. Stephenson on behalf of Defendants KAREN ABBOTT, AL ABDON, REBECCA BARHORST, BRETT HAMILTON, DOUG HEDRICK, VINCE KARSTETER, STEVE LAMPERT, MARY JO LYNCH, ERIN MARQUA, MIKE MCLAUGHLIN, JAY MCMULLEN, KURT MOLLAUN, AL PUTNAM, ALAN WEISS, WALT WILSON. (Stephenson, James)
December 5, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendants KAREN ABBOTT, AL ABDON, REBECCA BARHORST, BRETT HAMILTON, VINCE KARSTETER, STEVE LAMPERT, MARY JO LYNCH, ERIN MARQUA, MIKE MCLAUGHLIN, JAY MCMULLEN, KURT MOLLAUN, ALAN WEISS, WALT WILSON. (Beeman, Alex)
November 24, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex Maurice Beeman on behalf of Defendants KAREN ABBOTT, AL ABDON, REBECCA BARHORST, BRETT HAMILTON, DOUG HEDRICK, VINCE KARSTETER, STEVE LAMPERT, MARY JO LYNCH, ERIN MARQUA, MIKE MCLAUGHLIN, JAY MCMULLEN, KURT MOLLAUN, AL PUTNAM, ALAN WEISS, WALT WILSON. (Beeman, Alex)
November 17, 2021 Filing 18 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. WALT WILSON served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 17 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. ALAN WEISS served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 16 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. KURT MOLLAUN served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 15 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. JAY MCMULLEN served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 14 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. MIKE MCLAUGHLIN served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 13 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. ERIN MARQUA served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 12 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. MARY JO LYNCH served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 11 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. STEVE LAMPERT served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. VINCE KARSTETER served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. BRETT HAMILTON served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. REBECCA BARHORST served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. AL ABDON served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. KAREN ABBOTT served on 11/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service Return)(Massey, C.)
November 12, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TMC)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued by Clerk as to KAREN ABBOTT, AL ABDON, REBECCA BARHORST, BRETT HAMILTON, DOUG HEDRICK, VINCE KARSTETER, STEVE LAMPERT, MARY JO LYNCH, ERIN MARQUA, MIKE MCLAUGHLIN, JAY MCMULLEN, KURT MOLLAUN, AL PUTNAM, ALAN WEISS. (TMC)
November 11, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. (Massey, C.)
November 11, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Ed Massey on behalf of Plaintiff KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. (Massey, C.)
November 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC., filed by KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6836607) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Massey, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC. v. WEISS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETT TRUCK STOP, INC.
Represented By: C. Ed Massey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAYOR OF THE CITY ALAN WEISS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY COUNCIL MEMBER WALT WILSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY COUNCIL MEMBER KAREN ABBOTT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY COUNCIL MEMBER REBECCA BARHORST
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY COUNCIL MEMBER KURT MOLLAUN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY COUNCIL MEMBER BRETT HAMILTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY COUNCIL MEMBER VINCE KARSTETER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY COUNCIL MEMBER ERIN MARQUA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLERK TREASURER MARY JO LYNCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORMER MAYOR DOUG HEDRICK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR AL ABDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRESIDENT OF REDEVEL MIKE MCLAUGHLIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CODE ENFORMCEMENT JAY MCMULLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FORMAL CODE ENFORCEM AL PUTNAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY MANAGER STEVE LAMPERT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN WEISS
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALT WILSON
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN ABBOTT
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REBECCA BARHORST
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KURT MOLLAUN
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRETT HAMILTON
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCE KARSTETER
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIN MARQUA
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARY JO LYNCH
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUG HEDRICK
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AL ABDON
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE MCLAUGHLIN
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAY MCMULLEN
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AL PUTNAM
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVE LAMPERT
Represented By: Alex Maurice Beeman
Represented By: James S. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?