WARE v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC. et al
Plaintiff: VALERIE WARE
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC. and SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv00186
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Kellie M Barr
Referring Judge: M Kendra Klump
2 Judge: Tanya Walton Pratt
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - The Court has been advised by counsel that a settlement has been reached in this action. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences and trial, if any, are VACATED. IT IS ORDERED that on or before July 9, 2024, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 1/11/2024. Copy Sent Via U.S. Mail.(CKM)
January 10, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement and Request to Stay Proceedings, as to Defendants SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC., Plaintiff VALERIE WARE, filed by SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC, SANOFI US SERVICES INC. (Larson, Joel)
December 27, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by William Francis Northrip on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Northrip, William)
December 21, 2023 Filing 21 Submission of Exhibit A: Certification of David B. Franco in support of dkt. #18 , filed by Plaintiff VALERIE WARE. (Morse, John) Modified on 12/21/2023 - Edited docket text to match document (NAD).
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney David B. Franco for VALERIE WARE added. Signed by Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump on 12/21/2023. (SWM)
December 21, 2023 Filing 19 Submission Motion for Pro Hac Vice (D. Franco), filed by Plaintiff VALERIE WARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification)(Morse, John)
December 20, 2023 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney(s) David B. Franco to Appear pro hac vice (AINSDC-7952986 $100.00 paid), filed by Plaintiff VALERIE WARE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Receipt Payment Confirmation)(Morse, John) Modified on 12/21/2023 - Added payment tracking ID to docket text.(NAD).
December 11, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John Joseph Morse on behalf of Plaintiff VALERIE WARE. (Morse, John)
November 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump. Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 4:23-cv-00186-TWP-MKK, on all future filings in this matter. (CCG)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF CASE REASSIGNMENTS: The Court, sua sponte, now orders the above-captioned cases reassigned due to the requirements of workload pursuant to S.D. Ind. L.R. 40-1(f). The Clerk is directed to reassign each case to Magistrate Judge M. Kendra Klump as the referral judge. No presiding judge reassignment shall occur. See Order. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 11/27/2023.(LF)
November 27, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 4:23-cv-186-TWP-TAB, on all future filings in this matter. (CCG)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kellie M. Barr on 11/27/23. (AKW)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Ladene Ivone Mendoza on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Mendoza, Ladene)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Larson, Joel)
November 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr on behalf of Defendants SANOFI US SERVICES INC., SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC. (Larson, Joel)
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (LF)
November 21, 2023 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (LF)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-09582. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSFER ORDER - Case transferred to District of Indiana Southern. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, DOC 16511)(my) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 5 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaufman, Christopher) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (aj) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-7590452) filed by Valerie Ware. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney David Baylis Franco added to party Valerie Ware(pty:pla).(Franco, David) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/21/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WARE v. SANOFI US SERVICES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC.
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US, INC.
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS U.S. LLC
Represented By: Jousef M Shkoukani
Represented By: Joel Thaddeus Larson, Jr.
Represented By: Ladene Ivone Mendoza
Represented By: William Francis Northrip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE WARE
Represented By: David Baylis Franco
Represented By: Damon Joseph Baldone
Represented By: David B. Franco
Represented By: John Joseph Morse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?