Hernandez v. Doordash, Inc.

Plaintiff: Mia Hernandez
Defendant: Doordash, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02158
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Carlos Murguia
2 Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 ***Civil Case Terminated per #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (ydm)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Mia Hernandez (Brown, Charles)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Answer of Doordash, Inc. due on or before 6/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/5/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant Doordash, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (McNamara, Rosalee)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Agreed Second Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. For good cause shown, defendant Doordash, Inc. answer due 6/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 5/15/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant Doordash, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (McNamara, Rosalee)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/25/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time until May 15, 2019, for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 4/25/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
April 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Agreed) by Defendant Doordash, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (McNamara, Rosalee)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Mia Hernandez upon Doordash, Inc. served on 4/3/2019, answer due 4/24/2019 (Brown, Charles)
March 27, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Doordash, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
March 27, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jayson A. Watkins on behalf of Mia Hernandez. (Watkins, Jayson)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Mia Hernandez. (Brown, Charles)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4755872.), filed by Mia Hernandez.(Brown, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Doordash, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Hernandez
Represented By: Jayson A. Watkins
Represented By: Charles Jason Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doordash, Inc.
Represented By: Rosalee Miller McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?