Hastey v. Welch et al
Plaintiff: Dalton Hastey
Defendant: James L. Welch, James E. Hoffman, Robert L. Friedman, Matthew A. Doheny, William R. Davidson, James F. Winestock, Douglas A. Carty, YRC Worldwide Inc., Michael J. Kneeland, Raymond J. Bromark, Stephanie D. Fisher, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, YRC Worldwide, Inc. and Darren D. Hawkins
Case Number: 2:2019cv02266
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY to #62 Response, #61 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey. (Renwick, Karen)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 01/21/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
January 16, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #63 MOTION for Leave to file Reply and Memorandum in Support of Motion . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
January 15, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Leave to file Reply and Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Letter Reply)(Renwick, Karen)
January 14, 2020 Filing 62 RESPONSE to #61 Notice of Supplemental Authority by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, Darren D. Hawkins, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide, Inc.. (Scheiderer, Jason)
January 8, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Dalton Hastey re: MOTION to Stay Case #49 filed by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey, MOTION to Stay Case #37 filed by Defendant YRC Worldwide, Inc. (Renwick, Karen)
January 7, 2020 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #57 MOTION for Order Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
January 6, 2020 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey re #52 MOTION to Dismiss #50 Amended Complaint (Renwick, Karen)
January 6, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Declaration of Karen W. Renwick in Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law In Opposition to YRC Worldwide Inc's and the Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Shareholder Derivative Amended Complaint by Dalton Hastey (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Renwick, Karen)
January 6, 2020 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #57 MOTION for Order Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey(Renwick, Karen)
January 6, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION for Order Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey (Renwick, Karen).
November 12, 2019 Filing 56 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey re: #37 MOTION to Stay Case PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO YRC WORLDWIDE INC.S AND THE INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS CROSS-MOTION TO STAY (Renwick, Karen)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint (Doc. 50) and defendants have filed a Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 52). Plaintiff and defendants also have filed a Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule for this matter (Doc. #51 ). The court grants the parties' joint motion. Plaintiff's opposition to defendants' Motion to Dismiss is due January 6, 2020. Defendants' reply brief is due February 6, 2020. Also, the Amended Complaint moots defendants' pending Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 31, 33 & 35) and defendants' Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule (Doc. 43). The court thus denies as moot but without prejudice to refiling Docs. #31 , #33 , #35 , & #43 . Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 11/07/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mig)
October 30, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #51 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(aw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE to Cross-Motion to Stay, and REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc. re: #37 MOTION to Stay Case. (Scheiderer, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 53 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #52 MOTION to Dismiss #50 Amended Complaint by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc. (Scheiderer, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Dismiss #50 Amended Complaint by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc. (Scheiderer, Jason)
October 29, 2019 Filing 51 Joint MOTION to Set Briefing Schedule by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc. (Scheiderer, Jason) (Motion Referral Removed on 10/30/2019. (mg))
October 25, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #37 MOTION to Stay Case. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
October 15, 2019 Filing 50 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Dalton Hastey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Renwick, Karen)
October 15, 2019 Filing 49 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to #37 YRC Worldwide Inc's MOTION to Stay Case and Plaintiffs' CROSS-MOTION to Stay by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey (Renwick, Karen) (Modified on 11/22/2019 to change event to motion to stay case per DDC chambers. (heo))
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #42 plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 09/05/2019. (mig)
September 3, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. re #42 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Motions [Doc. #31-40} Filed by Defendants by Filing an Amended Complaint or Filing Oppositions Thereto (Scheiderer, Jason)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re #42 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Motions [Doc. #31-40] Filed by Defendants by Filing an Amended Complaint or Filing Oppositions Thereto filed by Dalton Hastey - defendants must file a Response by the close of business on September 3, 2019. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/29/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
August 28, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #43 MOTION YRC Worldwide, Inc.'s and the Individual Defendants' Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule for YRC's Partial Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds, YRC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civ, #42 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Motions [Doc. #31-40} Filed by Defendants by Filing an Amended Complaint or Filing Oppositions Thereto. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
August 27, 2019 Filing 45 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #43 MOTION YRC Worldwide, Inc.'s and the Individual Defendants' Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule for YRC's Partial Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds, YRC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civ by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. Second Declaration of Ann M. Ashton in Support of Setting a Briefing Schedule for YRC's Partial Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds, YRC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23.1 and YRC's and The Individual Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice Before Allowing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Scheiderer, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #43 MOTION YRC Worldwide, Inc.'s and the Individual Defendants' Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule for YRC's Partial Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds, YRC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civ Memorandum in Support of Setting A Briefing Schedule for YRC's Partial Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds, YRC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23.1 and YRC's and the Individual Defendants Request for Judicial Notice Before Allowing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc.(Scheiderer, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION YRC Worldwide, Inc.'s and the Individual Defendants' Motion to Set a Briefing Schedule for YRC's Partial Motion to Dismiss Based on Forum Non Conveniens Grounds, YRC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23.1 and YRC's and the Individual Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice Before Allowing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. (Scheiderer, Jason)
August 27, 2019 Filing 42 MOTION for extension of time to Respond to Motions [Doc. #31-40} Filed by Defendants by Filing an Amended Complaint or Filing Oppositions Thereto by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email)(Renwick, Karen)
August 19, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #39 MOTION for Order REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (df)
August 16, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Declaration of Ann M. Ashton by Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. re #33 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 23.1, #31 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS GROUNDS, #34 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #38 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #32 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #36 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #37 MOTION to Stay Case , #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14)(Scheiderer, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #39 MOTION for Order REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc.(Scheiderer, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Order REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. (Scheiderer, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #37 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc.(Scheiderer, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to Stay Case by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc. (Scheiderer, Jason).
August 16, 2019 Filing 36 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock (Scheiderer, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock (Scheiderer, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #33 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 23.1 by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc.(Scheiderer, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 23.1 by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc. (Scheiderer, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #31 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS GROUNDS by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc.(Scheiderer, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss BASED ON FORUM NON CONVENIENS GROUNDS by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Jonathan E. Richman as counsel for defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/21/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Ralph C. Ferrara as counsel for defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/21/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Joshua M. Newville as counsel for defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/21/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Ann M Ashton as counsel for all defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/21/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 20, 2019 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for attorney Jonathan E. Richman to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4843430.) by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Scheiderer, Jason)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for attorney Ralph C. Ferrara to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4843426.) by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Scheiderer, Jason)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for attorney Joshua M. Newville to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4843421.) by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Scheiderer, Jason)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for attorney Ann M. Ashton to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4843405.) by Defendants Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form)(Scheiderer, Jason)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Patricia M. Nazemetz. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 Defendant YRC Worldwide, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. YRC Worldwide Inc. answer or other responsive pleading due 8/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/19/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 19, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by YRC Worldwide Inc. identifying none as corporate parent . (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant YRC Worldwide Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michael J. Kneeland. Michael J. Kneeland waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James F. Winestock. James F. Winestock waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James L. Welch. James L. Welch waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jamie G. Pierson. Jamie G. Pierson waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James E. Hoffman. James E. Hoffman waiver sent on 6/17/2009, answer due 8/16/2009. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert L. Friedman. Robert L. Friedman waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephanie D. Fisher. Stephanie D. Fisher waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Matthew A. Doheny. Matthew A. Doheny waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by William R. Davidson. William R. Davidson waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Douglas A. Carty. Douglas A. Carty waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Raymond J. Bromark. Raymond J. Bromark waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jason R. Scheiderer on behalf of Raymond J. Bromark, Douglas A. Carty, William R. Davidson, Matthew A. Doheny, Stephanie D. Fisher, Robert L. Friedman, James E. Hoffman, Michael J. Kneeland, Patricia M. Nazemetz, Jamie G. Pierson, James L. Welch, James F. Winestock, YRC Worldwide Inc. (Scheiderer, Jason)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of attorney Timothy W. Brown for Dalton Hastey pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/7/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Timothy W. Brown to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4830172.) by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Timothy W Brown, Esq., #2 ECF Registration Form of Timothy W. Brown, Esq.)(Renwick, Karen)
May 30, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to YRC Worldwide Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca)
May 30, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Renwick, Karen)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Dalton Hastey. (Renwick, Karen)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4820889.), filed by Dalton Hastey.(Renwick, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastey v. Welch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Welch
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Hoffman
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Friedman
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew A. Doheny
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R. Davidson
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James F. Winestock
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas A. Carty
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide Inc.
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Kneeland
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond J. Bromark
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie D. Fisher
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia M. Nazemetz
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie G. Pierson
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Ann M Ashton
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YRC Worldwide, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua M. Newville
Represented By: Jonathan E. Richman
Represented By: Ralph C. Ferrara
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Represented By: Ann M. Ashton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren D. Hawkins
Represented By: Jason R. Scheiderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalton Hastey
Represented By: Karen D. Renwick
Represented By: R. Frederick Walters
Represented By: Timothy W. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?