Baker et al v. Blue Valley School District USD 229 et al
Plaintiff: R.C., M.C., T.M. Snider, Terri E. Baker, Laura Klingensmith, C.W.C., K.K., Holly Rook, L.P., CarrieAnn Baumgarten, D.C., Joshua Snider, G.C., Rebecca Campbell, C.C., J.C., Matthew Couch, C.A.C.,, Julie Myrick, E.B., J.B., R.F. and Silo Baker
Defendant: LeEtta Felter, Brian Daley, Shannon Wickliffe, Patrick Hurley, Brent McCune, Tom Mitchell, Jodie Dietz, Tenth Judicial District, Sanmi Areola, Johnson County Department of Health and Environment, Brad Boyd, Mike Seitz, Laura Brewer, Blue Valley Board of Education, Stacy Obringer-Varhall, Kristin Schultz, Olathe Public Schools USD 233, Michele Benjamin, Joe Beveridge, Blue Valley School District USD 229, Olathe Board of Education, Brian Geary, The Board of Commissioners of Johnson County, Kansas, Amy Tysseling and Board of Commissioners of Johnson County, Kansas
Case Number: 2:2021cv02210
Filed: May 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by D.C., R.C., Matthew Couch, Joshua Snider, Terri E. Baker, T.M. Snider, L.P., E.B., J.C., C.A.C.,, M.C., J.B., Silo Baker, C.C., K.K., C.W.C., Holly Rook, G.C., CarrieAnn Baumgarten, Laura Klingensmith, Julie Myrick, R.F., Rebecca Campbell.(Baker, Linus)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #5 Motion to Remand. The Court Further Orders that Burford abstention is not warranted at this time. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by July 7, 2021, that complies with the directives in this order. Plaintiffs must serve the amended complaint on all Defendants named in the amended complaint. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading or motion to dismiss by July 21, 2021. The Court Further Orders; denying as moot 10 Motion to Dismiss, #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and #22 Motion to Dismiss Party. The Court Further Orders that the stay previously imposed (Doc. 24) is LIFTED. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 6/23/2021. (hw)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs D.C., R.C., Matthew Couch, Joshua Snider, Terri E. Baker, T.M. Snider, L.P., E.B., J.C., C.A.C., M.C., J.B., Silo Baker, C.C., K.K., C.W.C., C.C., Holly Rook, G.C., CarrieAnn Baumgarten, Laura Klingensmith, Julie Myrick, R.F., Rebecca Campbell re #12 Order. (Baker, Linus)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE by Defendants Patrick Hurley, Jodie Dietz, Tom Mitchell, Mike Seitz, Blue Valley Board of Education, Brian Daley, Amy Tysseling, Blue Valley School District USD 229, Stacy Obringer-Varhall, Michele Benjamin re #12 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Notice of Expiration of Policy)(Hatley, W.) Modified title on 6/1/2021 (ca).
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER regarding #21 motion for extension of time. After this case was removed, Plaintiff filed a motion to remand. The Court entered an order expediting briefing and requesting supplemental briefs from the parties. In that order, the Court stayed briefing on a pending motion to dismiss until the remand motion could be decided. Doc. 12. The motion to remand and the supplemental briefs are now ripe as of May 24, 2021. The Court will endeavor to resolve those matters expeditiously. To preserve the resources of the parties and the Court, and given the unique procedural posture of this case, the Court hereby stays all deadlines in this case until the motion to remand and supplemental issues are decided. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 5/25/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #22 MOTION to Dismiss Party The Board of County Commissioners of Johnson County, The Johnson County Department of Health and Environment, and Sanmi Areola by Defendant The Board of Commissioners of Johnson County, Kansas (Attachments: #1 Ex. 1, #2 Ex. 2)(Holder, Andrew)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Party The Board of County Commissioners of Johnson County, The Johnson County Department of Health and Environment, and Sanmi Areola by Defendants Sanmi Areola, Johnson County Department of Health and Environment, The Board of Commissioners of Johnson County, Kansas (Holder, Andrew)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Amended Answer to Complaint's non-SB40 Claims filed in Johnson Count (Doc. 1) by Defendants Blue Valley Board of Education, Blue Valley School District USD 229, Brian Daley (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Brian Daley (Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE by Defendants Tenth Judicial District, Olathe Board of Education, Brent McCune, Patrick Hurley, Jodie Dietz, Johnson County Department of Health and Environment, Tom Mitchell, Kristin Schultz, Brian Geary, Shannon Wickliffe, Mike Seitz, Olathe Public Schools USD 233, LeEtta Felter, Blue Valley Board of Education, Sanmi Areola, Brian Daley, Joe Beveridge, Brad Boyd, Amy Tysseling, The Board of Commissioners of Johnson County, Kansas, Blue Valley School District USD 229, Laura Brewer, Stacy Obringer-Varhall, Michele Benjamin re #12 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Journal Entry of Judgment)(Hatley, W.) Modified title on 5/24/2021 (ca).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs D.C., R.C., Matthew Couch, Joshua Snider, Terri E. Baker, T.M. Snider, L.P., E.B., J.C., C.A.C.,, M.C., J.B., Silo Baker, C.C., K.K., C.W.C., C.C., Holly Rook, G.C., CarrieAnn Baumgarten, Laura Klingensmith, Julie Myrick, R.F., Rebecca Campbell re #12 Order. (Baker, Linus) Modified title on 5/20/2021 (ca).
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs Silo Baker, Terri E. Baker, CarrieAnn Baumgarten, C.A.C.,, C.C., C.C., C.W.C., Rebecca Campbell, Matthew Couch, D.C., E.B., G.C., J.B., J.C., K.K., Laura Klingensmith, L.P., M.C., Julie Myrick, R.C., R.F., Holly Rook, Joshua Snider, T.M. Snider re: #5 Motion to Remand to State Court, (Baker, Linus)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Laura Brewer, Tenth Judicial District (Branson, Charles)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Sanmi Areola, Johnson County Department of Health and Environment, The Board of Commissioners of Johnson County, Kansas (Holder, Andrew)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION by Defendants Michele Benjamin, Blue Valley Board of Education, Blue Valley School District USD 229, Brian Daley, Jodie Dietz, Patrick Hurley, Tom Mitchell, Stacy Obringer-Varhall, Mike Seitz, Amy Tysseling re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Senate Bill 40, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Johnson County District Court Administrative Order 21-01)(Hatley, W.)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE by Defendants Joe Beveridge, Brad Boyd, LeEtta Felter, Brian Geary, Brent McCune, Olathe Board of Education, Olathe Public Schools USD 233, Kristin Schultz, Shannon Wickliffe re #5 Motion to Remand to State Court, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 21-01)(Norris, Michael)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Defendants' response to the motion to remand #5 is due by May 19, 2021. Any reply by Plaintiffs is due May 24, 2021. Plaintiffs and Defendants shall filed a supplemental brief each addressing the application, if any, of the Burford abstention doctrine to this case and whether the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state-law claims. These briefs are limited to 15 pages and are due by May 24, 2021, by 5 p.m. The briefing on the motion to dismiss 10 is stayed pending resolution of the motion to remand. See Order for additional details. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 5/12/2021. (md)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. District Judge Sam A. Crow no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 5/10/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow for all further proceedings. District Judge Toby Crouse no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Toby Crouse on 5/7/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ta)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Michele Benjamin, Blue Valley Board of Education, Blue Valley School District USD 229, Brian Daley, Jodie Dietz, Patrick Hurley, Tom Mitchell, Stacy Obringer-Varhall, Mike Seitz, Amy Tysseling. (FILED IN JOHNSON COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 5/5/2021; See Doc #1 for pleading). (ca)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Laura Brewer, Tenth Judicial District. (FILED IN JOHNSON COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 5/5/2021; See doc #3 for pleading).(ca)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Michele Benjamin, Blue Valley Board of Education, Blue Valley School District USD 229, Brian Daley, Jodie Dietz, Patrick Hurley, Tom Mitchell, Stacy Obringer-Varhall, Mike Seitz, Amy Tysseling. (FILED IN JOHNSON COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 5/5/2021; See Doc. #1 for pleading).(ca)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Olathe Board of Education, Olathe Public Schools USD 233. (FILED IN JOHNSON COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 5/5/2021; See Doc. #1 for pleading.(ca) Modified title on 5/7/2021 (ca).
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Silo Baker, Terri E. Baker, CarrieAnn Baumgarten, C.A.C.,, C.C., C.C., C.W.C., Rebecca Campbell, Matthew Couch, D.C., E.B., G.C., J.B., J.C., K.K., Laura Klingensmith, L.P., M.C., Julie Myrick, R.C., R.F., Holly Rook, Joshua Snider, T.M. Snider (Baker, Linus)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael G. Norris on behalf of Joe Beveridge, Brad Boyd, LeEtta Felter, Brian Geary, Brent McCune, Olathe Board of Education, Olathe Public Schools USD 233, Kristin Schultz, Shannon Wickliffe. (Norris, Michael)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Supplemental Exhibit to Notice of Removal by BLUE VALLEY BOARD OF EDUCATION, BLUE VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT USD 229, Michele Benjamin, Jodie Dietz, Patrick Hurley, Tom Mitchell, Stacy Obringer-Varhall, Mike Seitzis, Amy Tysseling re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to State Court by BLUE VALLEY BOARD OF EDUCATION, BLUE VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT USD 229, Michele Benjamin, Jodie Dietz, Patrick Hurley, Tom Mitchell, Stacy Obringer-Varhall, Mike Seitzis, Amy Tysseling (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Johnson County, Kansas, case number 21CV01942 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5480398.), filed by Patrick Hurley, Jodie Dietz, Amy Tysseling, Tom Mitchell, BLUE VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT USD 229, Stacy Obringer-Varhall, Mike Seitzis, Michele Benjamin, BLUE VALLEY BOARD OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A part 1, #2 Exhibit A part 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lovett-Bowman, Stephanie)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Blue Valley School District USD 229 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LeEtta Felter
Represented By: Courtney Alexandra McCray
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Daley
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Wickliffe
Represented By: Courtney Alexandra McCray
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Hurley
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent McCune
Represented By: Courtney Alexandra McCray
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Mitchell
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jodie Dietz
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tenth Judicial District
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Represented By: Charles Edward Branson
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanmi Areola
Represented By: Andrew D. Holder
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson County Department of Health and Environment
Represented By: Andrew D. Holder
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad Boyd
Represented By: Courtney Alexandra McCray
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Seitz
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Brewer
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Represented By: Charles Edward Branson
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Valley Board of Education
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy Obringer-Varhall
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristin Schultz
Represented By: Courtney Alexandra McCray
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olathe Public Schools USD 233
Represented By: Emily Tung
Represented By: Courtney Alexandra McCray
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele Benjamin
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Beveridge
Represented By: Courtney Alexandra McCray
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Valley School District USD 229
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olathe Board of Education
Represented By: Emily Tung
Represented By: Courtney Alexandra McCray
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Geary
Represented By: Courtney Alexandra McCray
Represented By: Michael G. Norris
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Board of Commissioners of Johnson County, Kansas
Represented By: Andrew D. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Tysseling
Represented By: Angus W. Dwyer
Represented By: Stephanie Lovett-Bowman
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of Johnson County, Kansas
Represented By: W. Joseph Hatley
Represented By: Andrew D. Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.C.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.C.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.M. Snider
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri E. Baker
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Klingensmith
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.W.C.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K.K.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holly Rook
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L.P.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CarrieAnn Baumgarten
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D.C.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Snider
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.C.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Campbell
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.C.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.C.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Couch
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.A.C.,
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Myrick
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.B.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.B.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.F.
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silo Baker
Represented By: Linus L. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?