Cantley et al v. Jacobson Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: April Cantley, H&A Enterprises, Inc., Antonial Childers, T4 Logistics, LLC, Matthew A. Braxton, Matthew A. Braxton, Inc., Rode Similien, Precision Freight, LLC, James Graves, Franchesca Graves, 88M Transportation, LLC, Golden Brown, Light But Heavy Transport, LLC, Laura Van Vleet, LVV Services Co., LLC, James Burton, Raw Dog Trucking, Inc., Raymond Fullerton, Custom Solutions, LLC, Bryant Cummings, Stacey Cummings, By Cummings Way Trucking, LLC, Anthony Cervantes, Integrity Transport, LLC, Maria Cervantes, PG&C Carriers, LLC, Chad Munt, Munt Enterprises, LLC, Aqil Jones, Truck Hstler, LLC, Humenuk Zinovy, TruckzWorks, LLC, Donna Rand, Rand Conveying Services, LLC, Krystoffer Wambeke, Summit Hauling, LLC, Ricardo Rendon, AMA Logistics Services, Inc., Terrell Sharper, T. Sharper Trucking, LLC, Brett Freeman and Freeman Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Jacobson Holdings, Inc. and TAFS, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2024cv02071
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: Brooks G Severson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Non-Motor Vehicle
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendants Jacobson Holdings, Inc., TAFS, Inc. re: #5 Motion to Dismiss (Reed, Benjamin)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs 88M Transportation, LLC, AMA Logistics Services, Inc., Matthew A. Braxton, Golden Brown, James Burton, By Cummings Way Trucking, LLC, April Cantley, Anthony Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Antonial Childers, Bryant Cummings, Stacey Cummings, Custom Solutions, LLC, Brett Freeman, Freeman Logistics, Inc., Raymond Fullerton, Franchesca Graves, James Graves, H&A Enterprises, Inc., Integrity Transport, LLC, Aqil Jones, LVV Services Co., LLC, Light But Heavy Transport, LLC, Matthew A. Braxton, Inc., Chad Munt, Munt Enterprises, LLC, PG&C Carriers, LLC, Precision Freight, LLC, Donna Rand, Rand Conveying Services, LLC, Raw Dog Trucking, Inc., Ricardo Rendon, Terrell Sharper, Rode Similien, Summit Hauling, LLC, T. Sharper Trucking, LLC, T4 Logistics, LLC, Truck Hstler, LLC, TruckzWorks, LLC, Laura Van Vleet, Krystoffer Wambeke, Humenuk Zinovy re #5 Motion to Dismiss. (NOTE: This is a refiling of #11 which was filed using incorrect event). (ca)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 (THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REFILED AT #12 USING THE CORRECT EVENT) REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Plaintiffs 88M Transportation, LLC, AMA Logistics Services, Inc., Matthew A. Braxton, Golden Brown, James Burton, By Cummings Way Trucking, LLC, April Cantley, Anthony Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Antonial Childers, Bryant Cummings, Stacey Cummings, Custom Solutions, LLC, Brett Freeman, Freeman Logistics, Inc., Raymond Fullerton, Franchesca Graves, James Graves, H&A Enterprises, Inc., Integrity Transport, LLC, Aqil Jones, LVV Services Co., LLC, Light But Heavy Transport, LLC, Matthew A. Braxton, Inc., Chad Munt, Munt Enterprises, LLC, PG&C Carriers, LLC, Precision Freight, LLC, Donna Rand, Rand Conveying Services, LLC, Raw Dog Trucking, Inc., Ricardo Rendon, Terrell Sharper, Rode Similien, Summit Hauling, LLC, T. Sharper Trucking, LLC, T4 Logistics, LLC, Truck Hstler, LLC, TruckzWorks, LLC, Laura Van Vleet, Krystoffer Wambeke, Humenuk Zinovy re: #5 Motion to Dismiss (Christensen, Carl) Modified on 4/10/2024 (ca).
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2024 at 10:00 AM by Telephone BGS - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 5407703 before Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 5/3/2024. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/14/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 5/14/2024. At the scheduling conference, the parties should be prepared to discuss their discovery plan as well as their tentative plans for trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 3/29/24. (cc)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by 88M Transportation, LLC, AMA Logistics Services, Inc., Matthew A. Braxton, Golden Brown, James Burton, By Cummings Way Trucking, LLC, April Cantley, Anthony Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Antonial Childers, Bryant Cummings, Stacey Cummings, Custom Solutions, LLC, Brett Freeman, Freeman Logistics, Inc., Raymond Fullerton, Franchesca Graves, James Graves, H&A Enterprises, Inc., Integrity Transport, LLC, Aqil Jones, LVV Services Co., LLC, Light But Heavy Transport, LLC, Matthew A. Braxton, Inc., Chad Munt, Munt Enterprises, LLC, PG&C Carriers, LLC, Precision Freight, LLC, Donna Rand, Rand Conveying Services, LLC, Raw Dog Trucking, Inc., Ricardo Rendon, Terrell Sharper, Rode Similien, Summit Hauling, LLC, T. Sharper Trucking, LLC, T4 Logistics, LLC, Truck Hstler, LLC, TruckzWorks, LLC, Laura Van Vleet, Krystoffer Wambeke, Humenuk Zinovy identifying None as corporate parent (Christensen, Carl)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TAFS, Inc. identifying Jacobson Holdings, Inc. as corporate parent . (Reed, Benjamin)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jacobson Holdings, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Reed, Benjamin)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Jacobson Holdings, Inc., TAFS, Inc.(Reed, Benjamin)
March 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Jacobson Holdings, Inc., TAFS, Inc. (Reed, Benjamin)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs must file their disclosure statement on or before March 22, 2024, or in the alternative, show good cause as to why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson on 03/04/2024. (kmc)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs 88M Transportation, LLC, AMA Logistics Services, Inc., Matthew A. Braxton, Golden Brown, James Burton, By Cummings Way Trucking, LLC, April Cantley, Anthony Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Antonial Childers, Bryant Cummings, Stacey Cummings, Custom Solutions, LLC, Brett Freeman, Freeman Logistics, Inc., Raymond Fullerton, Franchesca Graves, James Graves, H&A Enterprises, Inc., Integrity Transport, LLC, Aqil Jones, LVV Services Co., LLC, Light But Heavy Transport, LLC, Matthew A. Braxton, Inc., Chad Munt, Munt Enterprises, LLC, PG&C Carriers, LLC, Precision Freight, LLC, Donna Rand, Rand Conveying Services, LLC, Raw Dog Trucking, Inc., Ricardo Rendon, Terrell Sharper, Rode Similien, Summit Hauling, LLC, T. Sharper Trucking, LLC, T4 Logistics, LLC, Truck Hstler, LLC, TruckzWorks, LLC, Laura Van Vleet, Krystoffer Wambeke, Humenuk Zinovy - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Christensen, Carl)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs 88M Transportation, LLC, AMA Logistics Services, Inc., Matthew A. Braxton, Golden Brown, James Burton, By Cummings Way Trucking, LLC, April Cantley, Anthony Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, Antonial Childers, Bryant Cummings, Stacey Cummings, Custom Solutions, LLC, Brett Freeman, Freeman Logistics, Inc., Raymond Fullerton, Franchesca Graves, James Graves, H&A Enterprises, Inc., Integrity Transport, LLC, Aqil Jones, LVV Services Co., LLC, Light But Heavy Transport, LLC, Matthew A. Braxton, Inc., Chad Munt, Munt Enterprises, LLC, PG&C Carriers, LLC, Precision Freight, LLC, Donna Rand, Rand Conveying Services, LLC, Raw Dog Trucking, Inc., Ricardo Rendon, Terrell Sharper, Rode Similien, Summit Hauling, LLC, T. Sharper Trucking, LLC, T4 Logistics, LLC, Truck Hstler, LLC, TruckzWorks, LLC, Laura Van Vleet, Krystoffer Wambeke, Humenuk Zinovy. (Christensen, Carl)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing, Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
February 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6286150.), filed by Humenuk Zinovy, Truck Hstler, LLC, Custom Solutions, LLC, Matthew A. Braxton, Integrity Transport, LLC, LVV Services Co., LLC, James Burton, Munt Enterprises, LLC, Laura Van Vleet, Freeman Logistics, Inc., Anthony Cervantes, Maria Cervantes, PG&C Carriers, LLC, AMA Logistics Services, Inc., Golden Brown, Raymond Fullerton, By Cummings Way Trucking, LLC, Precision Freight, LLC, Aqil Jones, Donna Rand, James Graves, T. Sharper Trucking, LLC, Bryant Cummings, 88M Transportation, LLC, Stacey Cummings, Chad Munt, T4 Logistics, LLC, Ricardo Rendon, April Cantley, Rand Conveying Services, LLC, Rode Similien, Terrell Sharper, Franchesca Graves, Light But Heavy Transport, LLC, Summit Hauling, LLC, Matthew A. Braxton, Inc., H&A Enterprises, Inc., TruckzWorks, LLC, Krystoffer Wambeke, Brett Freeman, Raw Dog Trucking, Inc., Antonial Childers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit 21 - Factoring Services Agreement)(Christensen, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantley et al v. Jacobson Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Cantley
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&A Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonial Childers
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T4 Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew A. Braxton
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew A. Braxton, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rode Similien
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Freight, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Graves
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Franchesca Graves
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 88M Transportation, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Brown
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Light But Heavy Transport, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Van Vleet
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LVV Services Co., LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Burton
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raw Dog Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Fullerton
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Custom Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Cummings
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Cummings
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: By Cummings Way Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Cervantes
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Integrity Transport, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cervantes
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PG&C Carriers, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Munt
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munt Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aqil Jones
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Truck Hstler, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humenuk Zinovy
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TruckzWorks, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Rand
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rand Conveying Services, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystoffer Wambeke
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summit Hauling, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Rendon
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMA Logistics Services, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrell Sharper
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. Sharper Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Freeman
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freeman Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Carl Christensen
Represented By: Spencer C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacobson Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Joel Henry Driskell
Represented By: Julie E. Parisi
Represented By: Shannon Cohorst Johnson
Represented By: Benjamin Anthony Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFS, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Cohorst Johnson
Represented By: Joel Henry Driskell
Represented By: Julie E. Parisi
Represented By: Benjamin Anthony Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?