Strader (ID 66677) v. Kansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: James C. Strader
Defendant: (fnu) Echols, (fnu) Galloway, (fnu) Byers, Roger Werholtz, (fnu) Martin, Kansas Department of Corrections, (fnu) Sanchez, (fnu) Turner, (fnu) Cannon, (fnu) Lintz, (fnu) Blair, (fnu) Foos, Brenda Frailey, Kansas, State of, M. Nelson, (fnu) Randolff, (fnu) White, Federal PREA Line Investigator Unit, (fnu) Gould, John Petty, Aramark, Tim O'Brien, (fnu) Signor, Marcus L. Davis, Sam A. Crow, (fnu) Bell, Roland Tinador, Corizon, (fnu) Arrington, (fnu) Mounce, (fnu) Gilley, (fnu) Corby, (fnu) Horsh, (fnu) Buchanan, J. D. Griffiths, (fnu) Butcher, (fnu) McCollough, C. Clemmons, C. Knouxes, A. Johnson, Sam Cline, (fnu) Syssell, J. Hoepner, (fnu) Gallager, (fnu) Shuber, D. Lewis, (fnu) Mitchell, Matthew Moore, (fnu) Hogan, (fnu) Hernandez, Ross (lnu), (fnu) Simmons, Trish Rose, (fnu) Fernando, Kansas Bureau of Investigation, Joe Norwood, J. Butler, Bill Shipman, J. P. Stiffin, (fnu) Ferdinan, (fnu) Thorp, Kris (lnu), (fnu) Yarnell, (fnu) Williams, Lansing Correctional Facility, (fnu) Santos, Rolando Tirador and Butler and Associates
Case Number: 5:2019cv03218
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION to the Court Under Bills of Attainder by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk of the Court) (smnd)
December 24, 2019 Filing 52 MOTION to Indict by Grand Jury by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
December 23, 2019 Filing 51 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #50 MOTION to Present Documents Not in Petitioner's Possession on December 19, 2019 for Evidence Refile Pursuant to 28 USC 1746 by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (jal)
December 20, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION to Present Documents Not in Petitioner's Possession on December 19, 2019 for Evidence Refile Pursuant to 28 USC 1746 by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk of the Court) (smnd)
December 19, 2019 Filing 49 SUPPLEMENT to #48 Request for Board and Panel Review by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
December 17, 2019 Filing 48 REQUEST for Board and Panel Review by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
December 12, 2019 Filing 47 MOTION to Present Added Exhibits and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 46 MOTION to Present Added Exhibits and MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 45 Letter of Discussion and Questions and Memorandum of the Petitioner for Clerks of the Court/Judge Teeter from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE to Judge Holly L. Teeter and Clerks of the Courts by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 20, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Present Exhibits by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 42 Letter to Clerks of the Court from Plaintiff James C. Strader forwarded from Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. (smnd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Invoke and Enforce Prosecution and Restraining Order and Removal of Rule Rights by the Court to Defendants Who Have Lawyers by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 40 Letter to Clerk of the Court and Judge Holly L. Teeter from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Table of Contents) (smnd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 39 SUPPLEMENT to #27 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION for Protection and Removal From Custody Orders by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd)
November 18, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Court Ordered Medical Tests by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 36 Letter to Clerk of the Courts and Judge Holly L. Teeter from James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Invoke Rule Rights and Civil and Constitutional Rights by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 12, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE by Plaintiff James C. Strader re 25 Order. (smnd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE by Plaintiff James C. Strader re #7 Memorandum and Order and 25 Order. (smnd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to the Court Under Orders of Plaintiff to Subpoena Expert Witnesses and Discussion by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 31 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #27 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to the Court and for Appearance by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 29 Letter to Chief Deputy Clerk Ingrid Campbell from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 6, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE (titled Motion Through the Court to Review Account Statements) by Plaintiff James C. Strader re #7 Memorandum and Order. (smnd)
November 6, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 26 Letter to Clerks of the Court from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER striking #8 , #9 , #10 , #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 , #15 , #16 , #17 , #18 , #19 , #20 , #21 , #22 , #23 , and #24 . On October 30, the Court entered an order stating "that plaintiff shall file no other documents until further order of the court," with the exception of "an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the directions of the Court." #7 . The listed documents were filed after that order, and none appear to be an amended complaint in the form required by the Court. Accordingly, the Court strikes them from the docket. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 11/5/2019. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (md)
November 4, 2019 Filing 24 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - NOTICE of Second Part of Letter Discussion by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 23 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - Letter to Clerk of the Courts from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 22 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - Letter to Ingrid A. Campbell from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 21 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - Letter to Judge Teeter from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 20 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - NOTICE of Supplemental Documents re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 19 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - MOTION for Service of Documents by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 18 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - MOTION to Present Exhibits and Evidence with Statements and Medical Records by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 17 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - MOTION to Appoint Prosecution by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - MOTION for Recusal of Judge Sam A. Crow by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 15 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - NOTICE of Supplement to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - MOTION for E-Files Forwarded to Washington and Colorado for Listed Case #19-3241 and 19-3242 by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 60-1501 and MOTION to Vacate Sentences by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - SUPPLEMENT to #8 Notice by Plaintiff James C. Strader re: defendants listed in #1 Complaint. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019 (smnd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 - MOTION for Immediate Orders by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 STRICKEN PURSUANT TO ORDER 25 FILED 11/05/19 -- NOTICE by Plaintiff James C. Strader re: defendants listed in #1 Complaint. (smnd) Modified text on 11/5/2019. (smnd)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted to and including November 13, 2019, to submit an initial partial filing fee of $2.00 to the clerk of the court. Plaintiff is granted to and including November 13, 2019, to submit an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the directions of the Court. Plaintiff shall file no other documents until further order of the court. Plaintiff's motion to recuse the Honorable Sam A. Crow (Doc. #6 ) is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 10/30/19. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (smnd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Recuse Judge Sam A. Crow by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Ingrid A. Campbell from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow no longer assigned to case. Entered by Deputy Clerk on 10/29/19. Mailed to pro se party James C. Strader by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 3 Letters from Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (smnd)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff James C. Strader. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strader (ID 66677) v. Kansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Byers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Werholtz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Lintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Foos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Frailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Randolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal PREA Line Investigator Unit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Signor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam A. Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roland Tinador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Arrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Mounce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Gilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Corby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Horsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Buchanan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. D. Griffiths
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Butcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Clemmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Knouxes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Syssell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Hoepner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Gallager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ross (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Fernando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Bureau of Investigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Norwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Shipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. P. Stiffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Ferdinan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Yarnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lansing Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rolando Tirador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butler and Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Strader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?