Johnson v. Hudson et al
Case Number: 5:2020cv03155
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to adjudicate (Doc. #15 ) is denied as premature. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/06/20. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
August 3, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Adjudicate by Plaintiff Derrick Johnson. (smnd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on July 28, 2020, and assigned Appeal No. 20-3151 re #11 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Derrick Johnson. (smnd)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is denied leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis and is directed to submit the appellate filing fees of $505.00 to the clerk of the court on or before August 25, 2020. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 07/28/20. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 12 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #11 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet) (smnd)
July 27, 2020 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee not paid re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #11 on behalf of Plaintiff Derrick Johnson. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT IS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TRANSACTION.) (smnd)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #7 Order of Dismissal and #8 Judgment by Plaintiff Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to amend (Doc. #9 ) is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 07/21/20. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Amend Complaint re #5 Complaint by Plaintiff Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT regarding Order #7 dismissing matter without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 07/14/20. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL ENTERED: This matter is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 07/14/20. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of #5 Complaint by Plaintiff Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (on court-approved form) filed by Plaintiff Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Derrick Johnson re #3 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted to and including July 13, 2020, to submit the $400.00 filing fee and a complaint or to voluntarily dismiss this matter. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/12/20. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. Response deadline 7/8/2020. (smnd)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (titled Motion Under 28 USC 2241) filed by Plaintiff Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hudson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?