Yarbrough v. Scoular Company, The
Plaintiff: John Yarbrough
Defendant: Scoular Company, The
Case Number: 6:2021cv01109
Filed: April 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 7/26/2021 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 7/16/2021. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/16/2021. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/10/21. (ss)
June 2, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Scoular Company, The.(West, Craig)
May 20, 2021 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/07/2021 for Defendant Scoular Company, The to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 5/20/2021. (jk)
May 20, 2021 Filing 5 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Craig W. West on behalf of Scoular Company, The. (West, Craig)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified mail by John Yarbrough upon Scoular Company, The served on 5/3/2021, answer due 5/24/2021 (Rhodes, Arthur)
April 26, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff John Yarbrough. (Rhodes, Arthur)
April 26, 2021 Filing 2 (DISREGARD, see de #3 for corrected filing) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff John Yarbrough. (Rhodes, Arthur) Modified on 4/26/2021 to restrict since document was filed blank in error. (jk)
April 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5470924.), filed by John Yarbrough.(Rhodes, Arthur)
April 26, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scoular Company, The (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
April 26, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarbrough v. Scoular Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Yarbrough
Represented By: Arthur E. Rhodes
Represented By: Dustin L. DeVaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scoular Company, The
Represented By: Craig W. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?