Adams v. Osborne et al
Plaintiff: Michael Adams
Defendant: Steve Towler, Bob Green, William L. Boblett, Jr., Linda Day, John Does, Jana Osborne, Kimberly Fitch, Bobby Jack Woods, Randall Stapleton, Boyd County Fiscal Court, Tim Wechsler, Boyd County School Board, Tammy Pruitt and Dr. Judy Nichols
Case Number: 0:2018cv00102
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Linda Day, Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton (KSS)
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Linda Day, Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Deener, Elizabeth)
November 27, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #13 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (JLS)
November 26, 2018 Filing 13 FIRST REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Joy, Sebastian) Modified on 11/27/2018 to add filers (JLS).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: By 11/16/18, counsel conduct R26(f) meeting; 2)at time of meeting, exchange R26(a)(1) disclosures and supplement thereafter when required by R26(e); 3) Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/1/2018 w/info listed herein.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/6/18.(JLS)cc: COR
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Boyd County Fiscal Court, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Individually).(Mando, Jeffrey)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District), William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually), Boyd County School Board, Linda Day, Kimberly Fitch(In Her Official Capacity as Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Kimberly Fitch(Individually), Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton.(Deener, Elizabeth)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Upon agreement of the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants Kimberly Fitch, Ind., and Official capacity, William L. Boblett, Jr. Ind. and in his Official Capacity, Bob Green, Randall Stapleton, Tammy Pruitt, Linda Day, Dr. Judy Nichols in their official capacities as Board Members of the Boyd County School Board, and the Boyd County School Board be and are hereby granted an extension of time up through and including November 5, 2018 to file an Answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint #1 . Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/31/18.(KSS)cc: COR
October 31, 2018 ***PROPOSED AGREED ORDER SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extension of time to answer by William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District), William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually), Boyd County School Board, Linda Day, Kim (KSS)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Extension of time to answer by William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District), William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually), Boyd County School Board, Linda Day, Kimberly Fitch(In Her Official Capacity as Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Kimberly Fitch(Individually), Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton. (Deener, Elizabeth) Modified on 10/31/2018 to add filers (KSS).
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Jana Osborne(In Her Official Capacity As Assistant Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Jana Osborne(Individually).(Vessels, Christina)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Adams via private server to William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District) served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018; William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually) served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018; Linda Day served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Kimberly Fitch(In Her Official Capacity as Principal of Boyd County Middle School) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Kimberly Fitch(Individually) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Bob Green served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Dr. Judy Nichols served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Jana Osborne(In Her Official Capacity As Assistant Principal of Boyd County Middle School) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Jana Osborne(Individually) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 10/29/2018; Tammy Pruitt served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Randall Stapleton served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018; Steve Towler served on 10/3/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Tim Wechsler(Individually) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department) served on 10/8/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department) served on 10/3/2018, answer due 11/5/2018; Bobby Jack Woods(Individually) served on 10/3/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Joy, Sebastian)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED ORDER : #4 Proposed Agreed Order Boyd County Fiscal Court, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods (Individually) and Bobby Jack Woods (In His Official Capacity as Boyd County Sheriff), Be and Are Hereby Granted an extension of time up through and including 11/5/2018 to file an Answer or otherwise plead to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/23/18.(JLS)cc: COR
October 22, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #4 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Boyd County Fiscal Court, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department (JLS)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Boyd County Fiscal Court, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Individually). (Mando, Jeffrey) Modified on 10/22/2018 to add filer (JLS).
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to William L. Boblett, Jr(In His Official Capacity as Superintendent of Boyd County School District), William L. Boblett, Jr(Individually), Boyd County Fiscal Court, Boyd County School Board, Linda Day, Kimberly Fitch(In Her Official Capacity as Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Kimberly Fitch(Individually), Bob Green, Dr. Judy Nichols, Jana Osborne(In Her Official Capacity As Assistant Principal of Boyd County Middle School), Jana Osborne(Individually), Tammy Pruitt, Randall Stapleton, Steve Towler, Tim Wechsler(Individually), Tim Wechsler(In His Official Capacity as Deputy With the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(In His Official Capacity as Sheriff with the Boyd County Sheriffs Department), Bobby Jack Woods(Individually); Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS)
October 2, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4181690), filed by Michael Adams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Steve Towler, #3 Summons Bobby Jack Woods, #4 Summons Tim Wechsler, #5 Summons Dr. Judy Nichols, #6 Summons Linda Day, #7 Summons Tammy Pruitt, #8 Summons Randall Stapleton, #9 Summons Boyd County School Board, #10 Summons Bob Green, #11 Summons William L. Boblett, Jr., #12 Summons Kimberly Fitch, #13 Summons Jana Osborne)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams v. Osborne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Towler
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Green
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Boblett, Jr.
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Day
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jana Osborne
Represented By: Tia Jenay Combs
Represented By: Teresa Taylor Combs
Represented By: Christina L. Vessels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Fitch
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Jack Woods
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Stapleton
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd County Fiscal Court
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Wechsler
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyd County School Board
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tammy Pruitt
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Judy Nichols
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Represented By: John G. McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Adams
Represented By: Sebastian M. Joy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?