Ward v. Worthington

Plaintiff: Thadd Ward
Defendant: Mike Worthington, Shannon Worthington, Belinda Moore and Dr. Hannah
Case Number: 0:2018cv00105
Filed: October 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Thadd Ward re #8 Order. Mail states "Released" (KSS)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER : 1) The Clerk of Courts shall send Ward a Certificate of Inmate Account (EDKY Form 523); 2) Should Ward wish to pursue the case, he must have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff and file it with the Court; 3) Ward must take this step within fourteen (14) days or this case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. . Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 11/27/18.(JLS)cc: COR, Ward, with appropriate Form, via US Mail
November 5, 2018 Filing 7 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (no certification) by Thadd Ward, pro se, with envelope postmarked 11/1/18. (KSS)
November 2, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thadd Ward, pro se (KSS)
November 2, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #5 Complaint (Referred) on Form EDKy 520 filed by Thadd Ward, pro se. (KSS)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Thadd Ward, pro se.Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter re: Certificate of Inmate Account, #2 Envelope postmarked 10/31/18)(KSS)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT (Form EDKy 520) no summons presented referred to PSO filed by Thadd Ward, pro se (with envelope postmarked 10/31/18).(KSS)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED 1. Clerk of Court shall mark assigned case number on a form Civil Rights Complaint (EDKY Form 520) and send to Ward. The Clerk shall also send Ward (1) affidavit of assets (Form AO-240) and (2) Certificate of Inmate Account (Form 523). 2. Should Ward wish to pursue this claim, he must complete and file the complaint form, describing the facts of his case, specifically identifying the people, dates, places and actions which are relevant to his claims, and explain what he wants the Court to do. 3. In addition, Ward must either pay $400.00 filing and admin fees or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Acct certified by prison staff (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis App and (3) file both of them with the Court. 4. Ward must take these steps within 30 days, or the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/19/18.(KSS)cc: COR, Ward (via US mail w/forms)
October 17, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: (JLS)
October 17, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(JLS)
October 17, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
October 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Thadd Ward. (Attachments: #1 Env PM 10-15-18)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thadd Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Belinda Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?