Jones v. Streeval

Defendant: J. C. Streeval
Petitioner: Kevin Dewayne Jones
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 0:2018cv00107
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE to MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence filed by J. C. Streeval. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Giddings)(Melloan, Kyle)
December 20, 2018 Filing 11 SEALED DOCUMENT Sealed pursuant to MOTION TO SEAL re #10 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by J. C. Streeval by J. C. Streeval (Melloan, Kyle)
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to Seal a Document by J. C. Streeval Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melloan, Kyle)
November 20, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by J. C. Streeval. (Melloan, Kyle)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to Certified Mail to U.S. Attorney's Office re #6 Order. (KSS)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT to Warden, FCI Ashland re #6 Order (KSS)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: It is ORDERED 1. The Clerk of Court shall SUBSTITUTE in Warden J.C. Streeval as the Respondent in this proceeding. 2. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of Jones's petition and this Order by certified mail to both (a) Repondent J.C. Streeval, Warden at FCI-Ashland, and (b) the United States Attorney for the EDKY. 3. Within 60 days from entry of this Order, the Respondent shall file a response to the petition. 4. Jones must send a copy of every document he files with the Court to the Respondent or his attorney. Each original document Jones files with the Court must include certification. The Court will disregard any document filed without the required certification. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/29/18.(KSS)cc: COR, Jones, Atty. Koester (via US Mail), Warden Streeval, US Atty (via certified mail w/petition)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail with copy of docket sheet (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KSS)
October 25, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: Case Transferred In from District of Missouri Eastern. (TDA)
October 25, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Eastern. Case number 1:18-cv-00239. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR & Jones w/ docket sheet via US Mail
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 2. Wed Oct 10 12:01:44 CDT 2018 (Carter, Jessica) [Transferred from moed on 10/25/2018.]
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER TO OTHER DISTRICT :IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that the Clerk shall TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky. Eastern District of Kentucky( Case to be transferred after 10/24/2018.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/10/2018. (JMC) [Transferred from moed on 10/25/2018.]
October 9, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Oct 9 15:00:43 CDT 2018 (admin,) [Transferred from moed on 10/25/2018.]
October 9, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CSG) [Transferred from moed on 10/25/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr. (CSG) [Transferred from moed on 10/25/2018.]
October 9, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence by Petitioner Kevin Dewayne Jones. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(CSG) [Transferred from moed on 10/25/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Streeval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: John Nicholas Koester, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Dewayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Streeval
Represented By: Kyle M. Melloan, AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?