Dennis v. Coldiron et al

Plaintiff: Melvin Taurean Dennis
Defendant: Wes Coldiron, Jamie Coldiron and Dr. Keran Baker
Case Number: 0:2018cv00113
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: P SO
1 Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/Unable to Forward. Mail sent to Melvin Dennis re #11 Order Dismissing Case, (KSS)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: it is hereby ORDERED as follows 1. Plaintiff Melvin Dennis's complaint R. #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to comply with the Court's Local Rules, and 2. This matter is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/19/18.(KSS)cc: COR, Dennis (via US Mail)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Melvin Taurean Dennis re #7 Important Notice to Pro Se Filer; Mail States Return to Sender No Longer At This Facility (KSS)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Melvin Taurean Dennis re #8 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Return to Sender, Attempted - Not Known, Unable to Forward. (JLS)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1.The motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Melvin Taurean Dennis R. #2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. The clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Dennis an Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application Form AO-240 and a Certificate of Inmate Account Form EDKY 523; 3. Should Dennis wish to pursue this federal action, he must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff, (2) complete the affidavit of assets app (3) file both of these documents with this Court; 4. Dennis must take these steps within 30 days or his case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/3/18. (KSS)cc: COR, Dennis (via US Mail w/forms)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KSS)
November 30, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
November 30, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (TDA)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:18-cv-00773. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Dennis w/ copy of docket sheet
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRINGACTION by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 11/29/2018. The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Northern Division at Ashland, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that Court. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 11/30/2018.]
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (MNM) [Transferred from kywd on 11/30/2018.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Melvin Taurean Dennis (MNM) [Transferred from kywd on 11/30/2018.]
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Keran Baker, Jamie Coldiron, and Wes Coldiron, filed by Melvin Taurean Dennis. (MNM) [Transferred from kywd on 11/30/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dennis v. Coldiron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Coldiron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Coldiron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Keran Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Taurean Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?