Young v. Doubblestein et al

Plaintiff: Christopher L. Young and Raven Kindred of the Northstar
Defendant: Timothy Doubblestein, James Whitt and James Green
Case Number: 0:2018cv00114
Filed: December 4, 2018
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
0 Judge: P SO
1 Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 13 Summons Issued as to Timothy Doubblestein, James Green, James Whitt,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (JLS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #1 USM Time-stamped Summons) (JLS).
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER : 1) the Deputy clerk shall prepare 3 "Service Packets" for service upon the defts. Each packet shall include: a. a completed summons form; b. Young's latest Complaint #10 ; c. this order and d. a completed USM Form 285; 2) the Deputy clerk shall send the 3 packets to the USMS in Lexington, KY and note the date of delivery in the docket; 3) the USMS shall personally serve Warden James Green, Deputy Warden James Whitt and Chaplain Timothy Doublestein at EKCC in West Liberty, KY; 4) within 21 days after service with the summons and complaint, defts must answer or otherwise respond to Young's complaint; 5) Young must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change in his current mailing address. If Young fails to do so, the Court may dismiss his case.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/11/19.(JLS)cc: COR. Young, via USMail
January 7, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #11 Filing Fee Received, #10 Complaint (Referred) (JLS)
January 7, 2019 11 IFP Granted, partial filing fee Filing fee received - $ 12.87, receipt number 0002761 (JLS)cc: finance
January 7, 2019 10 COMPLAINT, filed by Raven Kindred of the Northstar, Christopher L. Young, pro se adding additional defendant.( Filing fee $12.87; receipt number 0002761.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Ltr, #2 Env PM 1-3-19, #3 Receipt)(JLS)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order 9 ORDER:1) Young's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Payment of $50 administrative fee is WAIVED . However, pursuant to 28 USC 1915(b), Young must pay the $350 filing fee in the manner set forth below; 2) Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Young must pay $12.87 to the Clerk of Courts as an initial filing fee; 3) The Clerk shall open an account in Young's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete the Notice of Payment Form [KY 525 Form] with Young's name, his inmate registration number and this case number. The clerk shall then send a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form to the Warden of the institution where Young is confined; 4) Once Young pays the initial partial filing fee, his custodian shall send the Clerk of this Court a payment each month out of Young's inmate trust fund acct equal to 20% of Young's income the preceding month. The custodian shall only send a pmt if the account exceeds $10.00 and the payments shall continue until the $350 is paid; 5) The clerk shall send Young a Court-approved civil rights form [Form 520]; 6) within 30 days Young must complete the entire form and file it with the Court; 7) If Young fails to complete the form within 30 days, the Court will dismiss his case; 8) finally, Young must also keep the Clerk informed of his current mailing address and failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 12/6/18. (JLS)cc: COR, Young via US Mail, with required forms
December 5, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher L. Young (KSS)
December 5, 2018 Clerk's Note re #6 Transfer Order: Case transferred from Lexington Division 5:18-cv-637-DCR. (KSS)
December 5, 2018 8 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail w/Transfer Order DE #6 (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KSS)
December 5, 2018 Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr added. Judge Danny C. Reeves no longer assigned to case. (KSS)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 TRANSFER ORDER: The Defendants are located in Morgan Co., KY which is in the Ashland Division. Thus, this matter should have been assigned to the Ashland Division. It is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to transfer this proceeding to the Ashland Division of the Court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/5/2018.(JJ)cc: COR, Ash Clerk, Pro Se Petitioner via US Mail Modified text on 12/5/2018 (JJ).
December 4, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO P SO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (JLM)
December 4, 2018 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(JLM)
December 4, 2018 Conflict Check run. (JLM)
November 27, 2018 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Christopher L. Young. (JLM)
November 27, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Christopher L. Young Motions referred to P SO. (JLM)
November 27, 2018 1 COMPLAINT referred to P SO, filed by Christopher L. Young. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 envelope)(JLM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Doubblestein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher L. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raven Kindred of the Northstar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Doubblestein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Whitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?