Dean v. Cooper et al

Plaintiff: Todd L. Dean
Defendant: Trish Cooper and Shawn Moore
Case Number: 0:2019cv00003
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: P SO
1 Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1. The #9 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Dean is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute; and 3. This matter is CLOSED and STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 2/21/19.(KSS)cc: COR, Dean (via US mail)
February 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd L. Dean, pro se (KSS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd L. Dean, pro se, with envelope postmarked 2/8/19. Motions referred to P SO. (KSS)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable/Unable to Forward. Mail sent to Todd L. Dean re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; #4 Pro Se Information Packet. Clerk re-mailed documents to Dean at new address Mt. Sterling, KY. (KSS)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER re: Disclosure of Contact Information: 1. pro se litigants must provide current telephone number, residential address, & if different, mailing address. 2. pro se litigants must provide written notice of change of residential address, & if different, mailing address. 3. Clerk file copy of Order in all non-prisoner pro se actions. Failure to provide required information or change of address may result in appropriate sanctions.. Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell on 5/6/16.(JLS)cc: COR, Dean via US Mail
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons from Todd L. Dean, pro se, with envelope postmarked 1/20/19 (KSS)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dean DE #3 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send Dean an Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application Form AO-240 and a Certificate of Inmate Account EDKY Form 523; 3. Should Dean wish to pursue this federal action, he must either pay the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/IFP Application, and (3) file both of these documents with this Court; 4. Dean must take these steps within 30 days or his case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 1/15/19. (KSS)cc: COR, Dean (via US Mail w/forms) (Main Document 5 replaced on 1/29/2019) (KSS).
January 14, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd L. Dean (JLS)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(JLS)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Todd L. Dean, pro se.Motions referred to P SO. (JLS)
January 14, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Todd L. Dean, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Env, no PM)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dean v. Cooper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trish Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd L. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?