Jordan v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Keri Jordan
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan
Case Number: 0:2019cv00010
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Clerk's Note: Counsel, Joyce A. Merritt, called to inform that re #17 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to answer or respond was filed in error and is a duplicate of #10 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to answer or respond by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (JLS)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to answer or respond by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan. (Merritt, Joyce) Modified on 3/28/2019 to add filer (JLS).
March 27, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to answer or respond by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan. (Merritt, Joyce)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER as proposed and set out herein. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 3/12/19. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A: PO Undertaking)(JLS)cc: COR
March 11, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT MOTION for Protective Order by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan and Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Merritt, Joyce) Modified on 3/11/2019 to add filers (JLS).
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AGREED ORDER : Aetna Life Insurance Company shall have up to and including March 27, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint.. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 2/22/19.(JLS)cc: COR
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER: Bon Secours Health System, Inc. shall have up to and including March 27, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 2/22/19.(JLS)cc: COR
February 21, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: #12 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation to answer or respond by Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan, #10 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to answer or respond by Aetna Life Insurance Company (JLS)
February 21, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation to answer or respond by Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan. (Merritt, Joyce) Modified on 2/21/2019 to add filers (JLS).
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Aetna Life Insurance Company, Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan. (Merritt, Joyce)
February 21, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time to answer or respond by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Merritt, Joyce) Modified on 2/21/2019 to add filers (JLS).
February 19, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keri Jordan via Certified Mail upon U.S. Sec. of Labor to Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan served on 2/14/2019, answer due 3/7/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Card)(Lucas, Keri)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Aetna Life Insurance Company COMPLETED on 2/4/2019. Secretary of State return states deft served by certified mail return receipt confirming receipt of summons no date of signature by deft. (JLS)
February 12, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically. (JLS)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Keri Jordan as to Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Summons Unexecuted summons - Bon Secours)(Lucas, Keri)
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING by Keri Jordan re #1 Complaint,, with new summons to issue on Defendant, Bon Secours (Attachments: #1 Summons for Bon Secours)(Lucas, Keri)
January 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Keri Jordan of Name Change for Keri E. Lucas to Keri E. Hieneman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of KY Supreme Court)(Lucas, Keri)
January 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company, Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (JLS)
January 29, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4271435), filed by Keri Jordan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summary Plan Description, #2 Exhibit B - 12/28/17 EOB, #3 Ehxibit C - 2/7/18 Appeal, #4 Exhibit D - 3/5/18 Denial, #5 Exhibit E - 3/19/18 Member Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - 4/30/18 Member Complaint, #7 Exhibit G - Dr. Ford Letter, #8 Exhibit H - 5/11/18 Denial, #9 Exhibit I - 5/22/18 Denial, #10 Exhibit J - 6/8/18 Letter, #11 Exhibit K - 6/11/18 Exhaustion Letter, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Summons for AETNA, #14 Summons for Bon Secours)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jordan v. Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Joyce A. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bon Secours Health System, Inc., Health Plan
Represented By: Joyce A. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Jordan
Represented By: Keri Ellen Lucas
Represented By: Leigh Gross Latherow
Represented By: Keri Ellen Hieneman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?