Howard v. Worthington et al

Plaintiff: Eric J. Howard
Defendant: Michael Worthington and Justin Taylor
Case Number: 0:2019cv00016
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: 1. Plf's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2. This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. 3. This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 4/3/19.(KSS)cc: COR, Howard (via US Mail to Christian County Det Ctr and South Shore, KY addresses)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. Howard's Complaint DE #1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute and for failure to comply with an Order of the Court. 2. The Court will enter an appropriate Judgment. 3. This matter is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 4/3/19.(KSS)cc: COR, Howard (via US Mail to Christian County Det Ctr and South Shore, KY addresses)
March 20, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: Clerk re-mailed documents to the additional address indicated on the cover letter submitted with the Complaint (JLS)
March 20, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric J. Howard re #5 Order. Return to Sender, Unable to Forward (JLS)
March 7, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #6 Mail Returned. Clerk re-mailed documents to the additional address indicated on the cover letter submitted with the Complaint #1 . (JLS)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eric J. Howard re #4 Pro Se Information Packet. Return to Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable to Forward. (JLS)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : 1) Howard's #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) the clerk shall mark the assigned case number on form KYED Form 520 and send to Howard. Clerk shall also send (1) an Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis Application (Form AO-240) and (2) a Certificate of Inmate Account (form EDKY Form 523); 3) Should Howard wish to pursue this claim, he must complete and file the complaint form, describing facts of his case, specifically identifying the people, dates, places and actions relevant to his claims; 4) in addition, Howard must either pay the $400.00 filing fee and administrative fee or (1) have the Certificate of Inmate Account certified by prison staff and (2) complete the Affidavit of Assets/In Forma Pauperis application and (3) file both with this Court; 5) Howard must take these steps within 30 days from the date of this Order, or the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 2/19/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Howard w/appropriate forms via USMail
February 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eric J. Howard, pro se. (KSS)
February 11, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) filed by Eric J. Howard, pro se (KSS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KSS)
February 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Eric J. Howard, pro se. (Received in envelope with Complaint #1 )Motions referred to PSO. (KSS)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Affidavit 0 summons(es) presented referred to Judge PSO, filed by Eric J. Howard, pro se. (No filing fee nor motion ifp received) (Attachments: #1 Grievance, #2 Cover letter & Envelope postmarked 2/7/19)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howard v. Worthington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Worthington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric J. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?