Clervrain v. Bevin

Plaintiff: Manetirony Clervrain
Defendant: Matt Bevin
Case Number: 0:2019cv00019
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #22 MOTION for Extension of Time by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se (KSS)
April 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope postmarked 4/4/19)(KSS)
April 2, 2019 ***MOTIONS SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #13 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis; #15 MOTION Relief from Manifest Injustice and Abuse of Discretion; #16 MOTION Enacting Kentucky Financial Burdens Act; #17 MOTION Enforcing Choice Laws Provisions Act; #18 MOTION Enacting Kentucky Deprivation Act #19 MOTION Enacting Kentucky Illegal Contract Act; #20 MOTION Declatory and Anti-Apertheid Act and Letter #21 by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se (KSS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from Manetirony Clervrain, pro se, re: motions (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/28/19) (KSS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION Declatory and Anti-Apertheid Act by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/28/19)(KSS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION Enacting Kentucky Illegal Contract Act by Manetirony Clervrain, pro seMotions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/28/19)(KSS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION Enacting Kentucky Deprivation Act by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/28/19)(KSS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION Enforcing Choice Laws Provisions Act by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/28/19)(KSS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION Enacting Kentucky Financial Burdens Act by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/28/19)(KSS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION Relief from Manifest Injustice and Abuse of Discretion by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/28/19)(KSS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3-28-19)(KSS)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT ACCOMPANYING MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/28/19)(KSS)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 USCA Case Number 19-5232 Case Manager Karen S. Fultz for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Manetirony Clervrain. (Attachments: #1 Copy of USDC Order denying motion for reconsideration)(KSS)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER : 1) The clerk shall send Clervrain a 6CCA Form 4 and a E.D.Ky. 523 Form; 2) w/I 30 days Clervrain must either pay the $505.00 or complete the following steps: (a) Complete the 6CCA Form 4; (b) have prison staff complete and sign E.D.Ky 523 Form and (c) file both with the Court. Failure to complete these steps w/I the time allotted, his appeal may be dismissed; 3) The clerk shall forward a copy of this order to the Clerk of the 6CCA. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 3/14/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Clervrain via USMail w/appropriate forms
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Clevrain's #7 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 3/14/19. (JLS)cc: COR, Clervrain via USMail
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 USCA Case Number 19-5232 Case Manager Karen S. Fultz for #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Manetirony Clervrain. (JLS)
March 11, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order Dismissing Case, by Manetirony Clervrain (KSS)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #6 Order Dismissing Case by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. No motion ifp nor fee received. cc: COR, 6CCA, Clervrain (via US Mail with NOA & docket sheet) (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/6/19)(KSS)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #6 Order Dismissing Case by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 3/6/19)(KSS)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: 1. Clervrain's complaint DE #1 is DISMISSED. 2. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. 3. This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 2/20/19.(KSS)cc: COR, Clervrain (via US Mail)
February 14, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) filed by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. (KSS)
February 14, 2019 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(KSS)
February 14, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. (KSS)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. (Received in envelope with complaint DE 1) Motions referred to P SO. (KSS)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Manetirony Clervrain, pro se. (Attachments: #1 "Motion for Expanding National Choice Act", #2 Cover letter, #3 Envelope pm 2/12/19)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clervrain v. Bevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Bevin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manetirony Clervrain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?