Neal v. Banks et al
Plaintiff: DeSean Neal
Defendant: John Doe, Christopher Banks, Julie Hinton, Lindon and Mullens
Case Number: 0:2019cv00038
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Neal's #12 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 5/14/19. (JLS)cc: COR, Neal via USMail
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by DeSean Neal Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 env, pm 5-10-19)(JLS)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 JUDGMENT: 1) 1) Neal's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted ; 2) Judgment is entered in favor of defts with respect to the official-capacity claims raised in this proceedings; 3) This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket; 4) This a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 5/8/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Neal via USMail
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER : 1) Neal's Complaint #1 is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted; 2) All pending motions are DENIED as moot; 3) This action is STRICKEN from the Court's docket; 4) a corresponding Judgment will be entered this date. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 5/8/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Neal via USMail
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(JLS)
May 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (TDA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Kentucky Western. Case number 3:19-cv-00284. File and docket sheet received electronically. cc: Neal w/ docket sheet via US Mail
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 4/30/2019. The instant action shall be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky, Northern Division at Ashland, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a) for all further proceedings. All further filings shall be filed with that court. Should any filings in this action be filed in this Court in the future, the Clerk of Court shall transfer the filings to the Eastern District of Kentucky. cc: Counsel (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 5/2/2019.]
April 29, 2019 Response to #5 Notice of Deficiency, filed by DeSean Neal. (MEJ) [Transferred from kywd on 5/2/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Summonses do not include Plaintiff's or Plaintiff's Attorney's name and address for Answer or Motion. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 5/20/2019. (RLJ) [Transferred from kywd on 5/2/2019.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (RLJ) [Transferred from kywd on 5/2/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DeSean Neal. (RLJ) [Transferred from kywd on 5/2/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff DeSean Neal. (RLJ) [Transferred from kywd on 5/2/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Banks, John Doe, Julie Hinton, Lindon, and Mullens, filed by DeSean Neal. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Attachment - Letter, #3 Envelope). (RLJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/29/2019: #4 Corrected Summonses, #5 Envelpoe for Corrected Summonses) (MEJ). [Transferred from kywd on 5/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Banks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DeSean Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Hinton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mullens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?