Dudley v. Streeval et al

Plaintiff: Sean Lamont Dudley
Defendant: KA Unit Team, Safety Department, J. C. Streeval and Health Services Officials
Case Number: 0:2019cv00039
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: 1) Dudley's denying #8 Motion for Leave is DENIED as moot; 2) As this Court recently stated, Dudley must fully complete the Form 520 and file with the Court. If Dudley fails to complete and file that form within the time allotted, the Court will dismiss his case. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 7/3/19. (JLS)cc: COR, Dudley via USMail
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER : the clerk shall send Dudley a Court-approved civil rights complaint form, Form 520; 2) w/I 30 days Dudley to complete and file form with the court. Dudley to complete form as set out herein; 3) if Dudley fails to complete and file form w/I 30 days the Court will dismiss his case; 4) Dudley must keep clerk informed of his current mailing address or the Court may dismiss his case. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 7/3/19.(JLS)cc: COR, Dudley via USMail w/Form 520
July 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #8 MOTION for Leave by Sean Lamont Dudley (JLS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Formal Amendment to Pleadings by Sean Lamont Dudley, pro seMotions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Amendments, #2 Medical records, #3 env, pm 7-1-19)(JLS)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Dudley's #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Payment of the $50 admin fee is waived, however Dudley must pay the $350 filing fee in manner set forth below 2. Within 30 days from EOO Dudley must pay the $75.18 to the Clerk of this Court as an initial partial filing fee. 3. The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Dudley's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete KY 525 form and send to Warden of institution. 4. Once Dudley pays the initial partial filing fee, his custodian shall send the Clerk of this Court a payment each month out of Dudley's inmate trust fund account. This payment should be in an amount equal to 20% of Neal's income from preceding month. That said, the custodian shall only send a mthly pymt in the amt in the acct exceeds $10 and continue mthly pymts until entire $350 is paid. 5. This matter now stands submitted for initial screening pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A and 1915(e)(2).. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 6/5/19. (KSS)cc: COR, Dudley, Warden (via US mail)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sean Lamont Dudley, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 5/31/19)(KSS)
June 3, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sean Lamont Dudley, pro se (KSS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sean Lamont Dudley, pro se. Motions referred to PSO. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Envelope postmarked 5/31/19)(KSS)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1. The Clerk of Court shall send Dudley AO-240, EDKY 523 2. Within 30 days from EOO Dudley must pay either the $400 filing and admin fees up front or he must properly ask to pay the fee in installments over time by completing both forms; 3. If Dudley fails to take the foregoing steps within the time allotted, the Court will dismiss his case for failure to prosecute 4. Finally, Dudley must keep the Clerk of Court informed of his current mailing address. If he fails to notify of change in address, the Court may dismiss this case. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 5/20/19.(KSS)cc: COR, Dudley (via US Mail w/forms)
May 6, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (JLS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(JLS)
May 6, 2019 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO FILING FEE ENCLOSED, NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Sean Lamont Dudley. (Attachments: #1 Env)(JLS) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/6/2019) (KSS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dudley v. Streeval et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KA Unit Team
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. C. Streeval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Services Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Lamont Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?