Binion et al v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alyssa Binion and Brandon Binion
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. and Joel L. Rogers
Case Number: 0:2019cv00057
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Jonathan B. Hollan re #11 Notice. Error: attachment was insufficiently described as "Exhibit Exhibit A". Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (JLS)
July 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Alyssa Binion, Brandon Binion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Notice to Assert Subrogation Rights Letters from counsel Hollan)(Hollan, Jonathan) Modified on 7/15/2019 (JLS).
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandon Binion, Alyssa Binion via Certified Mail to Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. served on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Greencard)(Hollan, Jonathan)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED ORDER Defts shall have up to and including 8/16/2019 to file a responsive pleading to Pla's Complaint #1 . Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 6/20/19.(JLS)cc: COR
June 20, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Joel L. Rogers (KSS)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Binion, Alyssa Binion. Joel L. Rogers waiver sent on 6/17/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Hollan, Jonathan)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Joel L. Rogers. (McGuffin, Robin)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Joel L. Rogers on 06/17/2019 by Alyssa Binion, Brandon Binion. Waiver of Service due by 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Hollan, Jonathan)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Clean Harbors Environmental Services on 06/17/2019 by Alyssa Binion, Brandon Binion. Waiver of Service due by 7/17/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons)(Hollan, Jonathan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Joel L. Rogers; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail for service by Kentucky Secretary of State (with packet). (KSS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service (KSS)
June 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4382427), filed by Brandon Binion, Alyssa Binion. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Clean Harbors, #3 Summons Joel L. Rogers)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Binion et al v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robin E. McGuffin
Represented By: Daniel E. Danford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel L. Rogers
Represented By: Robin E. McGuffin
Represented By: Daniel E. Danford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Binion
Represented By: Jeremy L. Clark
Represented By: Jonathan Bartley Hollan
Represented By: Craig E. Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Binion
Represented By: Jeremy L. Clark
Represented By: Jonathan Bartley Hollan
Represented By: Craig E. Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?