Scott et al v. Kentucky State Police et al
Plaintiff: James Scott and Marsha Scott
Defendant: Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers and Kentucky State Police
Case Number: 0:2019cv00095
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers filed by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers. (Arnett, Alea)
October 25, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review: re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers (JLS)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers filed by James Scott, Marsha Scott. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Official Capacity Cliams, #2 Proposed Order Overruling Motion to Dismiss Official Capacity Claims)(Music, Brandon)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the removal of this action shall be sustained. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/7/19.(KSS)cc: COR
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers , MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Official Capacity Claims)(Arnett, Alea)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING REMOVAL by Kentucky State Police, Erik Kouns, Unknown Investigators and Troopers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Filing Notice of Notice of Removal with Carter Circuit Court)(Arnett, Alea)
October 3, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal from Carter Circuit Court (KSS)
October 3, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Carter Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-305. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4480944), filed by Kentucky State Police, Unknown Investigators and Troopers, Erik Kouns. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott et al v. Kentucky State Police et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Kouns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Investigators and Troopers
Represented By: John Preston Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kentucky State Police
Represented By: Alea Amber Arnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Scott
Represented By: Brandon Music
Represented By: W. Jeffrey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Scott
Represented By: Brandon Music
Represented By: W. Jeffrey Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?