Shearer v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Shearer
Defendant: Jill Miller and Dr. Frederick Kemen, MD
Case Number: 0:2020cv00066
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: P SO
Referring Judge: Gregory F VanTatenhove
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #10 MOTION for Reconsideration re #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; #11 MOTION for Extension of Time by Kenneth Shearer (KSS)
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Partial Filing Fee by Kenneth Shearer, pro se, with envelope postmarked 7/8/2020Motions referred to P SO. (KSS)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Reconsideration "Motion to Readdress Motion for Appointment of Counsel" re #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kenneth Shearer, pro se, with envelope postmarked 7/8/2020Motions referred to PSO. (KSS)
June 29, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #9 Letter (JLS)
June 29, 2020 Filing 9 Letter from Kenneth Shearer, pro se addressing his complaint. (Attachments: #1 env, pm 6-25-20) (JLS)
June 26, 2020 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kenneth Shearer, pro se. (JLS)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kenneth Shearer, pro se. Motions referred to P SO. (Attachments: #1 Rejection letters, #2 env, pm 6-26-20)(JLS)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1) Pla's #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED; 2) Pla's #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Section 1915 requires an inmate to pay the $350 filing fee as set forth below; 3) w/I 28 days from the date of this Order Pla must pay $60.01 to the clerk as an initial partial filing fee; 4) the Clerk shall open an account in Shearer's name for receipt of payments. The clerk shall complete a Form EDKY 525 containing (1) pla name, (2) his inmate # and (3) this case number. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order and the Notice of Payment Form upon the warden and upon the Office of General Counsel for the DOC in Frankfort, KY; 5) Each month Shearer's custodian shall send the clerk a payment equal to 20% of Shearer's income the preceeding month, but only if the amount exceeds $10.00 and payment shall continue until the $350. is paid; 6) Shearer must immediately advise the Clerk of any change in address. FAILURE TO DO SO MAY RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS CASE; 7) This matter stands submitted for initial screening. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 6/19/20. (JLS)cc: CORand Kenneth Shearer by US Mail, Warden and DOC w/appropriate forms
June 16, 2020 ***MOTIONS SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kenneth Shearer, pro se (KSS)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KSS)
June 16, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kenneth Shearer, pro se. (received in envelope with complaint) Motions referred to P SO. (KSS)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kenneth Shearer. (KSS)
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Shearer, pro se (received in envelope with complaint) Motions referred to P SO. (KSS)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO filed by Kenneth Shearer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Medical Footwear documents, #2 Exhibit B-EKCC Medical Notes by N.P. Nolan, #3 Exhibit C-Foot/toe amputation records, #4 Exhibit D-Grievance Process, #5 Envelope, #6 Proposed Summons)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shearer v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Frederick Kemen, MD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Shearer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?