Duvall v. Gerald et al
Plaintiff: Duane Alan Duvall
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons and B. Gerald
Case Number: 0:2020cv00070
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 6 Filing Fee Filing fee received - $ 400, receipt number 0003205 on behalf of Duane A. Duvall (KSS)
July 10, 2020 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Duane Duvall re #5 Letter : In response to your inquiry regarding receipt of your fee payment, the Clerk has not received your fee payment or the form application requesting leave to proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Duane Duvall by US Mail. (KSS)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 Letter from Duane Duvall, pro se, with envelope postmarked 7/6/20 requesting status of payment (KSS)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER : 1) the Clerk shall send Duvall the following blank forms: (a) Application to Proceed Without Prepaying (AO Form 240) and (b) Certificate of Inmate Account (Form 523); 2) Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Duvall must either pay the $400 filing fee, or properly ask to pay the filing fee in installments by completing and filing both AL Form 240 and EDKY Form 523. With respect to EDKY Form 523, Duvall is responsible for making sure that the form is certified by prison officials before he files it with the Court. If Duvall fails to take these steps within the allotted time, the Court will dismiss his case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 6/23/20.(JLS)cc: CORand Duane Alan Duvall by US Mail, w/appropriate forms
June 19, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (Referred) (JLS)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption Page)(JLS)
June 19, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to PSO, filed by Duane Alan Duvall, pro se. (Attachments: #1 Various Administrative Documents, #2 MOO from USDC 0:19-cv-100-HRW, #3 env, no pm)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duvall v. Gerald et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Justice Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Gerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Alan Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?