Doe v. Lewis County Board of Education et al
Plaintiff: K. Doe
Defendant: Timothy Underwood, Woody, Jamie L. Weddington, Tollesboro Elementary School, Lewis County Board of Education and Kenton H. Carpenter
Case Number: 0:2020cv00080
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: (1) NLT 8/21/20 counsel for parties shall CONDUCT meeting of parties as required by Rule 26(f); (2) At time of meeting, counsel for parties shall EXCHANGE the disclosures as required; (3) NLT 9/3/20, counsel for the parties shall FILE a written joint report advising the Court as listed herein. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/7/2020.(KSS)cc: COR
August 6, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review and meeting order. (JLS)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Kenton H. Carpenter.(Walther, Jeffrey)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lewis County Board of Education, Tollesboro Elementary School, Timothy Underwood, Jamie L. Weddington.(Deener, Elizabeth)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by K. Doe via Certified Mail to All Defendants. (Whittaker, Justin)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Kenton H. Carpenter, Lewis County Board of Education, Tollesboro Elementary School, Timothy Underwood, Jamie L. Weddington; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically for service (KSS)
July 2, 2020 Conflict Check run. (KSS)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4712191), filed by K. Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Underwood, #3 Summons Weddington, #4 Summons Carpenter, #5 Summons Tollesboro Elementary School, #6 Summons Lewis County Board of Education)(KSS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Lewis County Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Underwood
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie L. Weddington
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tollesboro Elementary School
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis County Board of Education
Represented By: Elizabeth Anna Deener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton H. Carpenter
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Walther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Doe
Represented By: Justin Whittaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?