Wade v. Kooinga et al
Plaintiff: Jodi Wade
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Joseph Kooinga, Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP, Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc. and O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. doing business as O'Reilly Auto Parts
Case Number: 0:2020cv00085
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for review and meeting order. (JLS)
September 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP.(Vance, Palmer)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Penske Truck Leasing Corporation.(Vance, Palmer)
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED via SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC COMPLETED on 8/11/2020(KSS)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Kooinga, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc.. (Loos, Ian)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Joseph Kooinga, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. for O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, O'Reilly Automotive, Inc.; Corporate Parent Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc. for Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc... (Edelen, Timothy)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Joseph Kooinga, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc..(Edelen, Timothy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED via SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE to Joseph Kooinga COMPLETED on 8/11/2020; O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. COMPLETED on 8/11/2020; Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc. COMPLETED on 8/11/2020; Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP COMPLETED on 8/11/2020; Penske Truck Leasing Corporation COMPLETED on 8/11/2020. (KSS)
July 17, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Joseph Kooinga, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC, O'Reilly Automotive, Inc., Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc., Penske Truck Leasing Corporation, Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP; Summons issued and returned to counsel by U.S. Mail (JLS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $400 Receipt 0003204), filed by Jodi Wade. Summons returned to counsel via U.S. Mail. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(JLS) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2020: #3 Receipt for filing fee) (KSS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wade v. Kooinga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Timothy L. Edelen
Represented By: Ian A. Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Corporation
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kooinga
Represented By: Timothy L. Edelen
Represented By: Ian A. Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penske Truck Leasing Co., LP
Represented By: Palmer G. Vance, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozark Automotive Distributors, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy L. Edelen
Represented By: Ian A. Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive, Inc. doing business as O'Reilly Auto Parts
Represented By: Timothy L. Edelen
Represented By: Ian A. Loos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Wade
Represented By: Letisha R. Bika
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?