Lewis v. Burger King Corporation
Plaintiff: Allen Lewis
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Case Number: 0:2020cv00098
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Henry R Wilhoit
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: 1) NLT 11/30/20 file motions to amend and join parties; 2) NLT 1/2/21 pla disclose experts; 2A) NLT 2/2/21 deft disclose expert; 3) NLT 30 days thereafter parties disclose rebuttal experts; 4) NLT 5/1/21 complete discovery; 5) NLT 6/30/21 file dispositive motions; 6) FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 9/20/2021 at 01:30 PM in ASHLAND before Judge Henry R. Wilhoit Jr.; 7) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel file witness list, list of exhibits, pretrial memorandum (8) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel submit to Chambers copy of each documentary exhibit (9) NLT 7 days prior to PTC, counsel formulate Agreed proposed jury instructions (10) At time of PTC counsel to file agreed proposed jury instructions (11) At time of PTC, counsel shall file any objections to use of depos or admissibility of exhibits. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 10/14/20.(JLS)cc: COR
October 13, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Freel, James)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Burger King Corporation. (Freel, James)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: (1) NLT 9/9/20 counsel for parties shall CONDUCT meeting as required (2) At time of meeting, counsel for parties shall EXCHANGE disclosures required (3) NLT 9/21/20 counsel for parties to FILE a written joint report of the meeting. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/19/20.(KSS)cc: COR
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the removal of this action shall be sustained. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 8/19/20.(KSS)cc: COR
August 18, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Wilhoit for jurisdictional review: #1 Notice of Removal. (JLS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, James P. Freel. #1 Notice of Removal has been filed by Burger King Corporation without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (JLS)
August 18, 2020 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Burger King Corporation, contained as part of the State Court Record in DE #1 at Exhibit 1.(JLS)
August 18, 2020 Conflict Check run. (JLS)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Boyd Circuit Court, Division I, case number 20-CI-129. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4751716), filed by Burger King Corporation. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record)(JLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Burger King Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Lewis
Represented By: Daniel Luke Vincent
Represented By: Andrew Kenneth Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Represented By: Brian Michael Gudalis
Represented By: James P. Freel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?