Hale v. C R Bard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Pamela Hale
Defendant: McKesson Corporation, C R Bard Inc, Does 1 through 100 and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 0:2020cv00111
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Joseph M Hood
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Melissa Dorman Matthews Esq. and Jordan E. Jarreau, Esq. are GRANTED leave to withdraw as counsel of record for dfts C R Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., and McKesson Corporation. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED that Ms. Matthews and Ms. Jarreau shall be TERMINATED as counsel of record. Attorneys Melissa Foster Bird, Esq. and Megan Basham Davis, Esq. shall remain as counsel of record for those defendants. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/3/2020.(KSS)cc: COR
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: (1) Dfts C.R.Bard, Inc., and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., are ordered to SHOW CAUSE no later than Friday, September 25, 2020why this Court should not dismiss as moot their Motion to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plf's Claims for lack of personal jurisdiction DE #2 ; (2) Dft McKesson Corporation is ordered to SHOW CAUSE no later than Friday, September 25, 2020 why this Court should not dismiss as moot their Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plfs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction DE #11 . Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 9/3/20.(KSS)cc: COR
September 3, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bird, Melissa)
September 3, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Foster Bird on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Bird, Melissa)
September 3, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Hood for review: #29 Order Reassigning Case (JLS)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER : the above-styled matter is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Judge Joseph M. Hood, Judge, EDKY, for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Henry R. Wilhoit, Jr on 9/3/20.(JLS)cc: COR
September 3, 2020 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Wilhoit for review: CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern. (TDA)
September 3, 2020 Conflict Check run. (TDA)
September 3, 2020 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Northern. Case number 3:20-cv-02729. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. cc: COR w/ docket sheet
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #20 Motion to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out-of-State Plaintiffs' Cases. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to sever and transfer this action as follows: a. Plaintiff Maydelin Espinoza's case be severed and transferred to the Miami Division of the Southern District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2725 opened); b. Plaintiff Ana Gomez's case be severed and transferred to the Fort Myers Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2726 opened); c. Plaintiff Merrylene Green's case be severed and transferred to the Jacksonville Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2727 opened); d. Plaintiff Phillip Grimes's case be severed and transferred to the Louisville Division of the Western District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2728 opened); e. Plaintiff Pamela Hale's case be severed and transferred to the Ashland Division of the Eastern District of Kentucky (Civil case 3:20-cv-2729 opened); f. Plaintiff Saladeem Hines's case be severed and transferred to the Manhattan Division of the Southern District of New York (Civil case 3:20-cv-2730 opened); g. Plaintiff Bridgette Ismond's case be severed and transferred to the Tampa Division of the Middle District of Florida (Civil case 3:20-cv-2731 opened); h. Plaintiff Spencer Knowles's case be severed and transferred to the Muskogee Division of the Eastern District of Oklahoma (Civil case 3:20-cv-2732 opened); i. Plaintiff Samantha Mlsna's case be severed and transferred to the Madison Division of the Western District of Wisconsin (Civil case 3:20-cv-2733 opened); j. Plaintiff Kenneth Moore's case be severed and transferred to the Kansas City Division of the District of Kansas (Civil case 3:20-cv-2734 opened); k. Plaintiff Vandlean Mosier's case be severed and transferred to the Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California (Civil case 3:20-cv-2735 opened); l. Plaintiff Albert Noel's case be severed and transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana (Civil case 3:20-cv-2736 opened); m. Plaintiff Nancy Prescott's case be severed and transferred to the Nashville Division of the Middle District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2737 opened); n. Plaintiff John Reynold's case be severed and transferred to the Atlanta Division of the Northern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2738 opened); o. Plaintiff Eddie Tate's case be severed and transferred to the Chattanooga Division of the Eastern District of Tennessee (Civil case 3:20-cv-2740 opened); p. Plaintiff Melba Wooten's case be severed and transferred to the Waycross Division of the Southern District of Georgia (Civil case 3:20-cv-2741 opened). Plaintiff Vickie Ingram is the sole plaintiff with any connection to this forum. Accordingly, she shall remain in the Dallas Division of the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/31/2020) (jmg) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #24 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases, #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Jarreau, Jordan) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
August 27, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Albert Noel (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re: #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 22 Appendix in Support filed by Maydelin Espinosa, Ana Gomez, Merrylene Green, Phillip Grimes, Pamela Hale, Saladeem Hines, Vicke Ingram, Bridgette Ismond, Spencer Knowles, Samantha Mlsna, Kenneth Moore, Vandlean Mosier, Albert Noel, Nancy Prescott, John Reynolds, Eddie Tate, Melba Wooten re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 21 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Maydelin Espinosa, Ana Gomez, Merrylene Green, Phillip Grimes, Pamela Hale, Saladeem Hines, Vicke Ingram, Bridgette Ismond, Spencer Knowles, Samantha Mlsna, Kenneth Moore, Vandlean Mosier, Albert Noel, Nancy Prescott, John Reynolds, Eddie Tate, Melba Wooten re #20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Sever and Transfer Venue of Out of State Plaintiffs' Cases filed by Maydelin Espinosa, Ana Gomez, Merrylene Green, Phillip Grimes, Pamela Hale, Saladeem Hines, Vicke Ingram, Bridgette Ismond, Spencer Knowles, Samantha Mlsna, Kenneth Moore, Vandlean Mosier, Albert Noel, Nancy Prescott, John Reynolds, Eddie Tate, Melba Wooten (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
August 6, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE filed by Maydelin Espinosa, Ana Gomez, Merrylene Green, Phillip Grimes, Pamela Hale, Saladeem Hines, Vicke Ingram, Bridgette Ismond, Spencer Knowles, Samantha Mlsna, Kenneth Moore, Vandlean Mosier, Albert Noel, Nancy Prescott, John Reynolds, Eddie Tate, Melba Wooten re: #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-Of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms For Each Plaintiff filed by Maydelin Espinosa, Ana Gomez, Merrylene Green, Phillip Grimes, Pamela Hale, Saladeem Hines, Vicke Ingram, Bridgette Ismond, Spencer Knowles, Samantha Mlsna, Kenneth Moore, Vandlean Mosier, Albert Noel, Nancy Prescott, John Reynolds, Eddie Tate, Melba Wooten (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Completed Forms for Each Plaintiff re: #16 Order, filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: To assist the Court, counsel for all parties shall complete the form attached hereto as Exhibit A for each Plaintiff in this action. The parties shall file their completed forms on or before 7/22/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/16/2020) (oyh) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court grants the parties' Agreed Motion for Leave to Extend the Time for Plaintiff to File Responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Defendants' Replies to Those Responses [ECF No. #13 ]. Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by 8/27/2020. Defendants shall file their reply, if any, by 9/26/2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 7/9/2020) (ndt) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 9, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 14 replaced with the flattened document on 7/10/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-Of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, #12 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion, #3 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Maydelin Espinosa, Ana Gomez, Merrylene Green, Phillip Grimes, Pamela Hale, Saladeem Hines, Vicke Ingram, Bridgette Ismond, Spencer Knowles, Samantha Mlsna, Kenneth Moore, Vandlean Mosier, Albert Noel, Nancy Prescott, John Reynolds, Eddie Tate, Melba Wooten (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Schulte, Steven) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by McKesson Corporation (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Judge Jane J. Boyle no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/2/2020) (oyh) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 7/6/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 7/6/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,. . (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet Supplement, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-2016 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - P's Original Petition & Jury Demand, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C. R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Return of Service - C. R. Bard, Inc., #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) (Attachment 1 and 2 replaced with the flattened document on 7/2/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. re #2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-Of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-Of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc. (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C. R. Bard, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10960987) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-2016 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - P's Orig Petition & Jury Demand, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C. R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Return of Service - C. R. Bard, Inc., #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.) (Matthews, Melissa) [Transferred from txnd on 9/3/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hale v. C R Bard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Inc
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Dorman Matthews
Represented By: Jordan E. Jarreau
Represented By: Melissa Foster Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Hale
Represented By: Steve Schulte
Represented By: Eric Martin Przybysz
Represented By: Darren McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?