Gilbert et al v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: |
John Gilbert and Tammy Gilbert |
Defendant: |
Jane and John Does, Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,, Propst Distributing, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Propst Manufacturing, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company and Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2011cv00184 |
Filed: |
August 26, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Covington Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Danny C. Reeves |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 2, 2012 |
Filing
111
MEMORANDUM ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANYS SECOND MASTER MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN 34 CASES; 1. To the extent that the plaintiffs consolidated opposition to Lillys motion is construed as a motion to continue or a motio n to hold the Courts ruling in abeyance, those requests and/or motions are DENIED. 2. Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Second Master Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [MDL Record No. 1537] is DENIED with regard to Marler v. Eli Lilly and Compan y, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-375- DCR (R. 48). The motion is GRANTED in the remaining above captioned cases. 3. With the exception of Marler v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-375-DCR, the claims asserted by the plaintiffs against Defendant Eli Lilly and Company in the above-captioned cases are DISMISSED, with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/2/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(LST)cc: COR
|
April 18, 2012 |
Filing
84
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS, INC.'S AND DEFENDANT ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS: the motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction filed by Defendants Endo Pharmaceuti cals Holdings, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [MDL Record No. 466] is GRANTED. The claims asserted against Defendants Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. in the following fourteen actions are DISMISSED, without pr ejudice: Civil Action No. 2: 11-184- DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-185-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-186-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-191-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-195-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-196-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-197-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-200-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-206-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-210-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-213-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-221-DCR, Civil Action No. 2: 11-295- DCR, and Civil Action No. 2: 11-325-DCR. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/18/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?