Jones et al v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: George Vercher, Cynthia Petrie, Robert Jones, Castadera McGee, Melvina Otillio, Linda Quey, Mary Woodward, Wilfred Marcotte, Lisa Stevens, Donald Petrie, Dennis Tisdale, Octavia Raymond, Cora Louque, Mary Sapia, Kathryn Roussell, Willis Percy, Samantha Williams, Vincent Salamone, Rosemary Swanner, Dorothy Mendel, Larry Prestenbach, Charles Loftin, Courtney Matthews, Veronica Washington, Bonnie Orgeron, Marlene Mancuso, Catherine LeBoeuf, Ray Kendrick, Charlotte Swible, Marin Vaughn, Audrey Percy, Bruce Zeringue, Norman Woodridge, Michael Sapia, Mary Morales, Arthur Millet, Julian Parker, David Orgeron, Jill Sawyer, Alice Taylor, Joanne Paige, Bessie Littleton, Arthur Major, Marshall Vaughn, Doris Salamone, Donna Mitchell, Lance Broussard, Sr., William D. Mitchell, Allison Juge, Andreas Borer, Randolph Simmons, Robert Schexnaydre, Jr., Ramona Lindley, Eva Moffett, Carolyn Serpas, Martha Overbay, Larry Kastner, Ridgie Louque, Kent Charles, Rose Orfanello, Sheila Stewart, Robert Woodward, Robbie Maas, Sr., Barbara Stelly, Armand Mataya, Sr., John Swible, Jr., Charles Daggs, Jr., Daisy Valle, Belinda Lee, Louis Malbrough, Thomas Mitchell, Rafael Moreno, Calvin Stewart, Jr., Louis Price, Sr., Edith Williams, Peggy Zeringue, Linda Tisdale, Kevin Zamjahn, Judy Young, Rita Kastner, Lois Tate, Michell Vogel, Michael Mosley, Stephanie Jones, Mary Price, Patricia Talbert, Betty Lofton, Kim Stewart, Lynne Wilhelm, Judas Littleton, April Schexnaydre, Debby Jones, Terry Williamson, Mark Lee, Sr., Jack Norman Serpas, Carol Zamjahn, Joyce Martinez, Bernadette Patin, Joseph Stelly, Charles Quey, Fred Young, Linda Luquette, Valerie Vercher, Brenda McGee, Geraldine Marcotte, Billy Rodrigue, Vivian Albert Overbay, Bruce Luquette, Stephen Quick, Gail Jones, Marlene Rodrigue, Mytrice Perry, Bobbie Sue Pierce, Janette Savoie, Russell Morales, Louis Martinez, Jr., Christina Woodridge, Renee Mataya, Dianne Salvant, James Swanner, Rhonda Parker, William Romair and Susan McMullen
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Teva Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Generics International (US PARENT), Inc., aaiPharma Inc, Generics International (US), Inc., NeoSan Pharmaceuticals Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC, Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Covidien Inc., AAI Development Services, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., aaiPharma LLC, Brenn Manufacturing, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Mallinckrodt, Inc., Covidien PLC, Generics Bidco II, LLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Brenn Distribution, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Propst Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2011cv00349
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Covington Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Danny C Reeves
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2014 Filing 172 MANDATE of USCA as to (2350 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 69 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Louann Fisher-Smith, (2205 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 208 in 2:11-cv-00300-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Carla Jo Green, (2371 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 204 in 2:11-cv-00195-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Kay Hallaway, Jerry Hallaway, (2032 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 97 in 2:11-cv-00360-DCR, 95 in 2:11-cv-00362-DCR, 95 in 2:11-cv-00367-DCR, 100 in 2:11-cv-00371-DCR, 91 in 2:11-cv-00366-DCR, 96 in 2:11-cv-00370-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Bobby York, Randall Guess, James Turner, Hazel Hack, Larry Altstatt, Willard Sapp, (71 in 2:12-cv-00218-DCR, 2792 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Nelson Capitano, (2795 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 57 in 2:12-cv-00252-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Terry Danny King, (2388 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 90 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Cindy Hawthorne, Forest Hawthorne, (2168 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 118 in 2:11-cv-00184-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Tammy Gilbert, John Gilbert, (37 in 2:12-cv-00068-DCR, 2037 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Roberta Dunn, (2387 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 165 in 2:11-cv-00295-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Diane Dickerson, (78 in 2:11-cv-00399-DCR, 2165 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Herman Douglas, (56 in 2:12-cv-00250-DCR, 2797 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Vicie Carolyn Stafford, Mark Randal Stafford, (2060 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 109 in 2:11-cv-00359-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Betty Boggess, (2573 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 78 in 2:12-cv-00040-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Jan Harper, William Harper, (2049 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 15 in 2:12-cv-00155-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Constance Gianoli, (83 in 2:11-cv-00254-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00279-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00265-DCR, 78 in 2:11-cv-00303-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00280-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00275-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00251-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00272-DCR, 81 in 2:11-cv-00289-DCR, 78 in 2:11-cv-00306-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00239-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00244-DCR, 82 in 2:11-cv-00261-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00281-DCR, 78 in 2:11-cv-00302-DCR, 1829 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00260-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00257-DCR, 86 in 2:11-cv-00249-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Joyce Gore, Leslie Simering, Arthur Williams, Louis Cossentino, Charles Bennett, Annie Ruth Thomas, Marna Sletten, Calvin Satterwhite, Diana Freeland, Randy Cool, Etta Lejeune, Tracey L. Burgess, Kenneth Mason, Marcella Alder, Troy Brown, Paula K. Matney, Rodney Jones, Melvin Daniels, (2349 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 82 in 2:12-cv-00062-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Randy Chavez, (86 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 2389 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal,, filed by Kacie Reynolds, (42 in 2:12-cv-00074-DCR, 2043 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Andrea Morel, (2242 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 94 in 2:11-cv-00357-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Betty Shackelford, Howard Shackelford, (174 in 2:11-cv-00175-DCR, 1904 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Kristine Esposito, (2038 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 37 in 2:12-cv-00080-DCR, 41 in 2:12-cv-00074-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Andrea Morel, Lue F. Angell, (88 in 2:11-cv-00198-DCR, 2413 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Clara Cross, (57 in 2:12-cv-00251-DCR, 2798 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Alma S. Trent, Thomas R. Trent, (2061 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 106 in 2:11-cv-00372-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Clara Miller, (217 in 2:11-cv-00191-DCR, 2385 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Mary Ann Kellehar, (183 in 2:11-cv-00182-DCR, 2202 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Jean Alix, Philip Alix, (1590 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 65 in 2:11-cv-00212-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Janice Cook, (2589 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 117 in 2:11-cv-00347-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Deborah Zickefoose, Gary Zickefoose, (2217 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 205 in 2:11-cv-00190-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Theresa Eldredge, (2447 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 72 in 2:12-cv-00049-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Rose Marie Sinkler, (1876 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 59 in 2:11-cv-00400-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Rebecca McCrary, (38 in 2:12-cv-00080-DCR, 2044 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Lue F. Angell, (35 in 2:12-cv-00150-DCR, 2507 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald Jacob, (78 in 2:12-cv-00066-DCR, 2369 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2166 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 28 in 2:12-cv-00159-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald Schadle, (2799 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 62 in 2:12-cv-00254-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Tina R. Tye, (91 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 2390 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Cathey Holland, (2203 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 123 in 2:11-cv-00329-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Shannon Felts, (1592 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 71 in 2:11-cv-00199-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Deborah E. Kinter, (51 in 2:12-cv-00242-DCR, 2793 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Jeffrey A. Bennett, (96 in 2:11-cv-00401-DCR, 2373 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Archange A.J. Olivier, Jr., Christine Olivier, (2381 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 86 in 2:11-cv-00337-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Rex Gibson, Kenneth Brookins, (2384 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 210 in 2:11-cv-00186-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Carolyn West, (2206 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 205 in 2:11-cv-00296-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph F. Labit, (110 in 2:11-cv-00379-DCR, 2062 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Jannifer Jones, (119 in 2:11-cv-00325-DCR, 2377 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Jimmie Louise Sandel, (2382 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 144 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Debby Jones, (2794 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 56 in 2:12-cv-00249-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Frances Bennett, (2222 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 194 in 2:11-cv-00189-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory P. Trimboli, (2204 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 202 in 2:11-cv-00298-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Spencer G. Forrest, (65 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 2352 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Paulette Linville, (96 in 2:11-cv-00355-DCR, 2392 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Calvin Wagers, (11 in 2:12-cv-00208-DCR, 2411 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Sheris Nash, (69 in 2:11-cv-00209-DCR, 1588 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Jackson Germain, Yanise Germain, (2397 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 155 in 2:11-cv-00210-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Joseph Simpson, (2208 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 113 in 2:11-cv-00330-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Agnes Smith, (2383 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 93 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Shirley Smith, Glen Smith, Chris Puckett, Rose E. Morefield, Paul Morefield, Morsie Pearson-Wright, James H. DeVine, Geneva DeVine, Patrick Garrett, (2391 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 223 in 2:11-cv-00185-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Elizabeth Hunsucker, (2207 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 197 in 2:11-cv-00299-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Bobbie A. Noel, (2351 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 100 in 2:11-cv-00396-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Gladys Hines, (2209 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 119 in 2:11-cv-00331-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Martha Turner, (95 in 2:11-cv-00358-DCR, 2241 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Helen Nicholson, Steven Nicholson, (2240 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 73 in 2:12-cv-00013-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Donna Adegbayi, (133 in 2:11-cv-00204-DCR, 2590 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by James Daugherty, Doris Daugherty, (16 in 2:12-cv-00259-DCR, 2508 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Walter D. Coney, (2374 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 101 in 2:11-cv-00215-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Marshall Juergens, (2386 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 181 in 2:11-cv-00213-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by David Lynch, (12 in 2:12-cv-00241-DCR, 2490 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Elizabeth Hunsucker, (2796 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 56 in 2:12-cv-00253-DCR) Notice of Appeal filed by Roger Lee Moss, Paulette Faith Moss Associated Cases:2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(STC)
June 27, 2014 Filing 171 INFORMATION COPY OF ORDER/JUDGMENT of USCA as to (2350 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 69 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2205 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 208 in 2:11-cv-00300-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2371 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 204 in 2:11-cv-00195-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2032 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 97 in 2:11-cv-00360-DCR, 95 in 2:11-cv-00362-DCR, 95 in 2:11-cv-00367-DCR, 100 in 2:11-cv-00371-DCR, 91 in 2:11-cv-00366-DCR, 96 in 2:11-cv-00370-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (71 in 2:12-cv-00218-DCR, 2792 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2795 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 57 in 2:12-cv-00252-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2388 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 90 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2168 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 118 in 2:11-cv-00184-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (37 in 2:12-cv-00068-DCR, 2037 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2387 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 165 in 2:11-cv-00295-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (78 in 2:11-cv-00399-DCR, 2165 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (56 in 2:12-cv-00250-DCR, 2797 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2060 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 109 in 2:11-cv-00359-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2573 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 78 in 2:12-cv-00040-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2049 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 15 in 2:12-cv-00155-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (83 in 2:11-cv-00254-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00279-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00265-DCR, 78 in 2:11-cv-00303-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00280-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00275-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00251-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00272-DCR, 81 in 2:11-cv-00289-DCR, 78 in 2:11-cv-00306-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00239-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00244-DCR, 82 in 2:11-cv-00261-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00281-DCR, 78 in 2:11-cv-00302-DCR, 1829 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00260-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00257-DCR, 86 in 2:11-cv-00249-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2349 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 82 in 2:12-cv-00062-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (86 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 2389 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (42 in 2:12-cv-00074-DCR, 2043 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2242 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 94 in 2:11-cv-00357-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (174 in 2:11-cv-00175-DCR, 1904 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2038 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 37 in 2:12-cv-00080-DCR, 41 in 2:12-cv-00074-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (88 in 2:11-cv-00198-DCR, 2413 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (57 in 2:12-cv-00251-DCR, 2798 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2061 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 106 in 2:11-cv-00372-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (217 in 2:11-cv-00191-DCR, 2385 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (183 in 2:11-cv-00182-DCR, 2202 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (1590 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 65 in 2:11-cv-00212-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2589 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 117 in 2:11-cv-00347-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2217 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 205 in 2:11-cv-00190-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2447 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 72 in 2:12-cv-00049-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (1876 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 59 in 2:11-cv-00400-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (38 in 2:12-cv-00080-DCR, 2044 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (35 in 2:12-cv-00150-DCR, 2507 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (78 in 2:12-cv-00066-DCR, 2369 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2166 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 28 in 2:12-cv-00159-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2799 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 62 in 2:12-cv-00254-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (91 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 2390 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2203 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 123 in 2:11-cv-00329-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (1592 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 71 in 2:11-cv-00199-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (51 in 2:12-cv-00242-DCR, 2793 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (96 in 2:11-cv-00401-DCR, 2373 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2381 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 86 in 2:11-cv-00337-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2384 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 210 in 2:11-cv-00186-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2206 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 205 in 2:11-cv-00296-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (110 in 2:11-cv-00379-DCR, 2062 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (119 in 2:11-cv-00325-DCR, 2377 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2382 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 144 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2794 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 56 in 2:12-cv-00249-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2222 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 194 in 2:11-cv-00189-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2204 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 202 in 2:11-cv-00298-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (65 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 2352 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (96 in 2:11-cv-00355-DCR, 2392 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (11 in 2:12-cv-00208-DCR, 2411 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (69 in 2:11-cv-00209-DCR, 1588 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2397 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 155 in 2:11-cv-00210-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2208 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 113 in 2:11-cv-00330-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2383 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 93 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2391 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 223 in 2:11-cv-00185-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2207 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 197 in 2:11-cv-00299-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2351 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 100 in 2:11-cv-00396-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2209 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 119 in 2:11-cv-00331-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (95 in 2:11-cv-00358-DCR, 2241 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2240 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 73 in 2:12-cv-00013-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (133 in 2:11-cv-00204-DCR, 2590 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (16 in 2:12-cv-00259-DCR, 2508 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2374 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 101 in 2:11-cv-00215-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2386 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 181 in 2:11-cv-00213-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (12 in 2:12-cv-00241-DCR, 2490 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, (2796 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 56 in 2:12-cv-00253-DCR) Notice of Appeal: the judgment of the district is AFFIRMED in its entirety, except for the claims in Dickerson (2387 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 165 in 2:11-cv-00295-DCR) which are REVERSED. (Attachments: #1 Judgment, #2 Cover Letter - Mandate to Issue)Associated Cases:2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
January 31, 2014 Filing 170 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/27/2014 before Judge Danny C. Reeves; 1)PENDING CASES: Counsel for Defendants Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Eli Lilly and Company, Inc. advised the court of the status of seven pending cases. Comments were also received from counsel for Plaintiff Gay Hurst in Civil Action No. 2:12-26-DCR. 2)UPDATE ON RELATED LITIGATION: Counsel for Defendants Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Eli Lilly and Company, Inc. advised the Court that cases pending before the United States Court of Appeals for the 6th Circuit having been fully briefed but a date for oral argument has not been set. The parties are awaiting a decision regarding matters pending before the United States Court of Appeals for the 9th Circuit and the Supreme Court of Alabama (Court Reporter JOAN AVERDICK.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. (LST)cc: COR, Pro Se Plaintiffs 2:12-228, 2:11-373; 2:12-247; 2:12-270,
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, parties notified of following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the Status Conference currently scheduled for Monday, January 27, 2014: I. Status of Pending Cases, II. Update on Related Litigation. Clerk directed to forward copy of this Agenda to pro se plts in 2:12-228; 2:11-373; 2:12-247; and 2:12-270. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/22/2014.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(STC)cc: COR,Pro Se Plts 2:12-228; 2:11-373; 2:12-247; 2:12-270
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 AMENDED ORDER: 1. The Court's November 6, 2013 Order [MDL Record No. 2885] is AMENDED to reflect that this matter is set for a STATUS CONFERENCE on Monday, January 27, 2014, at 1:30 p.m., at the US District Court in Covington, Ky. All Plaintiffs' counsel and unrepresented Plaintiffs with cases then-pending in this multi-district litigation shall participate in the Status Conference to address the continued litigation of their cases, including discovery matters. Plaintiffs' Appellate Liaison Counsel may appear by telephone. 2. All other portions of the November 6, 2013 Order [Record No. 2885] shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/6/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Cov Diary, Burneva Williams
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER: (1) VACATING PLAINTIFFS' LEADERSHIP APPPOINTMENTS The Court previously entered three Orders appointing various Plaintiffs' counsel to serve in leadership positions. Those Orders are dated October 4, 2011 [MDL Record No. 200], December 28, 2011 [MDL Record No. 797], and September 5, 2012 [MDL Record No. 2187] The portions of those Orders with respect to Plaintiffs' leadership structure are hereby VACATED. Effective immediately, Plaintiffs' appointed counsel are relieved of the leadership responsibilities and obligations described in those Orders. Except as stated in Part 6 below, all other portions of those Orders remain in effect. Going forward, all of the Plaintiffs attorneys and unrepresented parties with cases pending in this multi-district litigation either now or in the foreseeable future will remain solely responsible for all matters relating to their individual cases. (2) APPOINTING CO-LIAISON PLAINTIFFS' APPELLATE COUNSEL Plaintiffs' Appellate Liaison Counsel will correspond with the Court regarding the appellate proceedings as described below. The Court appoints the following attorneys asPlaintiffs' Appellate Liaison Counsel: Richard W. Schulte & Matthew J. Sill. Plaintiffs' Appellate Liaison Counsel shall discharge the following duties:(a) Maintain a list of cases from this multi-district litigation that are on appealin the Sixth Circuit, including the MDL and appellate docket numbers, the parties' names, andthe contact information for Plaintiffs' counsel.(b) Distribute upon request to the Court and/or Plaintiffs' counsel in theappeals a copy of the list described above and basic information regarding the progress of theappeals. Unless otherwise ordered as a matter of necessity, Plaintiffs Appellate Liaison Counselshall not be required to attend status or other conferences in person, and instead can provide theirreports via writing or by telephone.(3) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER On October 4, 2011, this Court entered Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1.[MDL Record No. 199] The portions of that Order that deal with Plaintiffs' counsels' leadershipstructure and their attendance at status conferences are hereby VACATED, effectiveimmediately. All other parts of that Order remain in effect.(4) COMMON BENEFIT ORDER The Court previously entered two Orders establishing and outlining terms of a CommonBenefit Fund, dated December 28, 2011, [MDL Document No. 794], and January 12, 2012.[MDL Document No. 874] Those Orders are VACATED. In the event the Court's prior Ordersof Dismissal and Orders of Judgment on the Pleadings are remanded by the Sixth Circuit, theparties may move for reinstatement of these Orders. (5) STATUS CONFERENCE This matter is set for a status conference on Monday, January 27, 2013, beginning atthe hour of 1:30 p.m., at the United States District Court in Covington, Kentucky. All Plaintiffs'counsel and unrepresented Plaintiffs with cases then-pending in this multi-district litigation shallparticipate in the Status Conference to address the continued litigation of their cases, includingdiscovery matters. Plaintiffs' Appellate Liaison Counsel may appear by telephone.(6) ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' STEERING COMMITTEE LEADERSHIP & CONTACT INFORMATION The Court's Order dated October 4, 2011 [MDL Record No. 200], is hereby AMENDEDto remove the law firm of Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP, and replace it withQuinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP in the list of four firms that comprise the Defendants'Steering Committee. In addition, the Courts May 25, 2012 Order [MDL Record No. 1886], ismodified to reflect the following new contact information for counsel for Generics International(US Parent), Inc.; Generics International (US), Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC; Generics Bidco II,LLC; and Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC: Rachel B. Passaretti-Wu, Esq.Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP51 Madison Avenue, 22nd FloorNew York, NY 10010. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 11/6/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Clerk 6CCA, Clerk JPMDL, Burneva Williams Modified text on 11/6/2013 (CBD).
October 28, 2013 Filing 166 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 10/21/2013 before Judge Danny C. Reeves: 1) Within fifteen days of this status conference, counsel for the parties shall prepare and tender to the Court a draft Order to amend the terms of the Court's prior orders establishing Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee and Plaintiffs' Steering Committee (including, but not limited to, Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, dated October 4, 2011 [MDL Record No. 199]; and Order dated October 4, 2011 [MDL Record No. 200]). The proposed order shall address establishment of a Plaintiffs' Appellate Committee as well as other modifications that the parties wish to address. Although not specifically discussed during the Status Conference, the parties shall also address the Court's Order Outlining Terms of the Common Benefit Fund dated January 12, 2012 [MDL Record No. 874] and the Order Regarding Appointment of Plaintiff's Liaison Counsel, dated December 28, 2011 [MDL Record No. 794]. 2) A telephone conference will be scheduled in approximately 60 days to allow the parties to provide the Court with a further status report. 3) Due to the expected modification of the Case Management Orders referenced above, counsel for individual plaintiffs in all remaining cases are expected to attend (in person) future Status Conferences and hearings. (Court Reporter Joan Averdick.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. (CBD)cc: COR, copies to Burneva Williams and Randy Gori via US Mail. Modified cc on 10/28/2013 (CBD).
October 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, the parties are notified of the following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the Status Conference currently scheduled for Monday, October 21, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. EST. (I.) Plaintiffs' Overdue Responses to Defendants' Deficiency Letters and Delinquent Physician Certifications (II.) Update on Related Litigation (III.) Stephens, et al., v. McKesson Corp., et al., Civil Action No. 3: 13- 4406 (IV.) Continuation and Structure of MDL and MDL Leadership. The parties should be prepared to address the plaintiffs' proposals concerning the continued litigation of this MDL proceeding in light of the numerous appeals pending before the United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit, as well as their suggestions concerning the structure of leadership roles moving forward. In the event the attorneys have not discussed the items outlined above, they are directed to confer in advance of the upcoming Status Conference in a good faith effort to reach agreement to the extent that such is feasible. Additionally, the parties have requested the Court's permission to participate in the Status Conference by telephone. This request is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/8/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER: STATUS CONFERENCE in this matter shall be held on 10/21/2013 at 01:30 PM at the US Courthouse in in COVINGTON, Ky. The parties shall submit proposed agendas not less than fourteen (14) days prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/20/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, B. Williams, Cov Diary
July 30, 2013 Filing 163 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/29/2013 before Judge Danny C. Reeves; 1)Parties indicated that new deadlines for plas' fact sheets, product identification discovery responses, and discovery concerning cumulative/latent injuries have been agreed upon for the cases in which they were overdue, with the exception of Shaw, et al. v. Eli Lilly & Co., et al. (Civil Action No. 2:12-243-DCR) and Zgoda v. Eli Lilly & Co., et al. (Civil Action No. 2:13-66-DCR). In the event that the parties are unable to agree to a new deadline for those plas to provide the required discovery, the defs may file a motion requesting the entry of an order directing the plas to show cause why their claims should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute; 2)Xanodyne has reached an agreement w/plas regarding search terms for their Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"). If Eli Lilly and the plas cannot resolve their dispute over ESI search terms, they shall file simultaneous briefs on this issue on or before 9/3/2013. Responses will be due 10 days thereafter, at which time the briefs will stand submitted; 3)Parties are directed to confer and submit proposed dates for the next Status Conference. In that submission, parties should indicate whether they wish to set aside time for an informal meeting concerning settlement; 4)Prior to the next Status Conference, the current leadership for the plas shall communicate w/counsel for plas who have cases remaining in this MDL proceeding and prepare a list of suggestions for the leadership going forward. (Court Reporter JOAN AVERDICK.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. Signed by Danny C. Reeves. (LST)cc: COR
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, the parties are notified of the following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the Status Conference currently scheduled for July 29, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. EST. I. Overdue Product Identification Discovery Responses and Fact Sheets. II; Evidence of Cumulative/Latent Injury; III. Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"); IV. Update on Related Litigation; V. Mutual Pharm. Co. v. Bartlett, No. 12-142 (June 24, 2013); VI. Continuation and Structure of MDL and MDL Leadership. In the event counsel have not discussed the items outlined above, they are directed to confer in advance of the upcoming Status Conference in a good faith effort to reach agreement to the extent that such is feasible. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/24/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting (93 in 2:13-cv-00074-DCR, 2743 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 68 in 2:13-cv-00075-DCR, 110 in 2:13-cv-00076-DCR, 79 in 2:13-cv-00073-DCR) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney, Brian S. Inamine, by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Under the circumstances presented, this attorney is relieved of the obligation of appearing at the hearing scheduled for July 29, 2013. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/12/2013. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR Modified text (atty name) on 7/15/2013 (CBD).
July 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER: In light of the United States Supreme Court's recent decision in Mutual Pharmaceutical Co. v. Bartlett, No. 12-142 (June 24, 2013), prior representations of counsel regarding the effect of Bartlett on this litigation, and the Courts previous Order staying discovery through June 30, 2013 [MDL Record No. 2632], it is hereby ORDERED that a STATUS CONFERENCE shall be held on 7/29/2013 at 01:30 PM at the U.S. Courthouse in COVINGTON, Ky. The parties shall submit proposed agendas not less than seven (7) days prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/11/2013. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Cov Clerk, Cov Diary (Burneva Williams, Rita Ballesteros and Claudia Hall via US Mail) Modified cc on 7/11/2013 (CBD).
May 24, 2013 Filing 159 NOTICE by Eli Lilly and Company re 5/6/13 Hearing (2678 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Order,,,, Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Larimore, Mary) Modified to add text on 5/28/2013 (CMR).
May 24, 2013 Filing 158 NOTICE: During the hearing held on May 6, 2013, the parties were requested to designate one plaintiffs representative and one defendants' representative to jointly contact the Court for the purpose of selecting a date for an informal status conference. [MDL Record No. 2625] Following the hearing, Richard Schulte was designated as the plaintiffs' representative with Mary Larrimore being designated as the defendants' representative. The call was scheduled for May 16, 2013, beginning at 12:15 p.m. Although Mr. Schulte and the undersigned joined the call at the appointed time, Ms. Larrimore did not. Later, the parties submitted proposed dates for the informal status conference; however, those dates conflict with other matters. Therefore, as a result of Ms. Larrimore's failure to participate or have other counsel participate in the May 16, 2013, telephone conference, the Court will be unable to schedule the matter prior to June 30, 2013. The purpose of this Notice is to provide the parties with the reason the informal status conference will not be scheduled. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/24/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
May 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: 1. The Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney [MDL Record No. 2673] is GRANTED. 2. The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Steven F. Napolitano as counsel of record in this proceeding. The parties may also remove this attorney from the service list. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/24/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
May 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting MOTION (2666 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, et al) FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Attorney Jose A. Isasi, II shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel of record in these proceedings. The parties and the Clerk of the Court may remove attorney Isasi as counsel from their service lists. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/18/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
May 17, 2013 Filing 155 MOTION to Withdraw by Teva Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. MOTION FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Cohen, Lori)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER: defendant's Motion for Withdrawal of Attorney [MDL Record No. 2655] is GRANTED. Attorney Katherine Armstrong shall be allowed to withdraw as counsel of record in these proceedings. The parties and Clerk of the Court may remove attorney Armstrong as counsel from their service lists. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/15/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY THROUGH JUNE 30, 2013: (1) The plaintiffs' request for a stay of discovery is GRANTED, in part. Except as outlined below, discovery is STAYED through June 30, 2013. (2) This limited stay does not relieve the parties of their obligation to comply with the Court's previous orders regarding product identification and plaintiffs' fact sheets. (3) The parties shall continue their ESI negotiations, as contemplated in the Court's May 6, 2013 Minute Entry Order [MDL Record No. 2625]. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/7/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER plaintiffs having submitted a request for the appointment of State Liaison Counsel. The defendants do not oppose the request and the Court being sufficiently advised, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Terms of Appointment The person who accepts the appointment to serve as State Liaison Counsel agrees to serve for the duration of the litigation or until such time as the Court determines that a change in the duration of service shall be made. (2) State Liaison Counsel The Court appoints the following attorney as State Liaison Counsel. Matthew J. Sill. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/7/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
May 7, 2013 Filing 151 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER for STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/6/2013 before Judge Danny C. Reeves: 1) Defendants indicated that new deadlines for plaintiffs' fact sheets and product identification discovery responses have been agreed upon for the cases in which they were overdue. Therefore, the parties has not asked the Court to address the matter at this time. 2) Notice will be sent in Case Nos. 11-cv-365, 11-cv-381, and 11-cv-384 to plaintiffs who are not represented by counsel to show cause why these cases should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. 3) By agreement of the parties, Matthew Sill will be appointed as State Liaison Counsel by subsequent Order. 4) The parties discussed their positions regarding progress in defining search terms for Lilly's and Xanodyne's Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") and indicated that they will likely be able to reach an agreement on this issue in the near future. While the parties do not request that the Court intervene in these discussions, they are directed to notify the Court when a final agreement is reached regarding their dispute. 5) With respect to the multi-plaintiff California cases recently transferred to the MDL Case Nos. 13-cv-58, 13-cv-60, 13-cv-61, 13-cv-73, 13-cv-74, 13-cv-75, or 13-cv-76 the briefing shall be coordinated as follows: (a) if the plaintiffs in any of the cases listed above do not intend to move for remand, they shall file a notice in the record indicating that no remand motion is forthcoming; (b) after the last remand motion or notice has been filed in the above-listed cases, the defendants shall have twenty (20) days in which to file a joint response; (c) the plaintiffs shall have fourteen (14) days after the filing of the joint response in which to file their reply or replies. 6) The plaintiffs and defendants shall each appoint one representative to jointly contact the Court for the purpose of selecting a date for an informal status conference. Signed by Danny C. Reeves. (Court Reporter Joan Averdick.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, the parties are notified of the following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the Status Conference currently scheduled for Monday, May 6, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. EST. I. Overdue Product Identification Discovery Responses and Fact Sheets The Court will hear statements from the parties regarding the cases in which product identification discovery responses have not been provided. [See defendants' proposed agenda item 1.] II. Remaining Dispositive Motions/Orders The parties should be prepared to address the plaintiffs' request that the Court impose deadlines for filing pleading-related dispositive motions. [See plaintiffs' proposed agenda item I.] III. Discovery The parties should be prepared to discuss the plaintiffs' request to stay discovery pending a ruling by the Sixth Circuit. [See plaintiffs proposed agenda item II.] IV. Electronically Stored Information ("ESI") The Court will hear statements from the parties regarding their progress in defining search terms for Lilly's and Xanodyne's ESI. [See defendants' proposed agenda item 2.] V. Coordination with State Cases The parties should be prepared to discuss the most efficient and effective way to work toward coordinating discovery with non-MDL cases, as well as the proper timing of such efforts. [See defendants' proposed agenda item 3.] VI. Recently Transferred California Multi-Plaintiff Cases The parties should be prepared to advise the Court regarding the California multi-plaintiff cases recently opened in the MDL, as well as the cases currently pending transfer to the MDL. [See defendants' proposed agenda item 4.] In the event counsel have not discussed the items outlined above, they are directed to confer in advance of the upcoming Status Conference in a good faith effort to reach agreement to the extent that such is feasible. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/25/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR (Burneva Williams by US Mail)
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 AMENDED AGREED ORDER REGARDING BRAND DEFENDANTS' DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS IN CASES IN WHICH PLAINTIFFS HAVE NOT AMENDED THEIR COMPLAINTS: 1. The last sentence of Paragraph 1 is amended to add the following: "A Plaintiff whose action against Xanodyne has been dismissed with prejudice may not file an Amended Complaint against Xanodyne. A Plaintiff whose action against Old AAIPharma has been dismissed with prejudice may not file an Amended Complaint against Old AAIPharma." 2. Paragraph 2 remains unchanged. 3. Paragraph 3 remains unchanged. 4. Paragraph 4 is amended to include Brand Defendants as follows: "Upon the filing of an Amended Complaint pursuant to Paragraph 1 of this Order, or upon expiration of the time for filing an Amended Complaint, and if the Plaintiff in the Amended Complaint is from a State that has been the subject of a previous Order to Dismiss claims against a Brand Defendant, the Brand Defendant (s) may request that the Court issue an order directing Plaintif(s) to show cause why the applicable previous Orders should not apply to the newly-filed Amended Complaint, or if no Amended Complaint was filed to the original complaints. If the Plaintiff is from a State that has not been subject to a prior Order for Dismissal of claims against a Brand Defendant, the Brand Defendant(s) must affirmatively file a Motion to Dismiss or a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings." 5. Paragraph 5 is amended to include Brand Defendants as follows: "In responding to a dispositive motion by a Brand Defendant, or Order to Show Cause pertaining to a Brand Defendant, it is not necessary for Plaintiffs subject to this Order to submit papers addressing the arguments raised in Plaintiffs' past oppositions to the motions to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings of a Brand Defendant, or to address any arguments raised in any future consolidated oppositions that Plaintiffs may file in response to motions to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings by a Brand Defendant." 6. Paragraph 6 is amended to include Brand Defendants as follows: "If, upon receiving a response to a show-cause order issued pursuant to Paragraph 4 of this Order, the Court requires a response from a Brand Defendant, the Court will so direct by separate order." 7. Paragraph 7 is amended to include Brand Defendants as follows: "Nothing in this Order shall prevent a Brand Defendant from answering or otherwise responding to a complaint or amended complaint as contemplated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure." 8. Paragraph 8 remains unchanged. 9. Paragraph 9 remains unchanged. 10. Paragraph 10 is amended to include Brand Defendants as follows: "Upon the filing of an Amended Complaint, or upon the passing of 21 calendar days of a new complaint being opened in the MDL, and if the Plaintiff is from a State that has been the subject of a previous Order to Dismiss claims against a Brand Defendant, the Brand Defendant(s) may request that the Court issue an order directing Plaintiff(s) to show cause why the applicable previous Orders should not apply to the newly-filed Amended Complaint, or, if no Amended Complaint is filed, to the original complaint. If a Plaintiff is from a State that has not been subject to a prior Order for Dismissal of claims against a Brand Defendant, the Brand Defendant(s) must affirmatively file a Motion to Dismiss or a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings." 11. Paragraph 11 is amended to include Brand Defendants as follows: "In responding to a dispositive motion by a Brand Defendant, or Order to Show Cause pertaining to a Brand Defendant, it is not necessary for Plaintiffs subject to this Order to submit papers addressing the arguments raised in Plaintiffs past oppositions to the motions to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings of a Brand Defendant, or to address any arguments raised in any future consolidated oppositions that Plaintiffs may file in response to motions to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings by a Brand Defendant." 12. Paragraph 12 is amended to include Brand Defendants as follows: "If, upon receiving a response to a show-cause order issued pursuant to Paragraph 10 of this Order, the Court requires a response from a Brand Defendant, the Court will so direct by separate order." 13. Paragraph 13 is amended to include Brand Defendants as follows: "Nothing in this Order shall prevent a Brand Defendant from answering or otherwise responding to a complaint or amended complaint as contemplated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure." Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/16/2013. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams
March 6, 2013 Filing 148 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER No. 39 from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Records requested from the transferor court(s) via email. cc: COR, B. Williams Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/4/2013, before Judge Danny C. Reeves: 1) Plaintiffs' request for a stay of discovery will be passed until the next status conference. 2) The parties are to tender a proposed order to the Court regarding cases in which product identification information is lacking. 3) Defendants are to provide the Court with a list of state courts where related actions are pending so that the Court can advise them on the status of this MDL. 4) The parties are directed to work toward an agreement on search terms to be used in connection with Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"). The parties are directed to submit a status report on this issue no later than 4/29/2013. The Court will again address the issue at the next status conference. 5) The next STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled for 5/6/2013 at 01:30 PM at the US Courthouse in COVINGTON, Ky. The parties shall submit proposed agendas no less than 14 days prior to the conference. Signed by Judge, Danny C. Reeves.(Court Reporter Joan Averdick.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. (CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams, diary
February 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, the parties are notified of the following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the Status Conference currently scheduled for Monday, March 4, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. EST. I. Plaintiffs' Overdue Product Identification Discovery Responses II. Plaintiff Fact Sheets III. Plaintiffs' Request for Stay of Discovery IV. Electronically Stored Information ("ESI"). In the event counsel have not discussed the items outlined above, they are directed to confer in advance of the upcoming Status Conference in a good faith effort to reach agreement to the extent that such is feasible. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/20/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR (Burneva Williams via US Mail)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER: STATUS CONFERENCE in this matter shall be held on 3/4/2013 at 01:30 PM at the US Courthouse in COVINGTON, KY. The parties shall submit proposed agendas not less than fourteen (14) days prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/15/2013.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Burneva Williams via US Mail, Cov Diary Modified cc on 1/15/2013 (CBD).
November 14, 2012 USCA Case Number 12-6403 Case Manager Patricia Elder for (144 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2382 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Notice of Appeal, filed by Debby Jones. Associated Cases:2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(CBD)
November 8, 2012 Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to (62 in 2:11-cv-349-DCR, 1599 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Order Granting Defendant Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Second Motion to Dismiss; (120 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 1973 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Order, (129 in 2:11-cv-349-DCR, 2059 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Memorandum Order Regarding Defendant Eli Lilly and Company's Second Master Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in 34 Cases; (141 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2247 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Memorandum Opinion & Order; (142 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2273 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR)Judgment, by Debby Jones. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0643-2492267. Associated Cases:2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Plymale, Douglas) Modified to clean up docket text on 11/8/2012 (LST).
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 DOCUMENT PRODUCTION PROTOCOL AND COST OF PRODUCTION ORDER: This Document Production Protocol and Cost of Production Order (the "DocumentProduction Protocol") shall apply to all cases transferred to this Court by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to its Order of August 16, 2011, any tag-along actions transferred to this Court by the Panel, and any related actions that have been or will be originallyfiled in, transferred to, or removed to this Court and assigned thereto as part of In re: Darvocet, Darvon, and Propoxyphene Products Liability Litigation, MDL No. 2226. This DocumentProduction Protocol is intended to address issues as contemplated in Sections IV(E), (J) and (K) of the May 25, 2012 Order (as defined below), between Plaintiffs and Brand Defendants. (See Order for details re 1. Definitions, 2. Requests for Production of Documents 3. Schedule of Production of Brand Defendants' Documents 4. Schedule for Production of Plaintiffs' Documents 5. Method For Initial Collection of Potentially Responsive ESI. 6. Format of Production for Plaintiffs Documents. 7. Format of Production for Defendants Documents. 8. Cost. 9. Organization of Production 10. Avoidance of Duplicate Production 11. Privilege Log 12. Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Material. 13. Authenticity and Admissibility 14. Confidential or Highly-Confidential-Attorneys' Eyes Only Information). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/11/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
October 10, 2012 Filing 142 JUDGMENT: (1) Judgment is entered in favor of Eli Lilly and Company; aaiPharma, Inc.; aaiPharma LLC; AAI Development Services, Inc.; NeoSan Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Propst Distribution, Inc.; Brenn Distribution, Inc.; Brenn Manufacturing, Inc.; Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Generics International (US), Inc.; Generics Bidco I, LLC; Generics Bidco II, LLC; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.; Covidien PLC; Covidien Inc.; Mallinckrodt, Inc.; Teva Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan, Inc.; and Generics International (US PARENT), Inc., with respect to all claims asserted herein. (2) This action is DISMISSED and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. (3) This is a FINAL and APPEALABLE Judgment and there is no just cause for delay. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/10/2012. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(TDA)cc: COR
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) Dfts AAIPharma, LLC; AAIPharma, Inc.; AAIPharma Development Services, Inc.; and NeoSan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s (MDL Record 2211) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings are GRANTED w/ respect to the claims asserted by the following plts: a. No. 2: 11-177-DCR; b. No. 2: 11-179-DCR; c. No. 2: 11-180-DCR; d. No. 2: 11-185-DCR; e. 2: 11-186-DCR; f. No. 2: 11-188-DCR; g. No. 2: 11-191-DCR; h. No. 2: 11-197-DCR; i. No. 2: 11-204-DCR; j. No. 2: 11-210-DCR; k. No. 2: 11-213-DCR; l. No. 2: 11-215-DCR; m. No. 2: 11-221-DCR; n. No. 2: 11-295-DCR; o. No. 2: 11-325-DCR; p. No. 2: 11-327-DCR; q. No. 2: 11-332-DCR; r. No. 2: 11-337-DCR; s. No. 2: 11-346-DCR; t. No. 2: 11-348-DCR; u. No. 2: 11-349-DCR; v. No. 2: 11-351-DCR; w. No. 2: 11-353-DCR; x. No. 2: 11-354-DCR; y. No. 2: 11-355-DCR; z. No. 2: 11-356-DCR; aa. No. 2: 11-363-DCR; bb. No. 2: 11-368-DCR; cc. No. 2: 11-369-DCR; dd. No. 2: 11-375-DCR; ee. No. 2: 11-376-DCR; ff. No. 2: 11-377-DCR; gg. No. 2: 11-381-DCR; hh. No. 2: 11-394-DCR; ii. No. 2: 11-396-DCR; jj. No. 2: 11-401-DCR; kk. No. 2: 12-032-DCR; ll. No. 2: 12-041-DCR; mm. No. 2: 12-042-DCR; nn. No. 2: 12-043-DCR; oo. No. 2: 12-047-DCR; pp. No. 2: 12-048-DCR; qq. No. 2: 12-049-DCR; rr. No. 2: 12-062-DCR; ss. No. 2: 12-064-DCR; tt. No. 2: 12-065-DCR; uu. No. 2: 12-066-DCR; vv. No. 2: 12-150-DCR. 2. Claims asserted by these plts against Dfts AAIPharma, LLC, AAIPharma, Inc.; AAIPharma Development Services, Inc.; and NeoSan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. are DISMISSED, with prejudice. 3. With regard to Lopez v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., No. 2: 12-046-DCR, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (MDL Record No. 2211) is GRANTED, in part. Counts II, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX, X, XI, XIII, XIV, and XV of the Lopez Amended Complaint are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Counts I, III, IV, XII, and XVI remain pending. 4. Dfts AAIPharma, LLC; AAIPharma, Inc.; AAIPharma Development Services, Inc.; and NeoSan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in the action: Lopez, et al., v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., No. 2: 12-046-DCR (MDL Record No. 2227) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 10/10/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(STB)cc: COR
October 9, 2012 Filing 140 RESPONSE in Opposition re (82 in 2:12-cv-00032-DCR, 214 in 2:11-cv-00197-DCR, 79 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 216 in 2:11-cv-00185-DCR, 64 in 2:12-cv-00047-DCR, 98 in 2:11-cv-00180-DCR, 24 in 2:12-cv-00150-DCR, 88 in 2:11-cv-00381-DCR, 65 in 2:12-cv-00048-DCR, 70 in 2:12-cv-00066-DCR, 116 in 2:11-cv-00375-DCR, 67 in 2:12-cv-00042-DCR, 58 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 114 in 2:11-cv-00204-DCR, 81 in 2:11-cv-00369-DCR, 109 in 2:11-cv-00221-DCR, 92 in 2:11-cv-00354-DCR, 60 in 2:12-cv-00041-DCR, 69 in 2:12-cv-00046-DCR, 97 in 2:11-cv-00394-DCR, 94 in 2:11-cv-00215-DCR, 2211 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 62 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00377-DCR, 137 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 126 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 201 in 2:11-cv-00186-DCR, 106 in 2:11-cv-00376-DCR, 148 in 2:11-cv-00210-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00353-DCR, 97 in 2:11-cv-00177-DCR, 156 in 2:11-cv-00295-DCR, 89 in 2:11-cv-00401-DCR, 79 in 2:11-cv-00337-DCR, 88 in 2:11-cv-00355-DCR, 59 in 2:12-cv-00049-DCR, 111 in 2:11-cv-00325-DCR, 210 in 2:11-cv-00191-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR, 73 in 2:12-cv-00062-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00351-DCR, 86 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR, 136 in 2:11-cv-00179-DCR, 77 in 2:11-cv-00332-DCR, 103 in 2:11-cv-00188-DCR, 82 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 172 in 2:11-cv-00213-DCR, 93 in 2:11-cv-00396-DCR, 61 in 2:12-cv-00043-DCR, 77 in 2:11-cv-00363-DCR) MOTION for Judgment by AAI Development Services, Inc., NeoSan Pharmaceuticals Inc., aaiPharma LLC, aaiPharma, Inc. on the Pleadings, (2227 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 73 in 2:12-cv-00046-DCR) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Certificate of Service filed by Jim W. Aaron, Jr, Jimmie D. Adams, Teena Adams, Alice Aday, Martin Aday, Nicolae Aga, Lola Ainsworth, Needa Alexander, Russell Alexander, Aundra Alfred, Scott Almon, Hester I. Anderson, Mary Ann Anderson, William Anderson, Dorothy Atkinson, Sue Aubert, Vincent Aubert, Bennie Austin, Denise Ayling, Steven Ayling, Sr, Gloria Babineaux, Tyra Barabino, Margaret Barnes, Linda Barrios, Ronald Barrios, Michael Becnel, John Bector, Jr, Dennis Bell, Joy Marie Bell, William Bennett, Ellen Bickham, John Bickham, Elester Bingham, Clara Blanton, Andreas Borer, Connie Boudreaux, Denise Boudreaux, Jerry Boudreaux, Kordia Bowman, George Boyd, Rebecca Brinson, Kenneth Brookins, Lance Broussard, Sr, Aaron Brown, Nettie Brown, Faye Brumfield, Jeremiah Brumfield, Jody Buckley, Marilyn Burnson, Phillip Burnson, Gladys Butler, Shirley Cain, Clara Calamia, Freda Capers, Lorenzo Carreras, Barbara Carter, Elaine Carter, Charles Case, Shirley Case, Debra Chaisson, Kent Chapman, Kent Charles, Yolanda Charles, Randy Chavez, Carolyn Christophe, Rebecca Churchman, Vincent Cinquigranno, Jeanette Clarke, Earnestine Clifton, Valerie Coats, Joseph Cochran, Norma S Cochran, Gail Coleman, Kevin Collins, Wayne Collins, Laurabelle Combre, Paul Ray Combs, Walter D. Coney, Walter D. Coney, John Corso, Patricia Corso, Kelly Craddock-Boone, Katherine Craig, Loretta Criss, Donald Crowell, Tara Cryer, Connie Culbreath, Gus E. Culbreath, III, George Curvin, Rita Curvin, Marie Cutrer, Sam Cutrer, Charles Daggs, Jr, Margaret Daniels, James Danos, Tena Danos, Doris Daugherty, James Daugherty, Johnny Davis, Sheila Dawson, Brandon DePascal, Hilda DePascal, Geneva DeVine, James H. DeVine, Jewel K. Dear, Gladys Delaune, Carol Depew, Alice Derry, Diane Dickerson, Diane Dickerson, Tim Dickerson, Freddie Dixson, Marlene Dixson, Angela Dorsey, Melissa Doyle, Debra Duhe, Michael Duhe, Peggy Duhe, Jan Duke, Raymond Duke, Debra Duncan, Lambert Duncan, Sr, Linda Dupre, William E. Dykes, Jr, Cynthia Dyson, Mary Edwards, James J. Ellis, Jan Ellis, Joycelyn Ernest, Dennis Evans, Patricia Faircloth, Anthony Faucetta, Sr, Mary K. Fisher, Louann Fisher-Smith, Emma Fitch, Curmer Foreman, Cindy Fowler, Jasper Frabbiele, Joan Frabbiele, Rosie Franks, Delores Freeman, Rita Fuller, Linda Gallagher, Kevin Galloway, Sarah Galloway, Truman Galloway, Patrick Garrett, Pamela George, Rex Gibson, Leah Glass, Martha Golman, Deloris Gray, Gerry Grayer, Patricia Grayer, Virginia Greer, Jacqueline Griffith, Jimmie Hannah, Anna Hardy, Rodney Harper, Joseph Harris, Jr, Michelle Harris, Stacy Harris, Theresa Harvey, Cindy Hawthorne, Forest Hawthorne, Alex Henry, Ethel Henry, Genell Hernandez, William Hernandez, Jr, Von Higgins, Lois High, Gladys Hines, Joseph Holden, Cathey Holland, Joe Holland, Alfonzia Hollins, III, James Holloway, Lillie Mae Holloway, Melissa Homer, Wendell Homer, Anthony Hoofkin, Jane Hoover, Jesse Hoover, III, Amy Houston, Gilbert Howard, Teresa Howard, Holsy Hubbard, III, Kathleen Hubbard, Daniel Hudson, Susan Hudson, Elizabeth Hunsucker, Jack Hutchinson, Cloedale Hymel, Joseph Hymel, Jr, Aaron Ingram, Angie Ingram, Pearl Jackson, Donald Jacob, Cathy James-Collins, James Jenkins, Eugene Johnson, Irene Johnson, Leonard Johnson, Jr, Matthew Johnson, Peggy Johnson, Tracy Johnson, Virgie Joiner, Clifford Jones, Debby Jones, Gail Jones, Robert Jones, Stephanie Jones, Marshall Juergens, Allison Juge, Larry Kastner, Rita Kastner, Mary Ann Kellehar, Mary Ann Kellehar, Ray Kendrick, William Kitchens, Billy Lambert, Frances Lane, Catherine LeBoeuf, Patsy L. Lebrun, Belinda Lee, Mark Lee, Sr, Chrisa Leonard, Ramona Lindley, Paulette Linville, Bessie Littleton, Judas Littleton, Charles Loftin, Betty Lofton, Mark Lopez, Mary Lopez, Cora Louque, Ridgie Louque, Adeline Loyd, Ellis Loyd, Mary E. Loyd, Bruce Luquette, Linda Luquette, David Lynch, Robbie Maas, Sr, Arthur Major, Louis Malbrough, Marlene Mancuso, Geraldine Marcotte, Wilfred Marcotte, James Marler, Keith Marsalis, Nora L. Marston, Joyce Martinez, Louis Martinez, Jr, Armand Mataya, Sr, Renee Mataya, Courtney Matthews, Allise McAlpine, Olga McClanahan, Roger McClanahan, Brenda McGee, Castadera McGee, Susan McMullen, Dorothy Mendel, Arthur Millet, Donna Mitchell, Thomas Mitchell, William D Mitchell, Sherry Mobley, Eva Moffett, Mary Morales, Russell Morales, Paul Morefield, Rose E. Morefield, Edith Morehead, Steve Morehead, Rafael Moreno, Michael Mosley, Maxine Moten, Cynthia Myles, Rebecca Nevels, Eddie Odom, Archange A.J. Olivier, Jr, Christine Olivier, Rose Orfanello, Bonnie Orgeron, David Orgeron, Melvina Otillio, Martha Overbay, Vivian Albert Overbay, Joanne Paige, Carnus Parker, Jr, Julian Parker, Rhonda Parker, Angela Parson, Bernadette Patin, Charlotte Patterson, Phillip Patterson, Morsie Pearson-Wright, Audrey Percy, Willis Percy, Christine Perkins, Mytrice Perry, Cynthia Petrie, Donald Petrie, Narvin Petty, Jr, Wanda Picket, Bobbie Sue Pierce, Ann Piquiet, Anthony Pitts, Linda Powell, Larry Prestenbach, Jacqueline Price, Louis Price, Sr, Mary Price, Chris Puckett, Charles Quey, Linda Quey, Stephen Quick, Octavia Raymond, Kacie Reynolds, Donna Robert, Eldred B. Robert, Sr, Young A. Roberts, Jr, Billy Rodrigue, Marlene Rodrigue, William Romair, Kathryn Roussell, Doris Salamone, Vincent Salamone, Mary Salard, Dianne Salvant, Jimmie Louise Sandel, Mary Sapia, Michael Sapia, Shirley Sasani, Janette Savoie, Jill Sawyer, April Schexnaydre, Robert Schexnaydre, Jr, Margaret Segraves, Andrea H. Self, Dennis Self, Carolyn Serpas, Jack Norman Serpas, William Shows, Randolph Simmons, Joseph Simpson, Joseph Simpson, Rose Marie Sinkler, Linda Sloan, Christopher R. Smith, Gertha Smith, Glen Smith, Joe Smith, Sharon S. Smith, Shirley Smith, Wayne Smith, Kenneth Spikes, Patricia Spillers, John Spires, Sr, Nancy Jean Spires, Barbara Stelly, Joseph Stelly, Lisa Stevens, Calvin Stewart, Jr, Kim Stewart, Sheila Stewart, Wayne Stringfellow, James Swanner, Rosemary Swanner, Charlotte Swible, John Swible, Jr, Patricia Talbert, Linda Tannerhill, William R. Tannerhill, Lois Tate, Alice Taylor, Stephanie Taylor-Foy, Bertell Thomas, Dianne Thomas, Roberta Tiner, Dennis Tisdale, Linda Tisdale, David C. Turner, Judy Earnestine Turner, Lenora Upshaw, Daisy Valle, Barbara Vance, Marin Vaughn, Marshall Vaughn, George Vercher, Valerie Vercher, Michell Vogel, Calvin Wagers, Coy G. Waldrop, Inez Walker, Larry Walker, Evelyn Warlick, Gennie Warren, Veronica Washington, Michael Webb, Carolyn West, Carolyn West, John Wheeler, Fearron White, Lynne Wilhelm, Catherine Williams, Edith Williams, Lonnika S. Williams, Samantha Williams, Walter Williams, Terry Williamson, Constance Wilson, John Wilson, Sylvia Wilson, Tracey Wilson, Dorothy Mae Windham, Christina Woodridge, Norman Woodridge, Janet Woods, Mary Woodward, Robert Woodward, Fred Young, Judy Young, Carol Zamjahn, Kevin Zamjahn, Bruce Zeringue, Peggy Zeringue, Deborah Zickefoose, Gary Zickefoose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Lopez Product ID Responses, #2 Exhibit 2 - AAI Labeler Code)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Nast, Dianne)
September 25, 2012 Filing 139 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/24/2012 before Judge Danny C. Reeves; 1)Pla, Melissa Robles (Case 2:12-45-DCR) is given until 10/1/2012, to obtain counsel or show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for failure to file discovery responses. Failure to respond by this date shall result in dismissal; 2)Pla, Pamela Scott (Case No. 2-12-171-DCR) shall submit product identification discovery responses by 10/9/2012, or case will be dismissed by the Court; 3)Parties are to confer on or before 10/4/2012 regarding the cases in which Pla Fact Sheets have not been provided; 4)Pla, Gary Zickefoose's oral motion to withdraw First Amended Complaint in Case No. 2-11-347-DCR is granted. Pla's First Amended Complaint is withdrawn from the record. Pla to have to 10/4/2012 to file a Second Amended Complaint in compliance w/the Court's previous Orders; 5)Parties are given an extension of time until 10/4/2012, to further confer regarding all terms of the proposed Document Production Protocol and Cost of Production Order. In the event the parties are unable to agree regarding all terms, they shall submit proposed draft orders to the Court by that date which shall include their areas of agreement and disagreement; 6)Further status conference dates w/be set by subsequent Orders based, in part, on the parties' suggestions. (Court Reporter JOAN AVERDICK.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. Signed by Danny C. Reeves. (LST)cc: COR
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, the parties are notified of the following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the Status Conference currently scheduled for September 24, 2012, at 1:30 PM. (See Order for Items I-IV). In the event counsel have not discussed the items outlined above, they are directed to confer in advance of the upcoming Scheduling Conference in a good faith effort to reach agreement to the extent that such is feasible. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/18/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(STB)cc: COR
September 12, 2012 Filing 137 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings in 50 cases by AAI Development Services, Inc., NeoSan Pharmaceuticals Inc., aaiPharma LLC, aaiPharma, Inc. on the Pleadings (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A - Chart of Claims, #4 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Order Part 1, #5 Errata B - Bankruptcy Order Part 2, #6 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Order Part 3, #7 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Order Part 4, #8 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Order Part 5, #9 Exhibit B - Bankruptcy Order Part 6, #10 Exhibit C - Orange Book Excerpts, #11 Exhibit D - USPTO Information)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Sayre, Russell) Modified to correct motion on 9/12/2012 (LST).
September 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' LIAISON COUNSEL: The plaintiffs have submitted a request for the appointment of new Liaison Counsel due to the untimely death of Harry Rankin. Being sufficiently advised, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: (1) Terms of Appointment The person who accepts the appointment to serve as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel agrees to serve for the duration of the litigation or until such time as the Court determines that a change in the duration of service shall be made. (2) Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel The Court appoints the following attorney as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel: Michele S. Burkholder. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 9/5/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Clerk JPMDL VACATED by [MDL 2885]: The portions of those Orders with respect to Plaintiffs leadership structure are hereby VACATED. Effective immediately, Plaintiffs appointed counsel are relieved of the leadership responsibilities and obligations described in those Orders. Except as stated in Part 6 below, all other portions of those Orders remain in effect. Modified text on 11/6/2013 (CBD).
August 20, 2012 Filing 135 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 8/20/2012 before Judge Danny C. Reeves; 1)Parties are to advise the Court by close of business August 27, 2012 on the status of Item No. 3 - Document Production Protocol (Court Reporter JOAN AVERDICK.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. Signed by Danny C. Reeves. (LST)cc: COR
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER; 1)The Status Conference previously scheduled for 8/20/2012, at Covington, Kentucky is SET ASIDE and instead, shall be scheduled before the undersigned for a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE on 8/20/2012 at 01:30 PM; 2)The telephone conference may be accessed by calling AT&T Teleconferencing at 1-877-336-1839, entering the access code 6563764 (followed by #); and when requested, entering the security code 7731 (followed by #); 3)The Clerk is directed to provide a court report to record the proceeding; 4)Parties to be prepared to discuss the items set out in the 2088 Hearing Agenda and the Court's 2089 Order regarding the Plaintiff's fact sheet.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/16/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(LST)cc: COR
August 15, 2012 Filing 133 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by AAI Development Services, Inc., NeoSan Pharmaceuticals Inc., aaiPharma LLC, aaiPharma, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Edwards, Ryan)
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER: 1. The proposed Plaintiff's Fact Sheet, copy attached hereto, is ADOPTED by the Court. 2. The plaintiff's responses to plaintiff's Fact Sheet shall be due on or before September 10, 2012. However, in light of the Court's tardiness in adopting the fact sheet, plaintiffs may, upon showing of good cause, seek an extension of deadline. This matter shall be addressed during August 20, 2012, Status Conference. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/14/2012. (Attachments: #1 PLAINTIFF'S FACT SHEET)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(STB)cc: COR
August 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, the parties are notified of the following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the Status Conference currently scheduled for August 20, 2012, at 1:30 PM. (See Order for Items I-III). In the event counsel have not discussed the items outlined above, they are directed to confer in advance of the upcoming Scheduling Conference in a good faith effort to reach agreement to the extent that such is feasible. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/14/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(STB)cc: COR
August 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER: The term Generic Defendants, as referenced in the Court's Orders of April 10, 2012 (1973 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Order, and June 22, 2012 (1645 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Order to Show Cause, shall include Cornerstone Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/8/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(STB)cc: COR
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 129 MEMORANDUM ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANYS SECOND MASTER MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN 34 CASES; 1. To the extent that the plaintiffs consolidated opposition to Lillys motion is construed as a motion to continue or a motion to hold the Courts ruling in abeyance, those requests and/or motions are DENIED. 2. Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Second Master Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [MDL Record No. 1537] is DENIED with regard to Marler v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-375- DCR (R. 48). The motion is GRANTED in the remaining above captioned cases. 3. With the exception of Marler v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-375-DCR, the claims asserted by the plaintiffs against Defendant Eli Lilly and Company in the above-captioned cases are DISMISSED, with prejudice.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 8/2/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(LST)cc: COR
July 20, 2012 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Danny C. Reeves for review: MDL 1537, et al MOTION for Judgment by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly & Company, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Inc., Eli Lilly & Company Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(LST)
July 19, 2012 Filing 128 REPLY to (37 in 2:11-cv-00332-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 70 in 2:11-cv-00378-DCR, 40 in 2:11-cv-00377-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00365-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00369-DCR, 14 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR, 39 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 42 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR, 42 in 2:11-cv-00351-DCR, 1537 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00337-DCR, 23 in 2:12-cv-00048-DCR, 13 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00384-DCR, 47 in 2:11-cv-00355-DCR, 23 in 2:12-cv-00042-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00381-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00376-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00329-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00375-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00328-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00353-DCR, 64 in 2:11-cv-00324-DCR, 74 in 2:11-cv-00364-DCR, 77 in 2:11-cv-00184-DCR, 65 in 2:11-cv-00331-DCR, 63 in 2:11-cv-00330-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00394-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00339-DCR, 39 in 2:11-cv-00335-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00363-DCR) in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly & Company. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Metzger, Kimberly)
July 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER: the Status Conference previously scheduled for Monday, July 23, 2012, at the United States Courthouse in Covington, Kentucky is SET ASIDE. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/18/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Cov Diary
July 16, 2012 Clerk's Note re (2012 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR): Counsel's office confimed by phone this date that the MOTION to Remand to State Court MDL 2012 contained an error in the caption. The caption should have stated Posey, et al v. McKesson Corporation 2:12-cv-135 and that the pleading was spread in error to all other member cases. Clerk has terminated the incorrectly filed motion in all cases except 2:11-md-2226 and 2:12-cv-135. Counsel's office was further advised on use of the "spread text" feature for filing future pleadings in this MDL. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
July 14, 2012 Filing 126 INCORRECTLY FILED - MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tenessia Posey Megan Stinson, Barbara J. Olson, Mary A. Alsop, Clifford August, Charlie Bell, Wrildia A. Blackburn, Dorothy Bonds, Terrence Brown, Delores Christopher, Dorothy A. Cowan, Christine W. Graham, Mary L. Gremillion, Martha R. Grooms, Margaret R. Harmon, Kay F. Jones, Anthony B. Kenner, Suzanne Manuel, John H. Moore, Paul M. Nelson, Carilee Pemberton, Kenneth J. Stambaugh, Sheila G. Sullivan, Casa Thomas (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 Norris v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, #3 Exhibit 2 Mendez v. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, #4 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Rockstad, Trevor) Modified TEXT on 7/16/2012 (CBD).
July 13, 2012 Filing 125 NOTICE OF CHANGE IN FIRM NAME FOR ATTORNEY, RICHARD W. SCHULTE by Jim W. Aaron, Jr, Ericka Adams, Jimmie D. Adams, Rodney Adams, Teena Adams, Alice Aday, Martin Aday, Donna Adegbayi, Nicolae Aga, Lola Ainsworth, Marcella Alder, Needa Alexander, Russell Alexander, Thomas D. Alexander, Gleneda Alford, Aundra Alfred, Jean Alix, Philip Alix, Scott Almon, Larry Altstatt, Hester I. Anderson, Mary Ann Anderson, William Anderson, Lue F. Angell, Marty Armstrong, Geraldine Ashley, Mitchell Ashley, Dorothy Atkinson, Peggy Atwell, Paul Atwood, Sue Aubert, Vincent Aubert, Bennie Austin, Joyce Auston, Denise Ayling, Steven Ayling, Sr, Mary Lou Babbington, Donald Babin, Jeanette Babin, Gloria Babineaux, L. Jolene Baker, Heidi Balben, Everett Ballard, Rita Ballesteros, Diane Bane, Tyra Barabino, Ann Barker, William Barker, Margaret Barnes, Linda Barrios, Ronald Barrios, Mary Bearden, Minnie Beasley, Michael Becnel, John Bector, Jr, Dennis Bell, Joy Marie Bell, Laurel Bell, Roy Bell, Charles Bennett, William Bennett, Paul Berry, Ellen Bickham, John Bickham, Elester Bingham, Brenden Gage Black, Jennell Black, Rhonda S. Blackwell, Sydney S. Blackwell, Clara Blanton, Jimmy D. Blanton, Betty Boggess, Mary Bookout, Andreas Borer, Connie Boudreaux, Denise Boudreaux, Jerry Boudreaux, Kordia Bowman, George Boyd, William G. Boyd, III, Julia Bozman, Patricia Braley, Dian C. Breault, Rebecca Brinson, Kenneth Brookins, Michael Brooks, Lance Broussard, Sr, Aaron Brown, Donald Brown, Joanne Brown, Joyce Brown, Linda Brown, Nettie Brown, Tishie Brown, Troy Brown, Faye Brumfield, Jeremiah Brumfield, Feride Buch, Jody Buckley, Frances Burch, Tracey L. Burgess, Albert Burke, Harold Burney, Oleta Burney, Marilyn Burnson, Phillip Burnson, Gladys Butler, Shirley Cain, Clara Calamia, Martha Cannella, Freda Capers, Lorenzo Carreras, Barbara Carter, Elaine Carter, Charles Case, Shirley Case, Matthew Celestin, Debra Chaisson, Karen Chambers, Kent Chapman, Kent Charles, Yolanda Charles, Randy Chavez, Carolyn Christophe, Rebecca Churchman, Vincent Cinquigranno, Frederick Claiborne, Jeanette Clarke, Avensky Clayborn, Earnestine Clifton, Valerie Coats, Joseph Cochran, Norma S Cochran, Lillian I. Coker, Gail Coleman, Bertha Coley, Kevin Collins, Wayne Collins, Laurabelle Combre, Paul Ray Combs, Walter D. Coney, Walter D. Coney, James Cook, Janice Cook, Randy Cool, Helen S. Cooper, Virginia Cormier, John Corso, Patricia Corso, Louis Cossentino, Whitney V. Council, Kelly Craddock-Boone, Katherine Craig, Loretta Criss, Clara Cross, Donald Crowell, Tara Cryer, Connie Culbreath, Gus E. Culbreath, III, Karen Curtis, Russell Curtis, George Curvin, Rita Curvin, Marie Cutrer, Sam Cutrer, Charles Daggs, Jr, Tommie Dahlgreen, Marina Damis, Margaret Daniels, Melvin Daniels, James Danos, Tena Danos, Doris Daugherty, James Daugherty, Iva Davis, Johnny Davis, Lou Davis, Sheila Dawson, Brandon DePascal, Hilda DePascal, Geneva DeVine, James H. DeVine, Jewel K. Dear, Marjorie Lund Del Favero, Gladys Delaune, Kenneth Delavergnie, Jr, Carol Depew, Alice Derry, Rosemary Derryberry, Juanita Derwinis, Diane Dickerson, Diane Dickerson, Tim Dickerson, Freddie Dixson, Marlene Dixson, Angela Dorsey, David Doty, Herman Douglas, Doris Dowdy, Melissa Doyle, Andrew Dries, Mary Dries, James Dubose, Debra Duhe, Michael Duhe, Peggy Duhe, Jan Duke, Raymond Duke, Hattie Dunaway, Debra Duncan, Lambert Duncan, Sr, Janet Dunn, Rita Dunn, Roberta Dunn, Roberta Dunn, Linda Dupre, Olin Dyes, Patricia Dyes, William E. Dykes, Jr, Cynthia Dyson, Janet Edmonds, Jackie Edwards, Mary Edwards, Theresa Eldredge, Richard Elliott, James J. Ellis, Jan Ellis, Joycelyn Ernest, Kristine Esposito, Dennis Evans, Joann Evans, Patricia Faircloth, Anthony Faucetta, Sr, Colonel Fazzio, Shannon Felts, Dollene Felty, Kenneth Felty, Mary K. Fisher, Louann Fisher-Smith, Emma Fitch, Curmer Foreman, Spencer G. Forrest, Cindy Fowler, Jasper Frabbiele, Joan Frabbiele, Rosie Franks, Elizabeth Frederick, Lois Gail Frederick, Diana Freeland, Delores Freeman, Hester Freeman, Lori Freitas, Terry Freitas, Arthur Fuller, Esther Fuller, Rita Fuller, Linda Gallagher, Kevin Galloway, Sarah Galloway, Truman Galloway, Patrick Garrett, Pamela George, Jackson Germain, Yanise Germain, Constance Gianoli, Jerry Gibson, Katherine Gibson, Rex Gibson, Norma Sue Gibson Lanning, John Gilbert, Tammy Gilbert, Tammy Gilbert, Leah Glass, Thomas Goforth, Martha Golman, Michael Goodman, Joyce Gore, Deloris Gray, Gerry Grayer, Patricia Grayer, Carla Jo Green, Donald Green, Virginia Greer, Beverly Griffin, Jacqueline Griffith, Randall Guess, Hazel Hack, Ethel V. Hadley, Linda Halcomb, William Halcomb, Billy Hall, Claudia Hall, Cynthia Hall, Jerry Hallaway, Kay Hallaway, Jimmie Hannah, Anna Hardy, Jan Harper, Rodney Harper, William Harper, Dewitt Harris, Joseph Harris, Jr, Michelle Harris, Stacy Harris, Theresa Harvey, Teresa Hash, Gary Hatfield, Cindy Hawthorne, Forest Hawthorne, Joseph N. Hayes, Charles Hearn, Marry A. Hect, Marry A. Hect, Alex Henry, Ethel Henry, Genell Hernandez, William Hernandez, Jr, Blanch Hershberger, Charles T. Hibbard, Darlene Hibler, Thomas Hicks, Von Higgins, Lois High, Gladys Hines, Sarah Hinson, Joseph Holden, Cathey Holland, Joe Holland, Alfonzia Hollins, III, James Holloway, Lillie Mae Holloway, Roger Wayne Holloway, Melissa Homer, Wendell Homer, Anthony Hoofkin, Joseph Hooks, Jane Hoover, Jesse Hoover, III, Virgie Hopper, Billy Hoskins, Andrew Houlihan, Jr, Amy Houston, Gilbert Howard, Teresa Howard, Holsy Hubbard, III, Kathleen Hubbard, Trina Hubbard, Daniel Hudson, Susan Hudson, Tiffany Hughes, Judy Humphrey, Elizabeth Hunsucker, Gerald E. Hunter El, Gay G. Hurst, Jerry Hurst, Jack Hutchinson, Cloedale Hymel, Joseph Hymel, Jr, Aaron Ingram, Angie Ingram, J.L.L.F., Jackie Jackson, Patricia Jackson, Pearl Jackson, Donald Jacob, Cathy James-Collins, Yvonne Jefferson, James Jenkins, John Jenkins, Eugene Johnson, Irene Johnson, Leonard Johnson, Jr, Matthew Johnson, Peggy Johnson, Tracy Johnson, Virgie Joiner, Clifford Jones, Debby Jones, Gail Jones, Jannifer Jones, Robert Jones, Rodney Jones, Stephanie Jones, Veronica Jones, Teresa Jones-Bell, Marshall Juergens, Allison Juge, Larry Kastner, Rita Kastner, George Keene, Mary Keene, Mary Ann Kellehar, Mary Ann Kellehar, Leonard Fred Kendrick, Ray Kendrick, Hmaid Khalil, Roxanne Khalil, Deborah E. Kinter, Deborah E. Kinter, William Kitchens, Paulette Knight, Ronald K. Knight, Gilbert Knoblock, L.B.F.R., Joseph F. Labit, Billy Lambert, Frances Lane, Edith Langlois, Barbara Larrimore, Catherine LeBoeuf, Patsy L. Lebrun, Maureen Ledet, Belinda Lee, Cleotis Lee, Mark Lee, Sr, Etta Lejeune, Chrisa Leonard, Lester Leonard, Deborah Leslie, Amelia Lewis, Brenda Lewis-Crossno, Dora Lighty, Ramona Lindley, Paulette Linville, Bessie Littleton, Judas Littleton, Charles Loftin, Betty Lofton, Mark Lopez, Mary Lopez, Cora Louque, Ridgie Louque, Adrian Love, John Lowe, Shelly Lowe, Adeline Loyd, Ellis Loyd, Mary E. Loyd, Ronald Lucas, II, Bruce Luquette, Linda Luquette, David Lynch, Robbie Maas, Sr, Bonnie MacDonald, Debra Magee, David Mahorney, Lena Mahorney, Arthur Major, Louis Malbrough, Marlene Mancuso, Geraldine Marcotte, Wilfred Marcotte, James Marler, Keith Marsalis, Mary Marsh, Nora L. Marston, Walter Martin, Joyce Martinez, Louis Martinez, Jr, Jay Mason, Kenneth Mason, Sharon Mason, Armand Mataya, Sr, Renee Mataya, Linda Mathieu, Paula K. Matney, Courtney Matthews, Allise McAlpine, Carolyn McCall, Feacher McCarthy, Olga McClanahan, Roger McClanahan, Bobby McCoy, Calvin McCoy, Clinden McCoy, Eddie McCoy, Edna McCoy, Leroy McCoy, Luke McCoy, Mary McCoy, Venessa McCoy, Vonceal McCoy, Eva McCrary, Rebecca McCrary, Sigrid McDaniel, Brenda McGee, Castadera McGee, Susan McMullen, James McNay, Dallas McPhail, Jeanann McPhail, Mary Turnage McPhail, Imogene Mealer, Jenet Meeks, Effie Melancon, Dorothy Mendel, Mary A. Mendoza, Anthony Miller, Clara Miller, Jay Miller, Jessie Miller, Linda Miller, Marcia Miller, Ramona Miller, Ronald T. Miller, Arthur Millet, Jeffie Mills, Deidra Minor, Donna Mitchell, Thomas Mitchell, William D Mitchell, Sherry Mobley, Eva Moffett, William Montgomery, Mary Morales, Russell Morales, Guy Moraski, Paul Morefield, Rose E. Morefield, Edith Morehead, Steve Morehead, Andrea Morel, James E. Morel, Rafael Moreno, Michael Mosley, Maxine Moten, Edward Murray, Olga Murray, Cynthia Myles, Lila Neal, Johnnie Nelson, Rebecca Nevels, Ethel Newberry, Helen Nicholson, Steven Nicholson, Donna Niebuhr, Mark Niebuhr, Bobbie A. Noel, Melvin Nolan, Jr, Christina Norman, Edward W. Norris, Marlene Norris, Lisa O'Banion, William O'Banion, Eddie Odom, Archange A.J. Olivier, Jr, Christine Olivier, Peggy Oniate, Pamela Janet Ooten, Rose Orfanello, Bonnie Orgeron, David Orgeron, Avis Ortego, Bobbie Osborn, Melvina Otillio, Martha Overbay, Vivian Albert Overbay, Sandy Oxendine, Jewell Pagliarini, Joanne Paige, Bernard Parker, Carnus Parker, Jr, Julian Parker, Rhonda Parker, Angela Parson, Bernadette Patin, Charlotte Patterson, Phillip Patterson, Raymond Payne, Morsie Pearson-Wright, Audrey Percy, Willis Percy, Christine Perkins, Lettie Perkins, Mytrice Perry, Patricia Pester, Cynthia Petrie, Donald Petrie, Narvin Petty, Jr, Wanda Picket, Bobbie Sue Pierce, Ann Piquiet, Anthony Pitts, Delores Plunkett, Martha Poole, Farahnaz Poozeshi, Tenessia Posey, Pinnie Pounds, Linda Powell, Larry Prestenbach, Jacqueline Price, Louis Price, Sr, Mary Price, Mary Price-Thomas, Beverly Provis, Chris Puckett, Donna Quesinberry, Charles Quey, Linda Quey, Stephen Quick, Kim Ragan, Louis Ray, Octavia Raymond, Leonard Redmond, Barbara Reed, Jeannie Reed, Kacie Reynolds, Patricia Rice, Wendell Rice, Judy Ann Richard, Patsy Richard, Carl A Riggins, Sr, Donna Robert, Eldred B. Robert, Sr, Keith Robert, Daniel Roberts, Young A. Roberts, Jr, Clarence Robertson, Melissa Robles, Billy Rodrigue, Marlene Rodrigue, Beverly Rodriguez, Deborah M. Rogers, William Romair, Donna Romero, Kay Romero, Kathryn Roussell, Joseph Roy, Lena Ruby, Doris Salamone, Vincent Salamone, Mary Salard, Dianne Salvant, Jimmie Louise Sandel, Mary Sapia, Michael Sapia, Willard Sapp, Shirley Sasani, Calvin Satterwhite, Diane Saucier, Janette Savoie, Jill Sawyer, April Schexnaydre, Robe
July 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Certification of Question [MDL Record No. 1994, et al] is DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 7/6/2012. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
July 5, 2012 Filing 123 MOTION to Certify Question to the Georgia Supreme Court, the Kentucky Supreme Court, the Louisiana Supreme Court, the Maryland Court of Appeals, the Michigan Supreme Court, and the Ohio Supreme Court by Nicolae Aga, Needa Alexander, Peggy Atwell, Sue Aubert, Vincent Aubert, L. Jolene Baker, Everett Ballard, Rita Ballesteros, Tyra Barabino, Margaret Barnes, Linda Barrios, Ronald Barrios, Michael Becnel, Ellen Bickham, John Bickham, Andreas Borer, Connie Boudreaux, Denise Boudreaux, Jerry Boudreaux, George Boyd, Patricia Braley, Lance Broussard, Sr, Tishie Brown, Faye Brumfield, Jeremiah Brumfield, Jody Buckley, Frances Burch, Albert Burke, Marilyn Burnson, Phillip Burnson, Gladys Butler, Shirley Cain, Clara Calamia, Martha Cannella, Lorenzo Carreras, Elaine Carter, Charles Case, Shirley Case, Matthew Celestin, Debra Chaisson, Kent Chapman, Kent Charles, Yolanda Charles, Carolyn Christophe, Vincent Cinquigranno, Valerie Coats, Joseph Cochran, Norma S Cochran, Gail Coleman, Kevin Collins, Wayne Collins, Laurabelle Combre, Virginia Cormier, Kelly Craddock-Boone, Katherine Craig, Tara Cryer, Marie Cutrer, Sam Cutrer, Charles Daggs, Jr, Margaret Daniels, James Danos, Tena Danos, Iva Davis, Sheila Dawson, Brandon DePascal, Hilda DePascal, Carol Depew, Alice Derry, Freddie Dixson, Marlene Dixson, Melissa Doyle, Debra Duhe, Michael Duhe, Peggy Duhe, Hattie Dunaway, Debra Duncan, Lambert Duncan, Sr, Rita Dunn, Linda Dupre, Cynthia Dyson, Jackie Edwards, Mary Edwards, Joycelyn Ernest, Joann Evans, Anthony Faucetta, Sr, Dollene Felty, Kenneth Felty, Emma Fitch, Curmer Foreman, Jasper Frabbiele, Joan Frabbiele, Delores Freeman, Hester Freeman, Kevin Galloway, Truman Galloway, John Gilbert, Tammy Gilbert, Thomas Goforth, Gerry Grayer, Patricia Grayer, Jacqueline Griffith, Billy Hall, Claudia Hall, Jimmie Hannah, Anna Hardy, Rodney Harper, Joseph Harris, Jr, Michelle Harris, Theresa Harvey, Marry A. Hect, Marry A. Hect, Alex Henry, Ethel Henry, Genell Hernandez, William Hernandez, Jr, Joseph Holden, Alfonzia Hollins, III, James Holloway, Lillie Mae Holloway, Roger Wayne Holloway, Melissa Homer, Wendell Homer, Anthony Hoofkin, Joseph Hooks, Jane Hoover, Jesse Hoover, III, Virgie Hopper, Amy Houston, Holsy Hubbard, III, Kathleen Hubbard, Trina Hubbard, Daniel Hudson, Susan Hudson, Judy Humphrey, Cloedale Hymel, Joseph Hymel, Jr, Pearl Jackson, Cathy James-Collins, Eugene Johnson, Irene Johnson, Leonard Johnson, Jr, Peggy Johnson, Tracy Johnson, Debby Jones, Gail Jones, Robert Jones, Stephanie Jones, Veronica Jones, Allison Juge, Larry Kastner, Rita Kastner, Ray Kendrick, Gilbert Knoblock, Catherine LeBoeuf, Maureen Ledet, Belinda Lee, Mark Lee, Sr, Lester Leonard, Ramona Lindley, Bessie Littleton, Judas Littleton, Charles Loftin, Betty Lofton, Cora Louque, Ridgie Louque, Bruce Luquette, Linda Luquette, Robbie Maas, Sr, Arthur Major, Louis Malbrough, Marlene Mancuso, Geraldine Marcotte, Wilfred Marcotte, James Marler, Mary Marsh, Walter Martin, Joyce Martinez, Louis Martinez, Jr, Armand Mataya, Sr, Renee Mataya, Courtney Matthews, Edna McCoy, Brenda McGee, Castadera McGee, Susan McMullen, James McNay, Effie Melancon, Dorothy Mendel, Ramona Miller, Arthur Millet, Donna Mitchell, Thomas Mitchell, William D Mitchell, Eva Moffett, Mary Morales, Russell Morales, Rafael Moreno, Michael Mosley, Olga Murray, Rebecca Nevels, Melvin Nolan, Jr, Archange A.J. Olivier, Jr, Christine Olivier, Rose Orfanello, Bonnie Orgeron, David Orgeron, Melvina Otillio, Martha Overbay, Vivian Albert Overbay, Joanne Paige, Bernard Parker, Julian Parker, Rhonda Parker, Bernadette Patin, Raymond Payne, Audrey Percy, Willis Percy, Mytrice Perry, Cynthia Petrie, Donald Petrie, Bobbie Sue Pierce, Larry Prestenbach, Louis Price, Sr, Mary Price, Beverly Provis, Charles Quey, Linda Quey, Stephen Quick, Louis Ray, Octavia Raymond, Kacie Reynolds, Patsy Richard, Keith Robert, Daniel Roberts, Billy Rodrigue, Marlene Rodrigue, William Romair, Kathryn Roussell, Lena Ruby, Doris Salamone, Vincent Salamone, Mary Salard, Dianne Salvant, Mary Sapia, Michael Sapia, Janette Savoie, Jill Sawyer, April Schexnaydre, Robert Schexnaydre, Jr, Rose Ann Scott, Carolyn Serpas, Jack Norman Serpas, Randolph Simmons, Mary Skinner, Agnes Smith, Alice Spencer, Kenneth Spikes, Barbara Stelly, Joseph Stelly, Lisa Stevens, Calvin Stewart, Jr, Kim Stewart, Sheila Stewart, James Swanner, Rosemary Swanner, Charlotte Swible, John Swible, Jr, Patricia Talbert, Lois Tate, Alice Taylor, Dennis Tisdale, Linda Tisdale, Helena Tureaud, Daisy Valle, Marin Vaughn, Marshall Vaughn, George Vercher, Valerie Vercher, Michell Vogel, Gennie Warren, Veronica Washington, Michael Webb, Timmy Whiddon, Lynne Wilhelm, Edith Williams, Larry Williams, Samantha Williams, Terry Williamson, John Wilson, Sylvia Wilson, Tracey Wilson, Christina Woodridge, Norman Woodridge, Janet Woods, Mary Woodward, Robert Woodward, Fred Young, Judy Young, Carol Zamjahn, Kevin Zamjahn, Bruce Zeringue, Peggy Zeringue (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Nast, Dianne)
July 5, 2012 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1536 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00258-DCR) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, (37 in 2:11-cv-00332-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 70 in 2:11-cv-00378-DCR, 40 in 2:11-cv-00377-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00365-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00369-DCR, 14 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR, 39 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 42 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR, 42 in 2:11-cv-00351-DCR, 1537 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00337-DCR, 23 in 2:12-cv-00048-DCR, 13 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00384-DCR, 47 in 2:11-cv-00355-DCR, 23 in 2:12-cv-00042-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00381-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00376-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00329-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00375-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00328-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00353-DCR, 64 in 2:11-cv-00324-DCR, 74 in 2:11-cv-00364-DCR, 77 in 2:11-cv-00184-DCR, 65 in 2:11-cv-00331-DCR, 63 in 2:11-cv-00330-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00394-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00339-DCR, 39 in 2:11-cv-00335-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00363-DCR) MOTION for Judgment by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly & Company, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Inc., Eli Lilly & Company with Certificate of Service filed by Nicolae Aga, Needa Alexander, Gleneda Alford, Mary Ann Anderson, William Anderson, Peggy Atwell, Sue Aubert, Vincent Aubert, L. Jolene Baker, Everett Ballard, Rita Ballesteros, Tyra Barabino, Margaret Barnes, Linda Barrios, Ronald Barrios, Michael Becnel, Dennis Bell, Ellen Bickham, John Bickham, Mary Bookout, Andreas Borer, Connie Boudreaux, Denise Boudreaux, Jerry Boudreaux, George Boyd, Patricia Braley, Kenneth Brookins, Lance Broussard, Sr, Tishie Brown, Faye Brumfield, Jeremiah Brumfield, Jody Buckley, Frances Burch, Albert Burke, Marilyn Burnson, Phillip Burnson, Gladys Butler, Shirley Cain, Clara Calamia, Martha Cannella, Lorenzo Carreras, Elaine Carter, Charles Case, Shirley Case, Matthew Celestin, Debra Chaisson, Kent Chapman, Kent Charles, Yolanda Charles, Carolyn Christophe, Vincent Cinquigranno, Valerie Coats, Joseph Cochran, Norma S Cochran, Gail Coleman, Kevin Collins, Wayne Collins, Laurabelle Combre, Paul Ray Combs, Virginia Cormier, Kelly Craddock-Boone, Katherine Craig, Tara Cryer, Marie Cutrer, Sam Cutrer, Charles Daggs, Jr, Margaret Daniels, James Danos, Tena Danos, Iva Davis, Sheila Dawson, Brandon DePascal, Hilda DePascal, Geneva DeVine, James H. DeVine, Carol Depew, Alice Derry, Freddie Dixson, Marlene Dixson, Melissa Doyle, Debra Duhe, Michael Duhe, Peggy Duhe, Hattie Dunaway, Debra Duncan, Lambert Duncan, Sr, Rita Dunn, Linda Dupre, Cynthia Dyson, Jackie Edwards, Mary Edwards, Joycelyn Ernest, Joann Evans, Anthony Faucetta, Sr, Shannon Felts, Dollene Felty, Kenneth Felty, Louann Fisher-Smith, Emma Fitch, Curmer Foreman, Jasper Frabbiele, Joan Frabbiele, Lois Gail Frederick, Delores Freeman, Hester Freeman, Kevin Galloway, Truman Galloway, Patrick Garrett, Rex Gibson, John Gilbert, Tammy Gilbert, Tammy Gilbert, Thomas Goforth, Gerry Grayer, Patricia Grayer, Jacqueline Griffith, Billy Hall, Claudia Hall, Jimmie Hannah, Anna Hardy, Rodney Harper, Joseph Harris, Jr, Michelle Harris, Theresa Harvey, Cindy Hawthorne, Forest Hawthorne, Marry A. Hect, Marry A. Hect, Alex Henry, Ethel Henry, Genell Hernandez, William Hernandez, Jr, Joseph Holden, Cathey Holland, Alfonzia Hollins, III, James Holloway, Lillie Mae Holloway, Roger Wayne Holloway, Melissa Homer, Wendell Homer, Anthony Hoofkin, Joseph Hooks, Jane Hoover, Jesse Hoover, III, Amy Houston, Holsy Hubbard, III, Kathleen Hubbard, Trina Hubbard, Daniel Hudson, Susan Hudson, Cloedale Hymel, Joseph Hymel, Jr, Pearl Jackson, Cathy James-Collins, Eugene Johnson, Irene Johnson, Leonard Johnson, Jr, Peggy Johnson, Tracy Johnson, Debby Jones, Gail Jones, Robert Jones, Stephanie Jones, Veronica Jones, Allison Juge, Larry Kastner, Rita Kastner, Ray Kendrick, Gilbert Knoblock, Catherine LeBoeuf, Maureen Ledet, Belinda Lee, Mark Lee, Sr, Lester Leonard, Deborah Leslie, Brenda Lewis-Crossno, Dora Lighty, Ramona Lindley, Paulette Linville, Bessie Littleton, Judas Littleton, Charles Loftin, Betty Lofton, Cora Louque, Ridgie Louque, Bruce Luquette, Linda Luquette, Robbie Maas, Sr, Bonnie MacDonald, Arthur Major, Louis Malbrough, Marlene Mancuso, Geraldine Marcotte, Wilfred Marcotte, James Marler, Mary Marsh, Walter Martin, Joyce Martinez, Louis Martinez, Jr, Armand Mataya, Sr, Renee Mataya, Courtney Matthews, Allise McAlpine, Carolyn McCall, Bobby McCoy, Calvin McCoy, Clinden McCoy, Edna McCoy, Leroy McCoy, Luke McCoy, Mary McCoy, Venessa McCoy, Vonceal McCoy, Brenda McGee, Castadera McGee, Susan McMullen, James McNay, Effie Melancon, Dorothy Mendel, Ramona Miller, Arthur Millet, Donna Mitchell, Thomas Mitchell, William D Mitchell, Eva Moffett, Mary Morales, Russell Morales, Paul Morefield, Rose E. Morefield, Rafael Moreno, Michael Mosley, Olga Murray, Rebecca Nevels, Melvin Nolan, Jr, Christina Norman, Rose Orfanello, Bonnie Orgeron, David Orgeron, Melvina Otillio, Martha Overbay, Vivian Albert Overbay, Joanne Paige, Bernard Parker, Carnus Parker, Jr, Julian Parker, Rhonda Parker, Bernadette Patin, Raymond Payne, Morsie Pearson-Wright, Audrey Percy, Willis Percy, Mytrice Perry, Cynthia Petrie, Donald Petrie, Bobbie Sue Pierce, Pinnie Pounds, Larry Prestenbach, Louis Price, Sr, Mary Price, Beverly Provis, Chris Puckett, Charles Quey, Linda Quey, Stephen Quick, Louis Ray, Octavia Raymond, Kacie Reynolds, Patsy Richard, Keith Robert, Daniel Roberts, Billy Rodrigue, Marlene Rodrigue, William Romair, Kathryn Roussell, Lena Ruby, Doris Salamone, Vincent Salamone, Mary Salard, Dianne Salvant, Mary Sapia, Michael Sapia, Janette Savoie, Jill Sawyer, April Schexnaydre, Robert Schexnaydre, Jr, Rose Ann Scott, Carolyn Serpas, Jack Norman Serpas, Clarence D. Shumaker, Georgia Silver, Randolph Simmons, Mary Skinner, Agnes Smith, Glen Smith, Joe Smith, Shirley Smith, Alice Spencer, Kenneth Spikes, Barbara Stelly, Joseph Stelly, Lisa Stevens, Calvin Stewart, Jr, Kim Stewart, Sheila Stewart, James Swanner, Rosemary Swanner, Charlotte Swible, John Swible, Jr, Patricia Talbert, Lois Tate, Alice Taylor, Dennis Tisdale, Linda Tisdale, Helena Tureaud, Martha Turner, Daisy Valle, Barbara Vance, Marin Vaughn, Marshall Vaughn, George Vercher, Valerie Vercher, Michell Vogel, Calvin Wagers, Gennie Warren, Veronica Washington, Michael Webb, Timmy Whiddon, Lynne Wilhelm, Edith Williams, Larry Williams, Samantha Williams, Terry Williamson, John Wilson, Sylvia Wilson, Tracey Wilson, Christina Woodridge, Norman Woodridge, Janet Woods, Mary Woodward, Robert Woodward, Fred Young, Judy Young, Carol Zamjahn, Kevin Zamjahn, Bruce Zeringue, Peggy Zeringue. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Nast, Dianne)
June 22, 2012 Filing 121 INCORRECTLY FILED MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by McKesson Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Rosati, Pavan) Modified on 6/25/2012 (STB). SEE DE 1975 FOR CORRECT ENTRY
June 22, 2012 Party Covidien Inc., Covidien PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC, Generics Bidco II, LLC, Generics International (US PARENT), Inc., Generics International (US), Inc., Mallinckrodt, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Propst Distribution, Inc., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Brenn Distribution, Inc. and Brenn Manufacturing, Inc. terminated. (LST)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER; All remaining claims against the Generic Defendants in the above- captioned matters are DISMISSED, with prejudice. For purposes of this Order, the term "Generic Defendants" includes Brenn Distribution, Inc.; Brenn Manufacturing, Inc.; Covidien Inc.; Covidien plc; Generics Bidco I, LLC; Generics Bidco II, LLC; Generics International (US Parent), Inc.; Generics International (US), Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc.; Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Mallinckrodt Holdings, LLC; Mallinckrodt Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan, Inc.; Propst Distribution, Inc.; Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Teva Biopharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Pharmaceuticals (New Jersey), Inc.; Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Cornerstone BioPharma, Inc.; Cornerstone BioPharma Holdings, Inc.; Aristos Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc., incorrectly named as Able Laboratories, Inc. n/k/a Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc.; and any other named defendant alleged to have produced or sold generic propoxyphene.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/22/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(LST)cc: COR
June 19, 2012 ***Reopened Documents per Virtual Order 1960 (1536 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00258-DCR) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, (37 in 2:11-cv-00332-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 70 in 2:11-cv-00378-DCR, 23 in 2:12-cv-00042-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00381-DCR, 40 in 2:11-cv-00377-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00365-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00376-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00329-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00369-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00375-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00328-DCR, 26 in 2:12-cv-00011-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00353-DCR, 64 in 2:11-cv-00324-DCR, 74 in 2:11-cv-00364-DCR, 14 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR, 39 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 42 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR, 42 in 2:11-cv-00351-DCR, 77 in 2:11-cv-00184-DCR, 65 in 2:11-cv-00331-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00337-DCR, 23 in 2:12-cv-00048-DCR, 63 in 2:11-cv-00330-DCR, 13 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00394-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00339-DCR, 39 in 2:11-cv-00335-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00384-DCR, 47 in 2:11-cv-00355-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00363-DCR) MOTION for Judgment by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly & Company, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Inc., Eli Lilly & Company Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting (1958, 103 in 2:11-cv-00364-DCR, 68 in 2:11-cv-00351-DCR, 58 in 2:11-cv-00332-DCR, 62 in 2:11-cv-00369-DCR, 59 in 2:11-cv-00353-DCR, 41 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 69 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR, 118 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 67 in 2:11-cv-00384-DCR, 60 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 60 in 2:11-cv-00335-DCR, 71 in 2:11-cv-00355-DCR, 1958 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 91 in 2:11-cv-00330-DCR, 107 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 82 in 2:11-cv-00376-DCR, 50 in 2:12-cv-00042-DCR, 69 in 2:11-cv-00365-DCR, 50 in 2:12-cv-00011-DCR, 92 in 2:11-cv-00375-DCR, 45 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR, 69 in 2:11-cv-00381-DCR, 82 in 2:11-cv-00328-DCR, 58 in 2:11-cv-00339-DCR, 99 in 2:11-cv-00324-DCR, 100 in 2:11-cv-00184-DCR, 100 in 2:11-cv-00378-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00394-DCR, 60 in 2:11-cv-00363-DCR, 73 in 2:11-cv-00258-DCR, 98 in 2:11-cv-00331-DCR, 48 in 2:12-cv-00048-DCR, 66 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR, 65 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 103 in 2:11-cv-00329-DCR, 64 in 2:11-cv-00377-DCR, 62 in 2:11-cv-00337-DCR) Motions To Reinstate Its Motions for Judgment On The Pleadings re (1536 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, (1537 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reinstate defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings for Maryland cases with respect to the claims asserted against it in Civil Action No. 2:11-258-DCR, and its Second Master Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with respect to the claims asserted against it in the operative complaint in the above-reference matters except Plaintiffs Feride Buch, Lou Davis, Eddie McCoy, James E. Morel, Johnnie Nelson, Farahnaz Poozeshi, Candice Shannon, Eva McCrary and Beverly Smith in Civil Action No. 2: 11-324-DCR. The plaintiffs shall be given until July 5, 2012, to respond to these reinstated motions.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/19/2012. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
June 19, 2012 Filing 118 MOTION To Reinstate Its Motions for Judgment On The Pleadings re (1536 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, (1537 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly & Company, Eli Lilly & Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Metzger, Kimberly)
June 12, 2012 Set Hearings: STATUS CONFERENCE set for 7/23/2012 at 01:30 PM in COVINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER: the Status Conference previously scheduled for Monday, June 18, 2012, at the United States Courthouse in Covington, Kentucky is SET ASIDE. The parties may submit written status reports to the Court if they so desire. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/12/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Cov Diary
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting (1908 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, et al) MOTION to Withdraw for Withdrawal of Counsel by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals (New Jersey), Inc. Attorney P. Edward Pratt is relieved of further responsibility in these cases. The Clerk of the Court and counsel may remove his name from electronic service notices. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 6/4/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
June 4, 2012 Filing 115 MOTION to Withdraw by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals (New Jersey), Inc. Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel, MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals (New Jersey), Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(McMillan, Summer)
May 31, 2012 Set Hearing per MDL 178: STATUS CONFERENCE set for 6/18/2012 at 01:30 PM in COVINGTON before Judge Danny C. Reeves. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
May 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 PROCEDURES GOVERNING DISCOVERY (See Order for items I-VI). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/25/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
May 23, 2012 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO M. Cheffo re RESPONSE (1865 in 2:11-md- 02226-DCR, et al); Error 1: All filers to this entry were not selected; Entry by attorney; Clerk added omitted filers Teva Pharmaceuticals, USA, Inc., Teva Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Brenn Distribution, Inc., Brenn Manufacturing, Inc., Propst Distribution, Inc., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Error 2: Error: a link was created to the Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority only; Entry by attorney; Clerk modified the entry to create a link to MDL 1645 Show Cause Order also. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
May 22, 2012 Filing 113 GENERIC DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' SUBMISSION OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY REGARDING ORDER TO SHOWCAUSE WHY CLAIMS AGAINST GENERIC DEFENDANTS SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED to (1799 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 69 in 2:11-cv-00397-DCR, 106 in 2:11-cv-00380-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00304-DCR, 59 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR, 91 in 2:11-cv-00325-DCR, 24 in 2:12-cv-00068-DCR, 169 in 2:11-cv-00301-DCR, 95 in 2:11-cv-00352-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 61 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR, 51 in 2:11-cv-00333-DCR, 60 in 2:11-cv-00374-DCR, 58 in 2:11-cv-00358-DCR, 53 in 2:11-cv-00363-DCR, 93 in 2:11-cv-00329-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00377-DCR, 64 in 2:11-cv-00355-DCR, 48 in 2:12-cv-00062-DCR, 60 in 2:11-cv-00351-DCR, 174 in 2:11-cv-00298-DCR, 34 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 77 in 2:11-cv-00177-DCR, 36 in 2:12-cv-00046-DCR, 74 in 2:11-cv-00215-DCR, 162 in 2:11-cv-00182-DCR, 33 in 2:12-cv-00045-DCR, 87 in 2:11-cv-00364-DCR, 38 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR, 55 in 2:12-cv-00032-DCR, 32 in 2:12-cv-00049-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00350-DCR, 84 in 2:11-cv-00378-DCR, 105 in 2:11-cv-00196-DCR, 51 in 2:11-cv-00339-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00379-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00369-DCR, 46 in 2:12-cv-00066-DCR, 58 in 2:11-cv-00384-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00357-DCR, 49 in 2:11-cv-00322-DCR, 179 in 2:11-cv-00186-DCR, 68 in 2:11-cv-00396-DCR, 116 in 2:11-cv-00179-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 180 in 2:11-cv-00300-DCR, 60 in 2:11-cv-00365-DCR, 187 in 2:11-cv-00297-DCR, 163 in 2:11-cv-00175-DCR, 63 in 2:11-cv-00394-DCR, 129 in 2:11-cv-00210-DCR, 30 in 2:12-cv-00067-DCR, 59 in 2:11-cv-00347-DCR, 24 in 2:12-cv-00080-DCR, 74 in 2:11-cv-00376-DCR, 54 in 2:11-cv-00337-DCR, 79 in 2:11-cv-00330-DCR, 53 in 2:11-cv-00335-DCR, 66 in 2:11-cv-00373-DCR, 137 in 2:11-cv-00295-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00375-DCR, 63 in 2:11-cv-00401-DCR, 42 in 2:12-cv-00042-DCR, 71 in 2:11-cv-00354-DCR, 153 in 2:11-cv-00213-DCR, 53 in 2:11-cv-00399-DCR, 64 in 2:11-cv-00198-DCR, 53 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 196 in 2:11-cv-00185-DCR, 28 in 2:12-cv-00074-DCR, 35 in 2:12-cv-00041-DCR, 122 in 2:11-cv-00200-DCR, 190 in 2:11-cv-00191-DCR, 81 in 2:11-cv-00331-DCR, 177 in 2:11-cv-00296-DCR, 77 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 171 in 2:11-cv-00299-DCR, 60 in 2:11-cv-00381-DCR, 52 in 2:11-cv-00353-DCR, 34 in 2:12-cv-00063-DCR, 42 in 2:11-cv-00344-DCR, 180 in 2:11-cv-00190-DCR, 35 in 2:12-cv-00047-DCR, 95 in 2:11-cv-00204-DCR, 40 in 2:12-cv-00040-DCR, 93 in 2:11-cv-00184-DCR, 54 in 2:12-cv-00072-DCR, 40 in 2:12-cv-00048-DCR, 51 in 2:11-cv-00332-DCR, 41 in 2:12-cv-00026-DCR, 36 in 2:12-cv-00033-DCR, 36 in 2:12-cv-00043-DCR, 86 in 2:11-cv-00324-DCR, 78 in 2:11-cv-00180-DCR, 72 in 2:11-cv-00328-DCR, 194 in 2:11-cv-00197-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00188-DCR) filed by Generics Bidco I, LLC, Generics Bidco II, LLC, Generics International (US PARENT), Inc., Generics International (US), Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Biopharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Brenn Distribution, Inc., Brenn Manufacturing, Inc., Propst Distribution, Inc., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; and Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chart, #2 Schedule of Cases)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Cheffo, Mark) Modified text (description) on 5/23/2012 (CBD). Added omitted filers on 5/23/2012 (CBD).
May 10, 2012 Filing 112 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Debby Jones as to Teva Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 111 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Debby Jones as to NeoSan Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 110 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Debby Jones as to aaiPharma LLC. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 109 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Debby Jones as to aaiPharma, Inc.. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 108 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Debby Jones as to AAI Development Services, Inc.. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 107 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debby Jones via Certified Mail Return Receipt to Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 106 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debby Jones via Certified Mail Retrun Receipt to Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc. served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 105 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debby Jones via Certified Mail Return Receipt to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 104 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debby Jones via Certified Mail Return Receipt to Generics Bidco I, LLC served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 103 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debby Jones via Certified Mail Return Receipt to Generics Bidco II, LLC served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 102 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debby Jones via Certified Mail Return Receipt to Generics International (US PARENT), Inc. served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 101 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debby Jones via Certified Mail Return Receipt to Generics International (US), Inc. served on 2/29/2012, answer due 3/21/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 10, 2012 Filing 100 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debby Jones via Certified Mail Return Receipt to Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. sent on 2/29/2012, package signed for but not dated. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified text on 5/11/2012 (CBD).
May 10, 2012 Filing 99 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debby Jones via Certified Mail Return Receipt to Eli Lilly and Company served on 3/6/2012, answer due 3/27/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified service and andswer dates on 5/11/2012 (CBD).
May 10, 2012 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING DOCUMENTS FROM THE RECORD re #90 , #91 , #92 , #93 , #94 , #95 , #96 , #97 , #98 Executed Summons were incorrectly filed using the event Affidavit of Service and entries contained INCOMPLETE PDF documents filed as main documents which were scanned sideways; Attorney shall re-file the corrected Summons Returned Executed by filing a copy of the summons issued by the Clerk, with the declaration of service completed stating the method of service, and the executed certified mail receipts for Summons within seven (7) calendar days. *STB* cc: COR (CBD)
May 9, 2012 Filing 98 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 5/10/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2012 (CBD).
May 9, 2012 Filing 97 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 5/10/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2012 (CBD).
May 9, 2012 Filing 96 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 5/10/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2012 (CBD).
May 9, 2012 Filing 95 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 5/10/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2012 (CBD).
May 9, 2012 Filing 94 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 5/10/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2012 (CBD).
May 9, 2012 Filing 93 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 5/10/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2012 (CBD).
May 9, 2012 Filing 92 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 5/10/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2012 (CBD).
May 9, 2012 Filing 91 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 5/10/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2012 (CBD).
May 9, 2012 Filing 90 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 5/10/2012. (Plymale, Douglas) Modified on 5/10/2012 (CBD).
May 9, 2012 Filing 89 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Mallinckrodt, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 88 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Covidien PLC waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 87 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Covidien, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 86 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 85 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 84 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Propst Distribution, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 83 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Brenn Manufacturing, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 82 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Brenn Distribution, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 81 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Mylan, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 80 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 9, 2012 Filing 79 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Debby Jones. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER: the Generic Defendants (as identified in Record No. 1645 in 2:11-md-2226) shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this Order within which to reply to Plaintiffs' Submission of Supplemental Authority Regarding Order to Show Cause Why Claims Against Generic Defendants Should Not Be Dismissed. [Record No. 1799 in 2:11-md-2226] Such reply shall not exceed fifteen (15) pages. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/8/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER: the Status Conference previously scheduled for Monday, May 21, 2012, at the United States Courthouse in Covington, Kentucky is SET ASIDE. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/8/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Cov Diary
May 8, 2012 Filing 76 NOTICE OF FILING by Kristine Esposito, et al re (1645 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Order to Show Cause Plaintiffs' Submission of Supplemental Authority Regarding Order to Show Cause Why Claims Against Generic Defendants Should Not Be Dismissed, with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bartlett Decision)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Nast, Dianne) Modified text w/ "et al" on 5/8/2012 (CBD).
May 8, 2012 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re (MDL 1798, et al) Notice of Filing was an INCORRECT PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the corrected Notice of Filing within seven (7) calendar days. *STB* cc: COR Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
May 8, 2012 Clerk's Note: Counsel's office called this date to advise main pdf image at MDL 1798, et al (Notice of Filing) is incorrect and corrected image would be filed this date. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
May 7, 2012 Filing 75 STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCORRECT PDF IMAGE PURSUANT to Notice of Striking Document filed 5/8/2012 Modified on 5/8/2012 (CBD).
May 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AGREED ORDER REGARDING ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS IN CASES IN WHICH PLAINTIFFS HAVE NOT AMENDED THEIR PLEADINGS: Ordered CASES CURRENTLY PENDING IN THE MDL 1. Any Plaintiff with a case pending in MDL 2226 who has not already filed or been denied leave to file an Amended Complaint, may file an Amended Complaint within twenty-one (21) calendar days of this Order. A Plaintiff who has already filed an Amended Complaint, or who has been denied leave to file an Amended Complaint, must request and obtain leave of Court before filing an amended or subsequent complaint. A Plaintiff whose action against Lilly has been dismissed with prejudice may not file an Amended Complaint against Lilly. 2. Nothing in Paragraph 1 is intended to, or shall, toll, revive, alter, amend or otherwise affect any statute of limitations or repose, or any other time-bar, regarding a cause of action. 3. Upon the filing of an Amended Complaint, or upon expiration of the time for filing Amended Complaints, Lilly may request that its Second Master Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [MDL Record No. 1537], or its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings for Maryland Cases [MDL Record No. 1536], if previously withdrawn and denied without prejudice as to that Plaintiff, be revived without re-filing. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, Plaintiff's response will be due within seven (7) days of the motion being revived as to Plaintiff. 4. Upon the filing of an Amended Complaint pursuant to Paragraph 1 of this Order, or upon expiration of the time for filing an Amended Complaint, and if the Plaintiff in the Amended Complaint is from a State that has been the subject of a previous Order to Dismiss claims against Lilly, Lilly may request that the Court issue an order directing Plaintiff(s) to show cause why the Order on Lillys First Master Motion ("Lilly's Motion") [MDL Record No. 1402] should not apply to the newly-filed Amended Complaint, or if no Amended Complaint was filed to the original complaint. If the plaintiff is from a State that has not been subject to a prior Order for Dismissal of claims against Lilly, Lilly must affirmatively file a Motion to Dismiss or a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. 5. In responding to a dispositive motion by Lilly or Order to Show Cause pertaining to Lilly, it is not necessary for Plaintiffs subject to this Order to submit papers addressing the arguments raised in Plaintiffs' oppositions to the motions to dismiss and motions for judgment on the pleadings of Eli Lilly and Company [MDL Record Nos. 635, 1692, 1696] and of Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [MDL Record Nos. 908, 909, 914, 1553, 1707], or to address any arguments raised in any future consolidated oppositions that Plaintiffs may file in response to motion to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings by Lilly. Those memoranda shall be deemed to be incorporated by reference for all Plaintiffs subject to this Order. 6. If, upon receiving a response to a show-cause order issued pursuant to Paragraph 4 of this Order, the Court requires a response from Lilly, the Court will so direct by separate order. 7. Nothing in this Order shall prevent Lilly from answering or otherwise responding to a complaint or amended complaint as contemplated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FUTURE CASES TRANSFERRED TO MDL 2226 8. Within twenty-one (21) calendar days of a new complaint being opened in the MDL or upon leave of Court, the Plaintiff(s) may file an Amended Complaint. 9. Nothing in Paragraph 8 is intended to, or shall, toll, revive, alter, amend, or otherwise affect any statute of limitations or repose, or any other time-bar, regarding a cause of action. 10. Upon the filing of an Amended Complaint, or upon the passing of twenty-one (21) calendar days of a new complaint being opened in the MDL, and if the Plaintiff is from a State that has been the subject of a previous Order to Dismiss claims against Lilly, Lilly may request that the Court issue an order directing Plaintiff(s) to show cause why the Order on Lilly's Motion [MDL Record No. 1402] should not apply to the newly-filed Amended Complaint, or, if no Amended Complaint is filed, to the original complaint. If a Plaintiff is from a State that has not been subject to a prior Order for Dismissal of claims against Lilly, Lilly must affirmatively file a Motion to Dismiss or a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. 11. In responding to a dispositive motion by Lilly or Order to Show Cause pertaining to Lilly, it is not necessary for Plaintiffs subject to this Order to submit papers addressing the arguments raised in Plaintiffs' oppositions to the motions to dismiss and motions for judgment on the pleadings of Eli Lilly and Company [MDL Record Nos. 635, 1692, 1696] and of Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. [MDL Record Nos. 908, 909, 914, 1553, 1707], or to address any arguments raised in any future consolidated oppositions that Plaintiffs may file in response to motion to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings of Lilly. Those memoranda shall be deemed to be incorporated by reference for all Plaintiffs subject to this Order. 12. If, upon receiving a response to a show-cause order issued pursuant to Paragraph 10 of this Order, the Court requires a response from Lilly, the Court will so direct by separate order. 13. Nothing in this Order shall prevent Lilly from answering or otherwise responding to a complaint or amended complaint as contemplated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 5/4/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
May 1, 2012 Filing 73 NOTICE of Change of Address by Victoria D. Lockard Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Lockard, Victoria)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S SECOND MASTER MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS IN 40 CASES: Defendant Eli Lilly and Companys Second Master Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings [MDL Record No. 1537] is DENIED, without prejudice, in the above-captioned cases. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/30/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
April 27, 2012 Filing 71 NOTICE of Change of Address by Lori G. Cohen Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Cohen, Lori)
April 27, 2012 Filing 70 NOTICE by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Inc. re (1536 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, (1537 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Of Withdraw of Pending Dispositive Motions as to Certain Plaintiffs Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Metzger, Kimberly)
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/23/2012, before Judge Danny C. Reeves: 1) Within fourteen (14) calendar days from the date of this Status Conference, the parties shall submit a proposed discovery plan. 2) Within ten (10) calendar days from the date of this Status Conference, the parties shall submit a proposed agreed order establishing a procedure to address motions to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings by Eli Lilly and Company in cases in which the plaintiffs have not yet amended their complaints. 3) Within ten (10) calendar days from the date of this Status Conference, the defendants shall file a notice that lists those cases in which plaintiffs have filed amended complaints without leave to amend. Within ten (10) calendar days thereafter, each plaintiff so identified shall respond by showing cause why the amended complaint should not be stricken or by filing a motion for leave to amend. 4) Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction in Case No. 2:12-cv-50-DCR is taken under advisement. 5) Subject to intervening orders, the next Status Conference shall be held on May 21, 2012, at 1:30 p.m. at the United States Courthouse in Covington, Kentucky. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on Danny C. Reeves.(Court Reporter Joan Averdick.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. (CBD)cc: COR
April 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER: paragraph 6 of the Court's Order Directing Plaintiffs to Show Cause Why Claims as to Generic Defendants Should Not Be Dismissed [Record No. 1645] is AMENDED to read as follows: 6. This Order shall not apply to cases with pending Motions for Remand, or to cases that have been removed from state court, until all Motions for Remand in those cases are resolved. However, the defendants need not move, answer, or otherwise respond to Complaints or Amended Complaints in such cases until further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/24/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
April 19, 2012 Filing 67 PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S SECOND MASTER MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS re (22 in 2:12-cv-00007-DCR, 60 in 2:11-cv-00359-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00332-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 70 in 2:11-cv-00378-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00362-DCR, 40 in 2:11-cv-00377-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00365-DCR, 62 in 2:11-cv-00180-DCR, 52 in 2:11-cv-00354-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00369-DCR, 63 in 2:11-cv-00371-DCR, 60 in 2:11-cv-00360-DCR, 61 in 2:11-cv-00177-DCR, 54 in 2:11-cv-00366-DCR, 71 in 2:11-cv-00350-DCR, 33 in 2:11-cv-00400-DCR, 23 in 2:12-cv-00040-DCR, 14 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR, 39 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 42 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR, 42 in 2:11-cv-00351-DCR, 75 in 2:11-cv-00352-DCR, 58 in 2:11-cv-00379-DCR, 1537 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00337-DCR, 23 in 2:12-cv-00048-DCR, 67 in 2:11-cv-00188-DCR, 13 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 58 in 2:11-cv-00367-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00384-DCR, 47 in 2:11-cv-00355-DCR, 19 in 2:12-cv-00062-DCR, 28 in 2:12-cv-00010-DCR, 24 in 2:12-cv-00003-DCR, 23 in 2:12-cv-00042-DCR, 58 in 2:11-cv-00215-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00381-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00376-DCR, 79 in 2:11-cv-00201-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00329-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00375-DCR, 73 in 2:11-cv-00325-DCR, 57 in 2:11-cv-00328-DCR, 26 in 2:12-cv-00011-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00353-DCR, 64 in 2:11-cv-00324-DCR, 74 in 2:11-cv-00364-DCR, 74 in 2:11-cv-00221-DCR, 26 in 2:11-cv-00399-DCR, 27 in 2:12-cv-00001-DCR, 77 in 2:11-cv-00184-DCR, 65 in 2:11-cv-00331-DCR, 63 in 2:11-cv-00330-DCR, 84 in 2:11-cv-00380-DCR, 17 in 2:12-cv-00066-DCR, 63 in 2:11-cv-00372-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00394-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00339-DCR, 59 in 2:11-cv-00370-DCR, 39 in 2:11-cv-00335-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00363-DCR) filed by Jim W. Aaron, Jr, Ericka Adams, Jimmie D. Adams, Rodney Adams, Teena Adams, Alice Aday, Martin Aday, Nicolae Aga, Lola Ainsworth, Needa Alexander, Russell Alexander, Thomas D. Alexander, Gleneda Alford, Aundra Alfred, Scott Almon, Larry Altstatt, Hester I. Anderson, Mary Ann Anderson, William Anderson, Dorothy Atkinson, Peggy Atwell, Sue Aubert, Vincent Aubert, Bennie Austin, Gloria Babineaux, L. Jolene Baker, Everett Ballard, Rita Ballesteros, Tyra Barabino, Margaret Barnes, Linda Barrios, Ronald Barrios, Michael Becnel, John Bector, Jr, Dennis Bell, Joy Marie Bell, William Bennett, Ellen Bickham, John Bickham, Elester Bingham, Clara Blanton, Betty Boggess, Mary Bookout, Andreas Borer, Connie Boudreaux, Denise Boudreaux, Jerry Boudreaux, Kordia Bowman, George Boyd, Patricia Braley, Rebecca Brinson, Kenneth Brookins, Lance Broussard, Sr, Aaron Brown, Donald Brown, Joanne Brown, Nettie Brown, Tishie Brown, Faye Brumfield, Jeremiah Brumfield, Feride Buch, Jody Buckley, Frances Burch, Albert Burke, Marilyn Burnson, Phillip Burnson, Gladys Butler, Shirley Cain, Clara Calamia, Martha Cannella, Freda Capers, Lorenzo Carreras, Barbara Carter, Elaine Carter, Charles Case, Shirley Case, Matthew Celestin, Debra Chaisson, Kent Chapman, Kent Charles, Yolanda Charles, Randy Chavez, Carolyn Christophe, Rebecca Churchman, Vincent Cinquigranno, Jeanette Clarke, Earnestine Clifton, Valerie Coats, Joseph Cochran, Norma S Cochran, Gail Coleman, Kevin Collins, Wayne Collins, Laurabelle Combre, Paul Ray Combs, Helen S. Cooper, Virginia Cormier, Kelly Craddock-Boone, Katherine Craig, Loretta Criss, Donald Crowell, Tara Cryer, Connie Culbreath, Gus E. Culbreath, III, George Curvin, Rita Curvin, Marie Cutrer, Sam Cutrer, Charles Daggs, Jr, Margaret Daniels, James Danos, Tena Danos, Iva Davis, Johnny Davis, Lou Davis, Sheila Dawson, Brandon DePascal, Hilda DePascal, Geneva DeVine, James H. DeVine, Jewel K. Dear, Gladys Delaune, Carol Depew, Alice Derry, Tim Dickerson, Freddie Dixson, Marlene Dixson, Angela Dorsey, Herman Douglas, Melissa Doyle, Debra Duhe, Michael Duhe, Peggy Duhe, Jan Duke, Raymond Duke, Hattie Dunaway, Debra Duncan, Lambert Duncan, Sr, Rita Dunn, Linda Dupre, William E. Dykes, Jr, Cynthia Dyson, Jackie Edwards, Mary Edwards, James J. Ellis, Jan Ellis, Joycelyn Ernest, Dennis Evans, Joann Evans, Patricia Faircloth, Anthony Faucetta, Sr, Shannon Felts, Dollene Felty, Kenneth Felty, Mary K. Fisher, Louann Fisher-Smith, Emma Fitch, Curmer Foreman, Cindy Fowler, Jasper Frabbiele, Joan Frabbiele, Rosie Franks, Lois Gail Frederick, Delores Freeman, Rita Fuller, Linda Gallagher, Kevin Galloway, Sarah Galloway, Truman Galloway, Patrick Garrett, Pamela George, Rex Gibson, John Gilbert, Tammy Gilbert, Leah Glass, Thomas Goforth, Martha Golman, Deloris Gray, Gerry Grayer, Patricia Grayer, Virginia Greer, Jacqueline Griffith, Randall Guess, Hazel Hack, Billy Hall, Claudia Hall, Jimmie Hannah, Anna Hardy, Jan Harper, Rodney Harper, William Harper, Joseph Harris, Jr, Michelle Harris, Stacy Harris, Theresa Harvey, Cindy Hawthorne, Forest Hawthorne, Marry A. Hect, Marry A. Hect, Alex Henry, Ethel Henry, Genell Hernandez, William Hernandez, Jr, Von Higgins, Joseph Holden, Cathey Holland, Joe Holland, Alfonzia Hollins, III, James Holloway, Lillie Mae Holloway, Roger Wayne Holloway, Melissa Homer, Wendell Homer, Anthony Hoofkin, Joseph Hooks, Jane Hoover, Jesse Hoover, III, Amy Houston, Gilbert Howard, Teresa Howard, Holsy Hubbard, III, Kathleen Hubbard, Trina Hubbard, Daniel Hudson, Susan Hudson, Gerald E. Hunter El, Jack Hutchinson, Cloedale Hymel, Joseph Hymel, Jr, Aaron Ingram, Angie Ingram, Pearl Jackson, Cathy James-Collins, James Jenkins, Eugene Johnson, Irene Johnson, Leonard Johnson, Jr, Matthew Johnson, Peggy Johnson, Tracy Johnson, Virgie Joiner, Clifford Jones, Debby Jones, Gail Jones, Jannifer Jones, Robert Jones, Stephanie Jones, Veronica Jones, Marshall Juergens, Allison Juge, Larry Kastner, Rita Kastner, Ray Kendrick, William Kitchens, Ronald K. Knight, Gilbert Knoblock, Billy Lambert, Frances Lane, Catherine LeBoeuf, Patsy L. Lebrun, Maureen Ledet, Belinda Lee, Mark Lee, Sr, Chrisa Leonard, Lester Leonard, Deborah Leslie, Brenda Lewis-Crossno, Dora Lighty, Ramona Lindley, Paulette Linville, Bessie Littleton, Judas Littleton, Charles Loftin, Betty Lofton, Cora Louque, Ridgie Louque, Adeline Loyd, Ellis Loyd, Mary E. Loyd, Bruce Luquette, Linda Luquette, Robbie Maas, Sr, Bonnie MacDonald, Arthur Major, Louis Malbrough, Marlene Mancuso, Geraldine Marcotte, Wilfred Marcotte, James Marler, Mary Marsh, Nora L. Marston, Walter Martin, Joyce Martinez, Louis Martinez, Jr, Armand Mataya, Sr, Renee Mataya, Courtney Matthews, Allise McAlpine, Carolyn McCall, Olga McClanahan, Roger McClanahan, Bobby McCoy, Calvin McCoy, Clinden McCoy, Eddie McCoy, Edna McCoy, Leroy McCoy, Luke McCoy, Mary McCoy, Venessa McCoy, Vonceal McCoy, Eva McCrary, Rebecca McCrary, Sigrid McDaniel, Brenda McGee, Castadera McGee, Susan McMullen, James McNay, Mary Turnage McPhail, Effie Melancon, Dorothy Mendel, Clara Miller, Jay Miller, Marcia Miller, Ramona Miller, Arthur Millet, Donna Mitchell, Thomas Mitchell, William D Mitchell, Sherry Mobley, Eva Moffett, Mary Morales, Russell Morales, Paul Morefield, Rose E. Morefield, Edith Morehead, Steve Morehead, James E. Morel, Rafael Moreno, Michael Mosley, Maxine Moten, Olga Murray, Cynthia Myles, Johnnie Nelson, Rebecca Nevels, Melvin Nolan, Jr, Christina Norman, Eddie Odom, Rose Orfanello, Bonnie Orgeron, David Orgeron, Melvina Otillio, Martha Overbay, Vivian Albert Overbay, Joanne Paige, Bernard Parker, Carnus Parker, Jr, Julian Parker, Rhonda Parker, Angela Parson, Bernadette Patin, Charlotte Patterson, Phillip Patterson, Raymond Payne, Morsie Pearson-Wright, Audrey Percy, Willis Percy, Christine Perkins, Mytrice Perry, Cynthia Petrie, Donald Petrie, Narvin Petty, Jr, Wanda Picket, Bobbie Sue Pierce, Ann Piquiet, Anthony Pitts, Farahnaz Poozeshi, Pinnie Pounds, Linda Powell, Larry Prestenbach, Jacqueline Price, Louis Price, Sr, Mary Price, Beverly Provis, Chris Puckett, Charles Quey, Linda Quey, Stephen Quick, Louis Ray, Octavia Raymond, Kacie Reynolds, Patsy Richard, Donna Robert, Eldred B. Robert, Sr, Keith Robert, Daniel Roberts, Young A. Roberts, Jr, Billy Rodrigue, Marlene Rodrigue, William Romair, Kathryn Roussell, Lena Ruby, Doris Salamone, Vincent Salamone, Mary Salard, Dianne Salvant, Jimmie Louise Sandel, Mary Sapia, Michael Sapia, Willard Sapp, Shirley Sasani, Janette Savoie, Jill Sawyer, April Schexnaydre, Robert Schexnaydre, Jr, Rose Ann Scott, Margaret Segraves, Andrea H. Self, Dennis Self, Carolyn Serpas, Jack Norman Serpas, Candice Shannon, William Shows, Clarence D. Shumaker, Georgia Silver, Randolph Simmons, Mary Skinner, Linda Sloan, Agnes Smith, Beverly Smith, Christopher R. Smith, Gertha Smith, Glen Smith, Joe Smith, Sharon S. Smith, Shirley Smith, Wayne Smith, Alice Spencer, Kenneth Spikes, Patricia Spillers, John Spires, Sr, Nancy Jean Spires, Barbara Stelly, Joseph Stelly, Lisa Stevens, Calvin Stewart, Jr, Kim Stewart, Sheila Stewart, Wayne Stringfellow, James Swanner, Rosemary Swanner, Charlotte Swible, John Swible, Jr, Patricia Talbert, Linda Tannerhill, William R. Tannerhill, Lois Tate, Alice Taylor, Stephanie Taylor-Foy, Bertell Thomas, Dianne Thomas, Roberta Tiner, Dennis Tisdale, Linda Tisdale, Helena Tureaud, David C. Turner, James Turner, Judy Earnestine Turner, Martha Turner, Lenora Upshaw, Daisy Valle, Barbara Vance, Marin Vaughn, Marshall Vaughn, George Vercher, Valerie Vercher, Michell Vogel, Calvin Wagers, Coy G. Waldrop, Inez Walker, Larry Walker, Evelyn Warlick, Gennie Warren, Veronica Washington, Michael Webb, John Wheeler, Timmy Whiddon, Fearron White, Lynne Wilhelm, Catherine Williams, Edith Williams, Larry Williams, Lonnika S. Williams, Samantha Williams, Walter Williams, Terry Williamson, John Wilson, Sylvia Wilson, Tracey Wilson, Dorothy Mae Windham, Christina Woodridge, Norman Woodridge, Janet Woods, Mary Woodward, Robert Woodward, Bobby York, Fred Young, Judy Young, Carol Zamjahn, Kevin Zamjahn, Bruce Zeringue, Peggy Zeringue. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Nast, Dianne) Modified text to match caption on 4/19/2012 (CBD).
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER: Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file Plaintiff Roberta A. Dunn's letter (dated April 13, 2012), together with all attachments in the file of this proceeding. The Court will determine at a subsequent date whether Ms. Dunn and her counsel, Michael T. Gallagher, should appear before the Court to address the propriety of the plaintiff's letter. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/18/2012. (Attachments: #1 April 13, 2012 Letter of Roberta Dunn)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
April 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, the parties are notified of the following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the Status Conference currently scheduled for April 23, 2012 at 1:30 p.m., local time.I. Product Identification Discovery II. Discovery Plan III. Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Generic Defendants' Motions to Dismiss in Order to Certify Ruling for Interlocutory Appeal IV. Procedure for Global Applicability of March 7, 2012 Order V. Generic Defendants' Request for Relief from Responsive Pleading Deadlines VI. Amended Complaints Filed After Dispositive Motions VII. Motion to Remand. In the event counsel have not discussed the items outlined above, they are directed to confer in advance of the upcoming Scheduling Conference in a good faith effort to reach agreement to the extent that such is feasible. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/17/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: 1. On or before April 24, 2012, plaintiffs in each case with any remaining claims pending against any Generic Defendant are directed to SHOW CAUSE why the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order Regarding Generic Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [Record No. 1305] is not applicable to their claims against the Generic Defendant(s) and why any andall claims pending against the Generic Defendants as of the date of this Order should not be dismissed, with prejudice, in their entirety. For purposes of this Order, the term "Generic Defendants include Brenn Distribution, Inc.; Brenn Manufacturing, Inc.; Covidien Inc.; Covidien plc; Generics Bidco I, LLC; Generics Bidco II, LLC; Generics International (US Parent), Inc.; Generics International (US), Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.; Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc.; Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC; Mallinckrodt Holdings, LLC; Mallinckrodt Inc.; Mallinckrodt LLC; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Mylan, Inc.; Propst Distribution, Inc.; Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Teva Biopharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Watson Pharmaceuticals (New Jersey), Inc.; Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Ivax Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Cornerstone BioPharma, Inc.; Cornerstone BioPharma Holdings, Inc.; Aristos Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. incorrectly named as Able Laboratories, Inc. n/k/a Sun Pharmaceuticals Industries, Inc. (Sun denies ever manufacturing propoxyphene); and any other named defendant alleged to have produced or sold generic propoxyphene. 2. For any new action docketed in this MDL on or after the date of this Order which purports to assert a claim against a Generic Defendant, the Clerk of the Court shall immediately provide a copy of this Order to the plaintiffs in said action, and the plaintiffs shall comply with the above SHOW CAUSE Order within fourteen (14) days after the date on which this Order is served. 3. It is not necessary for plaintiffs subject to this Order to submit papers addressing the arguments raised in Plaintiffs' Consolidated Memorandum in Opposition to Generic Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. [Record No. 568] That Memorandum shall be deemed to be incorporated by reference for all plaintiffs subject to this Order. 4. If the Court determines that a reply is needed from any of the Generic Defendants to the plaintiffs' response to this Show Cause Order, it will be directed by separate Order. 5. The Generic Defendants need not move, answer, or otherwise respond to Complaints or Amended Complaints until further Order of the Court. Nothing in this Order is intended to preclude any Defendant from answering any Complaint or Amended Complaint prior to a new deadline being established by Order; however, the Generic Defendants shall not, without leave of Court, file motions to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings basedon Mensing as such motions would be duplicative of the Show Cause process set forth herein. 6. This Order shall not apply to cases with pending Motions for Remand, or to cases that have been removed from state court, until all Motions for Remand in those cases are resolved.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/10/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR This Order was AMENEDED - See Orders 1721 , 2083 Modified text on 4/24/2012 (CBD). Modified on 12/3/2013 (CBD).
April 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: The Court was advised previously that several plaintiffs in this multi-district litigation have not provided discovery responses authorized by the Case Management and Scheduling Order entered October 4, 2011. On this date, counsel for the defendants provided supplemental information listing the responsible attorneys as well as the specific cases in which this discoveryremains outstanding. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED as follows:The following attorneys shall appear at the next hearing scheduled for April 23, 2012, beginning at the hour of 1:30 p.m., for the purpose of addressing their failure to provide discovery ordered by the Court. 1. Olivier v. Xanondyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., Case No. 2: 11-214-DCR Lawrence N. Curtis 2. Teran v. Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al., Case No. 2: 11-216-DCR Louis Teran 3. Turner v. Watson Pharmaceuticals (NJ), Inc., et al.,Case No. 2: 11-221-DCR W. Richard Baker, Jr. 4. Williams v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Case No. 2: 11-382-DCR Philip Bohrer and/or Scott E. Brady5. Dyes v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Case No. 2: 11-385-DCR Philip Bohrer and/or Scott Brady 6. Magee v. Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., et al.,Case No. 2: 12-009-DCR - David W. Stewart and/or Michael J. Sobieray7. Bell v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Case No. 2: 12-042-DCR -Kevin Hart8. Ayling v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Case No. 2: 12-043-DCR -Kevin Hart9. Robles v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Case No. 2: 12-045-DCR -Kevin Hart10. Wilson v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Case No. 2: 12-047-DCR - Kevin Hart11. Sinkler v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Case No. 2: 12-049-DCR - Kevin Hart. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 04/09/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(MRS)cc: COR
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT XANODYN0E PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.'S SECOND MOTION TO DISMISS: 1. To the extent that the plaintiffs' consolidated response or any individual response to Xanodyne's motion to dismiss is construed as a motion to continue, a motion to hold the Court's ruling in abeyance or a motion for leave to amend an original complaint to include claims that have been dismissed previously by the Court, those requests and/or motions are DENIED. This ruling includes, but is not limited to, the motion for continuance contained in Plaintiff Mary Salards (Civil Action No. 2: 11-376-DCR) response to Xanodyne's motion to dismiss [MDL Record No. 1556]. 2. Subject to the exceptions outlined below, the motion to dismiss filed by Defendant Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals on March 9, 2012 [MDL Record No. 1460, et al] is GRANTED. Other than Civil Action No. 2: 11-354-DCR, the claims asserted by the plaintiffs against Defendant Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. in the above- captioned cases are DISMISSED, without prejudice, with the exception of: (i) the claims asserted by Plaintiffs Jeanette Clarke, Dennis Self, and Wayne Smith in the action styled Aaron, et al., v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-354-DCR; (ii) the claims asserted by Plaintiffs Michelle Harris, Anthony Hoofkin, Margaret Daniels, Jeremiah Brumfield, and Hosly Hubbard, III in the action styled Aga, et al., v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-356-DCR; (iii) the individual claims of Plaintiff Dennis Self and the consortium claim of Plaintiff Andrea Self in the action styled Aaron, et al., v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-354-DCR; (iv) the claims asserted by Plaintiff Beverly Provis in the action styled Ballard, et al., v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-365-DCR; (v) the claims asserted by Plaintiff George Boyd in the action styled Boyd, et al., v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-381-DCR; (vi) the claims asserted by Plaintiffs Thomas Goforth and Daniel Roberts in the action styled Atwell, et al., v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-384-DCR; and (vii) the claims asserted by Plaintiffs Mark Lopez and Mary Lopez in the action styled Lopez v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 12-046-DCR. Xanodynes motion does not pertain to these identified plaintiffs and claims, as outlined in its motion [MDL Record No. 1460] and motion to withdraw [Record No. 1532]. 3. With respect to the claims asserted by the plaintiffs in Civil Action No. 2:11-354 against Defendant Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., those claims are DISMISSED, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 4/5/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: MODIFIED and AMENDED (by MDL Order 1773, DE 67 in 2:11-cv-354) to reflect that the claims asserted by the following plaintiffs are not subject to Defendant Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.'s motion to dismiss and are not dismissed at this time: (i) Jeanette Clarke, (ii) Wayne Smith, (iii) the individual claims asserted by Dennis Self (iv) the loss of consortium claims asserted by Andrea Self. With the exceptions the Court has identified, the remaining claims asserted in this civil action against Defendant Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., are DISMISSED, with prejudice. COR Modified on 5/2/2012 (CBD).
April 3, 2012 Clerk's Note re (1560 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 62 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 61 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR) Response in Opposition to Motion: Clerk confirmed with counsel that MDL 1560 is a duplicate filing of MDL 1559. Clerk has marked 1560 as a duplicate. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2:11-cv-00356-DCR(CBD)
April 2, 2012 Clerk's Note re (59 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 1553 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Response: Counsel's office called to advise filer Valerie Vercher was inadvertantly omitted as a filer to this entry, Clerk has added the additional filer.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(CBD)
April 2, 2012 Filing 61 DUPLICATE -RESPONSE in Opposition re (49 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 50 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 1460 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) MOTION to Dismiss by Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Nicolae Aga, Debby Jones. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2:11-cv-00356-DCR(Plymale, Douglas) See MDL 1559 for ORIGINAL entry of this pleading. Modified on 4/3/2012 (CBD).
April 2, 2012 Filing 60 RESPONSE in Opposition re (49 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 50 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 1460 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) MOTION to Dismiss by Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Nicolae Aga, Debby Jones. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2:11-cv-00356-DCR(Plymale, Douglas)
April 2, 2012 Filing 59 PLAINTIFFS' CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss by Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. with Certificate of Service re (55 in 2:11-cv-00177-DCR, 33 in 2:11-cv-00348-DCR, 68 in 2:11-cv-00221-DCR, 26 in 2:11-cv-00382-DCR, 52 in 2:11-cv-00215-DCR, 25 in 2:12-cv-00008-DCR, 50 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 35 in 2:11-cv-00381-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00375-DCR, 21 in 2:12-cv-00001-DCR, 61 in 2:11-cv-00188-DCR, 1460 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 22 in 2:12-cv-00010-DCR, 32 in 2:11-cv-00368-DCR, 16 in 2:12-cv-00043-DCR, 32 in 2:11-cv-00369-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00376-DCR, 31 in 2:11-cv-00353-DCR, 73 in 2:11-cv-00201-DCR, 34 in 2:11-cv-00327-DCR, 17 in 2:12-cv-00042-DCR, 20 in 2:12-cv-00011-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00399-DCR, 16 in 2:12-cv-00041-DCR, 35 in 2:11-cv-00365-DCR, 27 in 2:11-cv-00400-DCR, 34 in 2:11-cv-00377-DCR, 18 in 2:12-cv-00003-DCR, 9 in 2:12-cv-00066-DCR, 6 in 2:12-cv-00065-DCR, 49 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 36 in 2:11-cv-00351-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00198-DCR, 16 in 2:12-cv-00047-DCR, 16 in 2:12-cv-00048-DCR, 16 in 2:12-cv-00007-DCR, 36 in 2:11-cv-00346-DCR, 32 in 2:11-cv-00363-DCR, 19 in 2:12-cv-00009-DCR, 33 in 2:11-cv-00322-DCR, 45 in 2:11-cv-00354-DCR, 6 in 2:12-cv-00064-DCR, 29 in 2:11-cv-00385-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00396-DCR, 56 in 2:11-cv-00180-DCR, 11 in 2:12-cv-00062-DCR, 107 in 2:11-cv-00206-DCR, 16 in 2:12-cv-00040-DCR, 33 in 2:11-cv-00384-DCR) filed by Jim W. Aaron, Jr, Jimmie D. Adams, Teena Adams, Alice Aday, Martin Aday, Nicolae Aga, Lola Ainsworth, Needa Alexander, Russell Alexander, Thomas D. Alexander, Aundra Alfred, Scott Almon, Hester I. Anderson, Mary Ann Anderson, William Anderson, Dorothy Atkinson, Peggy Atwell, Sue Aubert, Vincent Aubert, Bennie Austin, Denise Ayling, Steven Ayling, Sr, Gloria Babineaux, L. Jolene Baker, Everett Ballard, Rita Ballesteros, Tyra Barabino, Margaret Barnes, Linda Barrios, Ronald Barrios, Dorothy Bartley, Michael Becnel, John Bector, Jr, Dennis Bell, Joy Marie Bell, William Bennett, Ellen Bickham, John Bickham, Elester Bingham, Clara Blanton, Andreas Borer, Connie Boudreaux, Denise Boudreaux, Jerry Boudreaux, Kordia Bowman, George Boyd, Patricia Braley, Rebecca Brinson, Lance Broussard, Sr, Aaron Brown, Nettie Brown, Tishie Brown, Faye Brumfield, Jeremiah Brumfield, Jody Buckley, Frances Burch, Albert Burks, Marilyn Burnson, Phillip Burnson, Gladys Butler, Shirley Cain, Clara Calamia, Martha Cannella, Freda Capers, Lorenzo Carreras, Barbara Carter, Elaine Carter, Charles Case, Shirley Case, Charles Celestin, Debra Chaisson, Kent Chapman, Kent Charles, Yolanda Charles, Randy Chavez, Carolyn Christophe, Rebecca Churchman, Vincent Cinquigranno, Jeanette Clarke, Earnestine Clifton, Valerie Coats, Joseph Cochran, Norma S Cochran, Gail Coleman, Kevin Collins, Wayne Collins, Laurabelle Combre, Helen S. Cooper, Virginia Cormier, Kelly Craddock-Boone, Katherine Craig, Loretta Criss, Clara Cross, Donald Crowell, Tara Cryer, Connie Culbreath, Gus E. Culbreath, III, George Curvin, Rita Curvin, Marie Cutrer, Sam Cutrer, Charles Daggs, Jr, Tommie Dahlgreen, Margaret Daniels, James Danos, Tena Danos, Iva Davis, Johnny Davis, Sheila Dawson, Brandon DePascal, Hilda DePascal, Geneva DeVine, James H. DeVine, Jewel K. Dear, Gladys Delaune, Carol Depew, Alice Derry, Tim Dickerson, Freddie Dixson, Marlene Dixson, Angela Dorsey, Herman Douglas, Melissa Doyle, Debra Duhe, Michael Duhe, Peggy Duhe, Jan Duke, Raymond Duke, Hattie Dunaway, Debra Duncan, Lambert Duncan, Sr, Rita Dunn, Linda Dupre, Olin Dyes, Patricia Dyes, William E. Dykes, Jr, Cynthia Dyson, Mary Edwards, James J. Ellis, Jan Ellis, Joycelyn Ernest, Dennis Evans, Joann Evans, Patricia Faircloth, Anthony Faucetta, Sr, Mary K. Fisher, Louann Fisher-Smith, Emma Fitch, Curmer Foreman, Cindy Fowler, Jasper Frabbiele, Joan Frabbiele, Rosie Franks, Elizabeth Frederick, Delores Freeman, Rita Fuller, Linda Gallagher, Kevin Galloway, Sarah Galloway, Truman Galloway, Patrick Garrett, Pamela George, Leah Glass, Thomas Goforth, Martha Golman, Deloris Gray, Gerry Grayer, Patricia Grayer, Virginia Greer, Jacqueline Griffith, Billy Hall, Claudia Hall, Jimmie Hannah, Anna Hardy, Jan Harper, Rodney Harper, William Harper, Joseph Harris, Jr, Michelle Harris, Stacy Harris, Theresa Harvey, Cindy Hawthorne, Forest Hawthorne, Alex Henry, Ethel Henry, Genell Hernandez, William Hernandez, Jr, Von Higgins, Lois High, Gladys Hines, Joseph Holden, Cathey Holland, Joe Holland, James Holloway, Lillie Mae Holloway, Roger Wayne Holloway, Melissa Homer, Wendell Homer, Anthony Hoofkin, Linda Hooks, Jane Hoover, Jesse Hoover, III, Andrew Houlihan, Jr, Amy Houston, Gilbert Howard, Teresa Howard, Holsy Hubbard, III, Kathleen Hubbard, Trina Hubbard, Daniel Hudson, Susan Hudson, Gerald E. Hunter El, Jack Hutchinson, Cloedale Hymel, Joseph Hymel, Jr, Aaron Ingram, Angie Ingram, Pearl Jackson, Cathy James-Collins, James Jenkins, Eugene Johnson, Irene Johnson, Leonard Johnson, Jr, Matthew Johnson, Peggy Johnson, Tracy Johnson, Virgie Joiner, Clifford Jones, Debby Jones, Gail Jones, Robert Jones, Stephanie Jones, Veronica Jones, Teresa Jones-Bell, Marshall Juergens, Allison Juge, Larry Kastner, Rita Kastner, Ray Kendrick, William Kitchens, Ronald K. Knight, Gilbert Knoblock, Billy Lambert, Frances Lane, Catherine LeBoeuf, Patsy L. Lebrun, Maureen Ledet, Belinda Lee, Mark Lee, Sr, Chrisa Leonard, Lester Leonard, Ramona Lindley, Paulette Linville, Bessie Littleton, Judas Littleton, Charles Loftin, Betty Lofton, Cora Louque, Ridgie Louque, Adeline Loyd, Ellis Loyd, Mary E. Loyd, Bruce Luquette, Linda Luquette, Robbie Maas, Sr, Debra Magee, Arthur Major, Louis Malbrough, Marlene Mancuso, Geraldine Marcotte, Wilfred Marcotte, James Marler, Mary Marsh, Nora L. Marston, Walter Martin, Joyce Martinez, Louis Martinez, Jr, Armand Mataya, Sr, Renee Mataya, Courtney Matthews, Allise McAlpine, Olga McClanahan, Roger McClanahan, Rebecca McCrary, Sigrid McDaniel, Brenda McGee, Castadera McGee, Susan McMullen, James McNay, Mary Turnage McPhail, Effie Melancon, Dorothy Mendel, Ramona Miller, Arthur Millet, Donna Mitchell, Thomas Mitchell, William D Mitchell, Sherry Mobley, Eva Moffett, Mary Morales, Russell Morales, Paul Morefield, Rose E. Morefield, Edith Morehead, Steve Morehead, Rafael Moreno, Michael Mosley, Maxine Moten, Olga Murray, Cynthia Myles, Rebecca Nevels, Melvin Nolan, Jr, Eddie Odom, Peggy Oniate, Rose Orfanello, Bonnie Orgeron, David Orgeron, Melvina Otillio, Martha Overbay, Vivian Albert Overbay, Joanne Paige, Bernard Parker, Carnus Parker, Jr, Julian Parker, Rhonda Parker, Angela Parson, Bernadette Patin, Charlotte Patterson, Phillip Patterson, Raymond Payne, Morsie Pearson-Wright, Audrey Percy, Willis Percy, Christine Perkins, Mytrice Perry, Cynthia Petrie, Donald Petrie, Narvin Petty, Jr, Wanda Picket, Bobbie Sue Pierce, Ann Piquiet, Anthony Pitts, Linda Powell, Larry Prestenbach, Jacqueline Price, Louis Price, Sr, Mary Price, Beverly Provis, Charles Quey, Linda Quey, Stephen Quick, Louis Ray, Octavia Raymond, Kacie Reynolds, Patsy Richard, Donna Robert, Eldred B. Robert, Sr, Keith Robert, Daniel Roberts, Young A. Roberts, Jr, Clarence Robertson, Billy Rodrigue, Marlene Rodrigue, William Romair, Kathryn Roussell, Lena Ruby, Doris Salamone, Vincent Salamone, Mary Salard, Dianne Salvant, Mary Sapia, Michael Sapia, Shirley Sasani, Janette Savoie, Jill Sawyer, April Schexnaydre, Robert Schexnaydre, Jr, Margaret Segraves, Andrea H. Self, Dennis Self, Carolyn Serpas, Jack Norman Serpas, William Shows, Randolph Simmons, Mary Skinner, Linda Sloan, Christopher R. Smith, Gertha Smith, Glen Smith, Sharon S. Smith, Shirley Smith, Wayne Smith, Alice Spencer, Kenneth Spikes, Patricia Spillers, John Spires, Sr, Nancy Jean Spires, Barbara Stelly, Joseph Stelly, Lisa Stevens, Calvin Stewart, Jr, Kim Stewart, Sheila Stewart, Wayne Stringfellow, James Swanner, Rosemary Swanner, Charlotte Swible, John Swible, Jr, Patricia Talbert, Linda Tannerhill, William R. Tannerhill, Lois Tate, Alice Taylor, Stephanie Taylor-Foy, Bertell Thomas, Dianne Thomas, Roberta Tiner, Dennis Tisdale, Linda Tisdale, Helena Tureaud, David C. Turner, Judy Earnestine Turner, Lenora Upshaw, Daisy Valle, Barbara Vance, Marin Vaughn, Marshall Vaughn, George Vercher, Michell Vogel, Coy G. Waldrop, Inez Walker, Larry Walker, Evelyn Warlick, Gennie Warren, Veronica Washington, Michael Webb, John Wheeler, Timmy Whiddon, Fearron White, Lynne Wilhelm, Catherine Williams, Edith Williams, Larry Williams, Lonnika S. Williams, Louis Williams, Samantha Williams, Walter Williams, Terry Williamson, Constance Wilson, John Wilson, Sylvia Wilson, Tracey Wilson, Dorothy Mae Windham, Christina Woodridge, Norman Woodridge, Janet Woods, Mary Woodward, Robert Woodward, Fred Young, Judy Young, Carol Zamjahn, Kevin Zamjahn, Bruce Zeringue, Peggy Zeringue, Chris Puckett, Valerie Vercher. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Nast, Dianne) Modified text to match caption and w/ adtl filer on 4/3/2012 (CBD).
March 30, 2012 Filing 58 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andreas Borer, Lance Broussard, Sr, Kent Charles, Charles Daggs, Jr, Debby Jones, Gail Jones, Robert Jones, Stephanie Jones, Allison Juge, Larry Kastner, Rita Kastner, Ray Kendrick, Catherine LeBoeuf, Belinda Lee, Mark Lee, Sr, Ramona Lindley, Bessie Littleton, Judas Littleton, Charles Loftin, Betty Lofton, Cora Louque, Ridgie Louque, Bruce Luquette, Linda Luquette, Robbie Maas, Sr, Arthur Major, Louis Malbrough, Marlene Mancuso, Geraldine Marcotte, Wilfred Marcotte, Joyce Martinez, Louis Martinez, Jr, Armand Mataya, Sr, Renee Mataya, Courtney Matthews, Brenda McGee, Castadera McGee, Susan McMullen, Dorothy Mendel, Arthur Millet, Donna Mitchell, Thomas Mitchell, William D. Mitchell, Eva Moffett, Mary Morales, Russell Morales, Rafael Moreno, Michael Mosley, Rose Orfanello, Bonnie Orgeron, David Orgeron, Melvina Otillio, Martha Overbay, Vivian Albert Overbay, Joanne Paige, Julian Parker, Rhonda Parker, Bernadette Patin, Audrey Percy, Willis Percy, Mytrice Perry, Cynthia Petrie, Donald Petrie, Bobbie Sue Pierce, Larry Prestenbach, Louis Price, Sr, Mary Price, Charles Quey, Linda Quey, Stephen Quick, Octavia Raymond, Billy Rodrigue, Marlene Rodrigue, William Romair, Kathryn Roussell, Doris Salamone, Vincent Salamone, Dianne Salvant, Mary Sapia, Michael Sapia, Janette Savoie, Jill Sawyer, April Schexnaydre, Robert Schexnaydre, Jr, Carolyn Serpas, Jack Norman Serpas, Randolph Simmons, Barbara Stelly, Joseph Stelly, Lisa Stevens, Calvin Stewart, Jr, Kim Stewart, Sheila Stewart, James Swanner, Rosemary Swanner, Charlotte Swible, John Swible, Jr, Patricia Talbert, Lois Tate, Alice Taylor, Dennis Tisdale, Linda Tisdale, Daisy Valle, Marin Vaughn, Marshall Vaughn, George Vercher, Valerie Vercher, Michell Vogel, Veronica Washington, Lynne Wilhelm, Edith Williams, Samantha Williams, Terry Williamson, Christina Woodridge, Norman Woodridge, Mary Woodward, Robert Woodward, Fred Young, Judy Young, Carol Zamjahn, Kevin Zamjahn, Bruce Zeringue, Peggy Zeringue. Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 2/29/2012, answer due 4/30/2012. (Plymale, Douglas)
March 26, 2012 Filing 57 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Covidien PLC. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Pratt, Bryan)
March 26, 2012 Filing 56 NOTICE OF FILING by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly & Company, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Inc., Eli Lilly & Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Corrected Certificate of Service (Date))Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Larimore, Mary)
March 26, 2012 Filing 55 ELI LILLY AND COMPANY'S SECOND MASTER MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly & Company, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Inc., Eli Lilly & Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Larimore, Mary) Modified text to match caption on 3/26/2012 (CBD). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/26/2012: #3 CORRECTED Certificate of Service) (CBD). Redefined relief on 3/28/2012 (CBD).
March 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT ANDSCHEDULING ORDER NO. 4 - ORDER REGARDING EXTENSIONS FOR RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS: 1. The deadline for the defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Complaints or Amended Complaints shall be extended to and include thirty (30) days after the next scheduled status conference currently set for April 23, 2012. The new responsive pleading deadline shall be up to and including May 23, 2012. In the event the next scheduled status conference is continue or rescheduled, the deadline for responsive pleadings shall likewise be continued or rescheduled to be up to and including thirty (30) days after the status conference. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/26/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and among the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee ("PSC"), on behalf of all plaintiffs and their counsel, and Defendants' Steering Committee ("DSC"), on behalf of all defendants and their counsel, and approved by the Court, that the following provisions shall govern the use and dissemination of all information, documents or materials produced in discovery by any Party in cases pending before this Court in In re Darvocet, Darvon and Propoxyphene Products Liability Litigation, Eastern District of Kentucky, MDL No. 2226, to every action that is or will in the future become a part thereof, and any other actions upon which the Producing parties may agree in writing, (collectively, "the Litigation") as follows: (See Order for Provisions I-XII). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/20/2012. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration Form)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 3/19/2012, before Judge Danny C. Reeves: 1) Defendants having no objection, plaintiffs' proposal for a Direct Filing Order is withdrawn. 2) Two (2) weeks prior to the next scheduled status conference, plaintiffs shall submit a revised discovery plan for the Court's review. 3) Two (2) weeks prior to the next scheduled status conference, defendants' counsel shall submit to the Court a list of outstandingdiscovery issues. 4) Two (2) weeks prior to the next scheduled status conference, defendants' counsel shall submit to the Court a proposed Show Cause Order regarding global application of the Court's previous rulings on certain motions to dismiss. 5) The Court shall address the subject of the Protective Order by subsequent order. 6) Plaintiffs having no objection to a 30-day extension of defendants' time to respond in those cases in which responsive pleadings are due prior to the next scheduled status conference, defendants' counsel shall submit proposed Orders identifying such cases no later than Friday, March 23, 2012.7) Subject to intervening orders, the next status conference shall be held on April 23, 2012, at 1:30 p.m., at the US Courthouse in Covington, Ky. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/19/2012.(Court Reporter Cindy Oakes.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. (CBD)cc: COR, Cov Diary
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER: the Status Conference previously scheduled for Monday, March 19, 2012, at Covington, Kentucky is SET ASIDE. Instead, the case shall be scheduled before the undersigned for a TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE on Monday, March 19, 2012, beginning at the hour of 1:30 p.m. (See Order for Access Details) The Clerk is directed to provide a court reporter to record the proceeding. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/13/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, diary
March 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: each of the attorneys (Curtis Nelson Bruehl, Christopher Patrick Norton, Richard Gordon Salkow, Elise Richelle Sanguinetti) listed above is given ten (10) days from the entry of this Order either to submit his or her Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form, or SHOW CAUSE why he or she should not be subject to daily, monetary penalties until such time as appropriate registration has been accomplished. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/12/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
March 9, 2012 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss (Oral Argument Requested) by Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2 - Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit 3 - Appendix A - List of Plaintiffs & Claims, #4 Exhibit 4 - List of Plaintiffs in Multi-Plaintiff Cases)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Thomas, Joseph) Modified text (clean-up & Oral Arg. Req. added) on 3/9/2012 (CBD).
March 9, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Thomas, Joseph)
March 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting (1406) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-md-02226-DCR; granting (144) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00175-DCR; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00177-DCR; granting (97) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00179-DCR; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00180-DCR; granting (142) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00182-DCR; granting (87) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00183-DCR; granting (162) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00186-DCR; granting (58) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00188-DCR; granting (150) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00189-DCR; granting (161) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00190-DCR; granting (172) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00191-DCR; granting (163) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00195-DCR; granting (176) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00197-DCR; granting (70) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00201-DCR; granting (105) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00206-DCR; granting (118) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00208-DCR; granting (106) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00210-DCR; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00213-DCR; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00215-DCR; granting (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00221-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00238-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00239-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00240-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00241-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00242-DCR; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00243-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00244-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00246-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00247-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00248-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00249-DCR; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00250-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00251-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00252-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00253-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00254-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00255-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00256-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00257-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00258-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00260-DCR; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00261-DCR; granting (44) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00262-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00263-DCR; granting (43) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00264-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00265-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00266-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00267-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00268-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00269-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00270-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00272-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00273-DCR; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00274-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00275-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00276-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00277-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00278-DCR; granting (48) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00279-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00280-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00281-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00282-DCR; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00283-DCR; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00284-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00286-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00288-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00289-DCR; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00290-DCR; granting (119) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00295-DCR; granting (157) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00296-DCR; granting (167) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00297-DCR; granting (154) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00298-DCR; granting (151) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00299-DCR; granting (160) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00300-DCR; granting (149) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00301-DCR; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00302-DCR; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00303-DCR; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00305-DCR; granting (41) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00306-DCR; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00310-DCR; granting (61) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00325-DCR; granting (31) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00327-DCR; granting (69) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00329-DCR; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00330-DCR; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00332-DCR; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00333-DCR; granting (32) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00335-DCR; granting (26) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00337-DCR; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00339-DCR; granting (34) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00347-DCR; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00346-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00349-DCR; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00348-DCR; granting (55) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00350-DCR; granting (33) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00351-DCR; granting (68) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00352-DCR; granting (28) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00353-DCR; granting (42) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00354-DCR; granting (47) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00356-DCR; granting (53) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00359-DCR; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00360-DCR; granting (29) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00363-DCR; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00364-DCR; granting (32) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00365-DCR; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00367-DCR; granting (52) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00370-DCR; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00371-DCR; granting (56) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00372-DCR; granting (49) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00373-DCR; granting (40) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00355-DCR; granting (38) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00375-DCR; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00376-DCR; granting (46) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00378-DCR; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00379-DCR; granting (50) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00380-DCR; granting (32) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00381-DCR; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00384-DCR; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00394-DCR; granting (24) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:11-cv-00400-DCR; granting (21) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:12-cv-00006-DCR. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 3/7/2012. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
March 7, 2012 Filing 46 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Eli Lilly and Company Jeff W. Adamson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Stopher, Edward)
March 6, 2012 NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT CONVERSION REQUIREMENT TO C. Trischler re (1326, 1329, 1333, 1336, 1339, 1350, 1355, 1359, 1364 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) ; Error: the pleading was scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY if you cannot electronically prepare your documents with a word processing software package and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
March 6, 2012 NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT CONVERSION REQUIREMENT TO S. McMillan re (1303 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 11 in 2:12-cv-00042-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (11 in 2:12-cv-00043-DCR, 1311 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (1317 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 21 in 2:12-cv-00026-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (1315 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 31 in 2:11-cv-00365-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (1300 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 11 in 2:12-cv-00049-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (11 in 2:12-cv-00048-DCR, 1307 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (34 in 2:11-cv-00376-DCR, 1314 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (11 in 2:12-cv-00047-DCR, 1308 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (1301 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 12 in 2:12-cv-00049-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (11 in 2:12-cv-00041-DCR, 1323 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (1310 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 11 in 2:12-cv-00046-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (1306 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00375-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (1298 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (1302 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 11 in 2:12-cv-00040-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case, (11 in 2:12-cv-00045-DCR, 1312 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint - MDL Case ; Error: the pleading was scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY if you cannot electronically prepare your documents with a word processing software package and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(MRS)
March 6, 2012 Filing 45 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Trischler, Clem)
March 6, 2012 Filing 44 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Trischler, Clem)
March 6, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Trischler, Clem)
March 5, 2012 Clerk's Note re (1162 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint, (1168 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint, (1166 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint, (1161 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Amended Complaint, (1170 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Complaint, (1164 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Answer to Amended Complaint: Counsel called this date indicating incorrect event was used to docket these Answers and realized the Answers in these action were not spread to the member cases. Clerk advised the answers would be filed in the in the correct member cases by the clerk and no further action from counsel was required. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
March 5, 2012 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Covidien, Inc., Mallinckrodt, Inc.. Filed per QC re MDL 1168 (CBD)
March 5, 2012 Filing 41 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(McMillan, Summer)
March 5, 2012 Filing 40 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(McMillan, Summer)
March 5, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(McMillan, Summer)
March 5, 2012 Filing 38 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Cohen, Lori)
March 5, 2012 Filing 37 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC, Generics Bidco II, LLC, Generics International (US PARENT), Inc., Generics International (US), Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Cheffo, Mark)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/27/2012, before Judge Danny C. Reeves: 1) next Status Conference shall be held 3/19/2012 @ 1:30 PM, US Courthouse in Covington, KY 2) Parties shall continue to negotiate terms of a Direct Filing Order and Discovery Plan which will be discussed at the status conference. However, on or before 3/12/2012, parties shall tender drafts for Court's review 3) All pending motiosn are taken under submission 4) The proposed Protective and Confidentiality Order previously tendered by the parties is taken under advisement 5) parties shall be prepared to discuss the status of product identification discovery during the March 19, 2012, status conference. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves. (Court Reporter Joan Averdick.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. (CBD)cc: COR, Cov Diary
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, the parties are advised of the following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the hearing currently scheduled for February 27, 2012. (See Order for Items I-V) In the event counsel have not discussed the items outlined above, they are directed to confer in advance of the upcoming hearing in a good faith effort to reach agreement to the extent that such is feasible. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 2/21/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
February 8, 2012 Attorney Update. Charles Stopher & Jeff Adamson added to Eli Lilly. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
February 8, 2012 Attorney Update. Edward H. Stopher Added for Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly & Company. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
February 8, 2012 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE of co-counsel Edward H. Stopher, Charles H. Stopher and Jeff W. Adamson by Eli Lilly and Company. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Stopher, Edward)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: that the above-listed attorneys (Michael Emmett McMahon, James Neal Rodgers) are directed to appear at a hearing that shall be held on February 27, 2012, beginning at the hour of 1:30 p.m. The attorneys should be prepared to address the issue of daily sanctions for their failure to comply with the Court's January 5, 2012, Order. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/31/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: (1) The Court's Orders of January 5, 2012 [MDL Record No. 818], and January 19, 2012 [MDL Record No. 936], are SET ASIDE with regard to attorney Reed Gillmor Bowman. (2) The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Bowman as counsel of record in the action styled: Jones v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-349-DCR; and Aga v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-356-DCR. The parties may also remove this attorney from the service list. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/26/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2:11-cv-00356-DCR(CBD)cc: COR, copy to R. Bowman via email
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: the Motions to Withdraw Counsel [Record Nos. 955, 956 in 2:11-md-2226; 30 in 2:11-cv-349; 30 in 2:11-cv-356] are DENIED. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/25/2012. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2:11-cv-00356-DCR(CBD)cc: COR
January 24, 2012 NOTICE RE: DOCUMENT CONVERSION REQUIREMENT TO Frank D'Amico re MOTIONS to Withdraw as Attorney (955 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 30 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR) & (956 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 30 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR) ; Error: the pleadings were scanned instead of converted into PDF format directly from the native word application. Use a scanner ONLY if you cannot electronically prepare your documents with a word processing software package and convert them to PDF format. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2:11-cv-00356-DCR(CBD)
January 24, 2012 Filing 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Gail Jones Withdrawal of Reed G. Bowman (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(D'Amico, Frank)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE: On January 19, 2012, the Court fined three attorneys $100 each for failing to adequately respond to a show cause order concerning CM/ECF registration. Each attorney was also given seven (7) days to come into compliance or be subject to additional monetary penalties. [Record No. 936] On this date, a Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel was filed in the above-referenced actions regarding one of the attorneys, Reed Bowman. [Record Nos. 948, 949] Through this notice, the plaintiffs give notice that Mr. Bowman is withdrawing from the action as counsel of record. To avoid any misunderstandings and further sanctions, the parties and their attorneys are NOTIFIED that the filing of a Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel does not excuse compliance with the Court's Order dated January 19, 2012. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/23/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2:11-cv-00356-DCR(CBD)cc: COR
January 23, 2012 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Reeves for review: Notices of Withdrawel of Counsel of Reed Bowman, Esq. (28 in 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 948 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) & (28 in 2:11-cv-00356-DCR, 949 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR, 2:11-cv-00356-DCR(CBD)
January 23, 2012 Filing 28 NOTICE by Frank J. D'Amico, Jr. APLC, Jr Withdrawel of Counsel of Reed Bowman, Esq. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(D'Amico, Frank)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: each of the above-listed attorneys (Michael Emmett McMahon, Reed Gillmor Bowman, James Neal Rodgers) is fined in the amount of $100. Additionally, each is given 7 days from the entry of this Order to come into compliance with the Court's Order of January 5, 2012, before they will be subject to additional monetary penalties. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/19/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR (w/ MDL ECF Registration Form to non-registered attorneys)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: each of the attorneys listed above (Lauren Fajoni Bartlett, Skye E. Eiswirth, Peter Joseph Rotolo III, Brent A. Talbot) is given 10 days from the entry of this Order to either submit his or her Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form, or SHOW CAUSE why he or she should not be subject to daily, monetary penalties until such time as appropriate registration has been accomplished. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/19/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR (w/ MDL ECF Registration form to attys listed in Order)
January 17, 2012 Filing 25 ANSWER to COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Metzger, Kimberly)
January 17, 2012 Filing 24 CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Metzger, Kimberly)
January 17, 2012 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Metzger, Kimberly)
January 17, 2012 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Ferguson-Allen, Audra)
January 17, 2012 Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 2:11-cv-00349-DCR(Larimore, Mary)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OUTLINING TERMS OF THE COMMON BENEFIT FUND ESTABLISHED BY THE DECEMBER 28, 2011 COURT ORDER: 1. Court appoints Andrew J. VonLehman, VonLehman & Company, as Administrator of the Common Benefit Fund (the "Administrator") and directs him to establish an insured, interest-bearing account to receive and disburse funds as provided in this Order, and in accordance with the Court's previous Order establishing a common benefit fund. [Record No. 794] It shall be the obligation of Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel to notify Mr. VonLehman of his appointment as Administrator, as well as the responsibilities of the Administrator, as outlined in this and in subsequent orders. ( See Order for Items 2-27). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/12/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR VACATED by Order [MDL 2885]: In the event the Courts prior Orders of Dismissal and Orders of Judgment on the Pleadings are remanded by the Sixth Circuit, the parties may move for reinstatement of these Orders. Modified on 11/6/2013 (CBD).
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: (1) The Court's Orders of December 20, 2011 [MDL Record No. 687], and January 5, 2012 [MDL Record No. 817], are SET ASIDE with regard to attorney Alan S. Lazar. (2) The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Lazar as counsel of record in the action styled: Gilbert v. Eli Lilly and Company, et al., Civil Action No. 2: 11-184-DCR. The parties may also remove his name from the service list. (3) The Court's Order entered October 4, 2011 [MDL Record No. 200], is hereby AMENDED to reflect that Lazar is REMOVED, and is no longer a member of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee.. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/10/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: each of the attorneys listed above (Philip Bohrer, Reed Gilmore Bowman, Scott E. Brady, Russell S. Briggs, Jeffrey D. Guerriero, James J. McHugh, Jr., Michael Emmett McMahon, James Neal Rodgers) is given ten (10) days from the entry of this Order to either submit his or her Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form, or SHOW CAUSE why he or she should not be subject to daily, monetary penalties until such time as appropriate registration has been accomplished. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/5/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
January 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: each of the attorneys listed above (Charles David Ewing, P. Edward Pratt, Alan S. Lazar) is fined in the amount of $100. Additionally, they are each given seven (7) days from the entry of this Order to come into compliance with the Court's order of December 20, 2011 before they will be subject to additional monetary penalties. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 1/5/2012.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, STB, Finance
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE: APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' LIAISON COUNSEL: (1) Terms of Appointment (2) Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel The Court appoints the following attorney as Plaintiffs' Liaison Counsel: Harry Rankin. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/28/2011.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR, Clerk JPMDL Modified cc on 12/28/2011 (CBD). VACATED by [MDL 2885]:The portions of those Orders with respect to Plaintiffs leadership structure are hereby VACATED. Effective immediately, Plaintiffs appointed counsel are relieved of the leadership responsibilities and obligations described in those Orders. Except as stated in Part 6 below, all other portions of those Orders remain in effect. Modified text only on 11/6/2013 (CBD).
December 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ESTABLISHING A COMMON BENEFIT FUND TO COMPENSATE AND REIMBURSE ATTORNEYS FOR SERVICES PERFORMED AND EXPENSES INCURRED FOR MDL ADMINISTRATION AND COMMON BENEFIT: 1. The plaintiffs' motion [Record No. 410 in 2:11-md-2226, et al] is GRANTED, subject to the limitations outlined in this Order and in subsequent orders. (See Order for Items 2-8). Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/28/2011. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR VACATED by [MDL 2885]: In the event the Court's prior Orders of Dismissal and Orders of Judgment on the Pleadings are remanded by the Sixth Circuit, the parties may move for reinstatement of these Orders. Modified on 11/6/2013 (CBD).
December 27, 2011 Clerk's Note re [MDL 782, et al] & [MDL 784, et al]: Upon clarification being made of record and at direction of chambers the docket sheet in the Master Case 2:11-md-2226 has been modified to reflect one party defendant Eli Lilly and Company with all the various spellings for this defendant from the related member cases added as alias parties to this defendant.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
December 27, 2011 Clerk's Note: re (410 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, et al) MOTION to Establish a Common Benefit Fund: Clerk incorrectly applied a reply deadline of 2/10/2011 from Case Management Order No. 3, this deadline has been terminated. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 3: 1. Deadline for plaintiffs to file responses in opposition to any motions to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings that are currently due before January 17, 2012, shall be extended to and including January 17, 2012. 2. The deadline for defendants to file replies in support of any motions to dismiss or motions for judgment on the pleadings that are currently due before February 10, 2012, shall be extended to and including February 10, 2012. 3. With respect to motions to dismiss filed by Defendant Eli Lilly and Company ("Lilly") and/or Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ("Xanodyne") after December 20, 2011, Lilly and Xanodyne have agreed that the plaintiffs time to respond will be extended to 30 days after the Court first rules on any of the respective defendants' motions to dismiss, and the defendants' reply time will be calculated pursuant to the local rules (e.g., 14 days). 4. The following named defendants agree to accept and return a waiver of service of summons in accordance with the procedures outlined in Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, provided that such service is accomplished within the time limit set forth in Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. To expedite this process, defendants hereby identify the following individuals on their behalf who are designated to receive the Rule 4(d) request for waiver via certified mail: 5. The deadline for Generic Defendants to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Complaints that would otherwise be due for response on or after December 20, 2011, shall be extended to and including thirty days after the Court enters an Order ruling on the Generic Defendants' Motions to Dismiss [MDL Record No. 383]. The Generic Defendants include: (See Order). 6. The deadline for Defendant Lilly to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Complaints that would otherwise be due for response on or after December 20, 2011, shall be extended to and including thirty days after the Court enters a ruling on Lilly's Master Motion to Dismiss [MDL Record No. 416]. 7. The deadline for Defendant Xanodyne to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Complaints that would otherwise be due for response on or after December 20, 2011, shall be extended to and including thirty days after the Court enters a ruling on Xanodyne's Motions to Dismiss [MDL Record Nos. 444 and 666]. 8. In all actions in which Co-Lead Counsel, a member of the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee, or a member of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee is listed as counsel of record, and which have been filed in or tagged for transfer to the MDL on or before February 27, 2012, voluntary dismissals without prejudice may be accomplished only by: (i) stipulation of the national counsel for the defendants (listed in the parties' stipulation) and/or defendant(s) that the plaintiff(s) seek to dismiss; or (ii) by Court Order on terms that the Court considers appropriate under Rule 41(a)(2) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. 9. The terms of paragraph 8 of this Case Management and Scheduling Order No.3 do not apply to cases in which the Court has listed Co-Lead Counsel as counsel of record for administrative purposes, and in which Co-Lead Counsel have not actually been retained as counsel. The terms "Co-Lead Counsel," "Plaintiffs' Executive Committee," and "Plaintiffs' Steering Committee" have the same meaning as defined in the Court's leadership structure order dated October 4, 2011. 10. No defendant shall be deemed to have waived the defense of lack of personal jurisdiction by entering into the Stipulation leading to entry of this Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 3. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/22/2011.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR Modified text (typo) on 12/22/2011 (CBD).
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SHOW CAUSE ORDER: each of the attorneys listed above (See Order) is given ten (10) days from the entry of this Order to either submit his or her Electronic Filing Attorney Registration Form, or SHOW CAUSE why he or she should not be subject to daily, monetary penalties until such time as appropriate registration has been accomplished. Further, beginning January 3, 2012, the Clerk is directed to notify the Court, at the beginning of each week, of each attorney whose registration form is past-due. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/20/2011.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE held on 12/19/2011, before Judge Danny C. Reeves: 1) Subject to intervening orders, the next status conference is rescheduled for Monday, February 27, 2012 at 1:30 p.m. 2) Plaintiffs shall submit to the Court no later than January 10, 2012, the names of three individuals to monitor/audit the common benefit fund that is the subject of the plaintiffs' pending motion. 3) All attorneys identified on the service list shall complete ECF Attorney Registration no later than December 31, 2011. 4) In advance of the next Status Conference, the plaintiffs shall submit to counsel for the defendants a proposed outline of discovery. This outline shall be submitted to the defendants' counsel for consideration no later than February 13, 2012. However, the parties are reminded that, except as allowed by prior orders, the parties shall not proceed with discovery until approved by the Court. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/19/2011. (Court Reporter Joan Averdick.) Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al. Signed by Danny C. Reeves. (CBD)cc: COR
December 19, 2011 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Martin Crump re Response in Opposition to Motion (647 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, et al ). Error: attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit." Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk renamed attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct) cc: COR Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)
December 19, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING by In Re: Darvocet, Darvon and Propoxyphene Products Liability Litigation re (647 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR) Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, to properly reflect exhibits listed in Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant Eli Lilly's Motion for Discovery Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Manufacturing Agreement Executed by Eli Lilly and Neosan)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Crump, Martin)
December 19, 2011 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re (83 in 2:11-cv-00195-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00195-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00298-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00298-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00179-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00179-DCR, 62 in 2:11-cv-00187-DCR, 62 in 2:11-cv-00187-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00299-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00299-DCR, 93 in 2:11-cv-00191-DCR, 93 in 2:11-cv-00191-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00210-DCR, 55 in 2:11-cv-00210-DCR, 91 in 2:11-cv-00175-DCR, 91 in 2:11-cv-00175-DCR, 99 in 2:11-cv-00185-DCR, 99 in 2:11-cv-00185-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00186-DCR, 83 in 2:11-cv-00186-DCR, 92 in 2:11-cv-00189-DCR, 92 in 2:11-cv-00189-DCR, 65 in 2:11-cv-00208-DCR, 65 in 2:11-cv-00208-DCR, 50 in 2:11-cv-00300-DCR, 50 in 2:11-cv-00300-DCR, 53 in 2:11-cv-00297-DCR, 53 in 2:11-cv-00297-DCR, 52 in 2:11-cv-00296-DCR, 52 in 2:11-cv-00296-DCR, 99 in 2:11-cv-00197-DCR, 99 in 2:11-cv-00197-DCR, 82 in 2:11-cv-00182-DCR, 82 in 2:11-cv-00182-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00301-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00301-DCR, 84 in 2:11-cv-00190-DCR, 84 in 2:11-cv-00190-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00295-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00295-DCR, 422 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 422 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00213-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00213-DCR) MOTION for Discovery by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Inc. MOTION for Protective Order by Eli Lilly and Company, Eli Lilly and Company, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee filed by In Re: Darvocet, Darvon and Propoxyphene Products Liability Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Crump, Martin)
December 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 HEARING AGENDA: In accordance with Case Management and Scheduling Order No. 1, the parties are notified of the following items to be discussed and/or addressed during the Status Conference currently scheduled for December 19, 2011. (See Order for Items I-XI.) In the event counsel have not discussed the items outlined above, they are directed toconfer in advance of the upcoming Scheduling Conference in a good faith effort to reach agreement to the extent that such is feasible. Signed by Judge Danny C. Reeves on 12/16/2011.Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(CBD)cc: COR
December 12, 2011 Filing 8 DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ESTABLISH A COMMON BENEFIT FUND re (18 in 2:11-cv-00282-DCR, 31 in 2:11-cv-00220-DCR, 17 in 2:11-cv-00261-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00257-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00278-DCR, 15 in 2:11-cv-00243-DCR, 85 in 2:11-cv-00189-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00247-DCR, 31 in 2:11-cv-00202-DCR, 52 in 2:11-cv-00200-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00255-DCR, 47 in 2:11-cv-00183-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00270-DCR, 17 in 2:11-cv-00251-DCR, 17 in 2:11-cv-00250-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00312-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00242-DCR, 13 in 2:11-cv-00306-DCR, 82 in 2:11-cv-00197-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00288-DCR, 24 in 2:11-cv-00198-DCR, 69 in 2:11-cv-00186-DCR, 87 in 2:11-cv-00175-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00311-DCR, 51 in 2:11-cv-00179-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00178-DCR, 11 in 2:11-cv-00321-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00249-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00267-DCR, 410 in 2:11-md-02226-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00176-DCR, 36 in 2:11-cv-00300-DCR, 15 in 2:11-cv-00304-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00286-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00279-DCR, 61 in 2:11-cv-00213-DCR, 31 in 2:11-cv-00188-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00276-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00266-DCR, 80 in 2:11-cv-00190-DCR, 32 in 2:11-cv-00221-DCR, 58 in 2:11-cv-00187-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00199-DCR, 13 in 2:11-cv-00302-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00284-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00260-DCR, 10 in 2:11-cv-00325-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00283-DCR, 34 in 2:11-cv-00212-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00289-DCR, 34 in 2:11-cv-00299-DCR, 37 in 2:11-cv-00216-DCR, 7 in 2:11-cv-00324-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00241-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00268-DCR, 50 in 2:11-cv-00210-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00258-DCR, 40 in 2:11-cv-00209-DCR, 78 in 2:11-cv-00182-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00248-DCR, 17 in 2:11-cv-00238-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00254-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00256-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00240-DCR, 76 in 2:11-cv-00195-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00281-DCR, 15 in 2:11-cv-00264-DCR, 17 in 2:11-cv-00274-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00239-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00273-DCR, 79 in 2:11-cv-00191-DCR, 56 in 2:11-cv-00208-DCR, 45 in 2:11-cv-00196-DCR, 38 in 2:11-cv-00296-DCR, 14 in 2:11-cv-00310-DCR, 11 in 2:11-cv-00322-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00244-DCR, 35 in 2:11-cv-00184-DCR, 27 in 2:11-cv-00215-DCR, 13 in 2:11-cv-00303-DCR, 43 in 2:11-cv-00201-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00275-DCR, 34 in 2:11-cv-00301-DCR, 15 in 2:11-cv-00262-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00265-DCR, 34 in 2:11-cv-00298-DCR, 32 in 2:11-cv-00180-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00252-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00263-DCR, 69 in 2:11-cv-00206-DCR, 31 in 2:11-cv-00214-DCR, 30 in 2:11-cv-00177-DCR, 48 in 2:11-cv-00204-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00277-DCR, 41 in 2:11-cv-00297-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00272-DCR, 13 in 2:11-cv-00305-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00290-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00246-DCR, 24 in 2:11-cv-00295-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00280-DCR, 20 in 2:11-cv-00253-DCR, 89 in 2:11-cv-00185-DCR, 17 in 2:11-cv-00307-DCR, 18 in 2:11-cv-00269-DCR) filed by AAIPharma Services Corp., Brenn Distribution, Inc., Brenn Manufacturing, Inc., Covidien, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Generics Bidco I, LLC, Generics Bidco II, LLC, Generics International (US PARENT), Inc., Generics International (US), Inc., Mallinckrodt Holdings, LLC, Mallinckrodt, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Propst Distribution, Inc., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Biopharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals (New Jersey), Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Associated Cases: 2:11-md-02226-DCR et al.(Pratt, Bryan) Modified text (description) on 12/13/2011 (CBD).
December 7, 2011 REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/mdl/2226 for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2226. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty (20) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed August 30, 2011 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD)
December 7, 2011 Filing 7 Civil Case Assignment; Case Transferred from Louisiana Eastern (CBD)
December 7, 2011 Conflict Check run. (CBD)
December 7, 2011 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Eastern. Case number 2:11-cv-02869. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc: COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-reg. attys
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order of MDL Transfer to the Eastern District of Kentucky. MDL case number is 2226. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(cab) [Transferred from laed on 12/7/2011.]
December 7, 2011 Filing 4 Notice of Conditional Transfer Order to MDL regarding MDL 2226. (cab) [Transferred from laed on 12/7/2011.]
November 21, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AAI Development Services, Inc., AAIPharma, Inc., AAIPharma, LLC, Brenn Distribution, Inc., Brenn Manufacturing, Inc., Covidien, Inc., Covidien, PLC, Eli Lilly and Company, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Generics Bidco I, LLC, Generics Bidco II, LLC, Generics International US Parent, Inc., Generics International US, Inc., Mallinckrodt, Inc., Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mylan, Inc., Neosan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Propst Distribution, Inc., Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Biopharmaceuticals, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons)(cab) [Transferred from laed on 12/7/2011.]
November 18, 2011 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cl, ) [Transferred from laed on 12/7/2011.]
November 17, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 053L-3282394) filed by Armand Mataya, Sr., Kim Stewart, Judy Young, Billy Rodrigue, Marshall Vaughn, Betty Lofton, Judas Littleton, Russell Morales, Julian Parker, Carolyn Serpas, Geraldine Marcotte, John Swible, Jr., Lance Broussard, Sr., Ridgie Louque, William D Mitchell, Lisa Stevens, Renee Mataya, Brenda McGee, Mark Lee, Sr., Mary Sapia, James Swanner, Michell Vogel, Louis Price, Sr., Louis Martinez, Jr., Norman Woodridge, Audrey Percy, Bessie Littleton, Jill Sawyer, Mytrice Perry, Daisy Valle, William Romair, Randolph Simmons, Vincent Salamone, Cynthia Petrie, Linda Quey, Gail Jones, Charles Loftin, Edith Williams, Robert Schexnaydre, Jr., Andreas Borer, Terry Williamson, Stephen Quick, Bonnie Orgeron, Arthur Major, George Vercher, Bruce Zeringue, Michael Sapia, Robbie Maas, Sr., Charlotte Swible, Rose Orfanello, Ray Kendrick, Lois Tate, Susan McMullen, Fred Young, Mary Morales, Allison Juge, Courtney Matthews, Linda Luquette, Bobbie Sue Pierce, Rita Kastner, Marlene Mancuso, Janette Savoie, Carol Zamjahn, Alice Taylor, Marlene Rodrigue, Kathryn Roussell, Donald Petrie, Lynne Wilhelm, Mary Woodward, Sheila Stewart, Marin Vaughn, Catherine LeBoeuf, Christina Woodridge, Calvin Stewart, Jr., David Orgeron, Veronica Washington, Barbara Stelly, Dianne Salvant, Melvina Otillio, Arthur Millet, Larry Prestenbach, Patricia Talbert, Belinda Lee, Donna Mitchell, Vivian Albert Overbay, Bernadette Patin, Rafael Moreno, Mary Price, Cora Louque, Rhonda Parker, Octavia Raymond, Charles Quey, Debby Jones, Joseph Stelly, Robert Woodward, Joyce Martinez, Dennis Tisdale, Inda Tisdale, Louis Malbrough, Wilfred Marcotte, Kevin Zamjahn, Thomas Mitchell, Doris Salamone, April Schexnaydre, Willis Percy, Joanne Paige, Peggy Zeringue, Eva Moffett, Bruce Luquette, Michael Mosley, Ramona Lindley, Valerie Vercher, Larry Kastner, Jack Norman Serpas, Castadera McGee, Stephanie Jones, Rosemary Swanner, Martha Overbay, Kent Charles, Samantha Williams, Dorothy Mendel, Robert Jones, Charles Daggs, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Summons AAI Dev Scvs INc, #2 Summons aaiPharma Inc, #3 Summons aaiPharma LLC, #4 Summons Brenn Distribution, #5 Summons Brenn Manufacturing, #6 Summons Covidien Inc, #7 Summons Covidien PLC, #8 Summons Eli Lilly and Company, #9 Summons Endo Pharm Holdings, #10 Summons Endo Pharm Inc, #11 Summons Generics Bidco I LLC, #12 Severance Order Generics Bidco II LLC, #13 Summons Generics Intl US Parent, #14 Summons Generics Intl US Inc, #15 Summons Mallinckrodt Inc, #16 Summons Mylan Pharm Inc, #17 Summons Mylan Inc, #18 Complaint Neosan Pharm Inc, #19 Summons Propst Dist, #20 Summons Qualitest Pharm, #21 Summons Teva Biopharm, #22 Summons Teva Pharm USA, #23 Summons Vintage Pharm Inc, #24 Summons Vintage Pharm LLC, #25 Summons Watson Pharm Inc, #26 Summons Xanodyne, #27 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dugan, James) Modified on 11/21/2011 to edit text (cab). [Transferred from laed on 12/7/2011.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Vercher
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Petrie
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Jones
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castadera McGee
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvina Otillio
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Quey
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Woodward
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfred Marcotte
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Stevens
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Petrie
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Tisdale
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavia Raymond
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cora Louque
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Sapia
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Roussell
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willis Percy
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Williams
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Salamone
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary Swanner
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Mendel
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Prestenbach
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Loftin
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Matthews
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Veronica Washington
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Orgeron
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Mancuso
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine LeBoeuf
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Kendrick
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Swible
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marin Vaughn
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audrey Percy
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Zeringue
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Woodridge
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Sapia
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Morales
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Millet
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Parker
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Orgeron
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill Sawyer
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Taylor
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Paige
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bessie Littleton
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Major
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marshall Vaughn
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Salamone
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Mitchell
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance Broussard, Sr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William D. Mitchell
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Juge
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andreas Borer
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Simmons
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Schexnaydre, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramona Lindley
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Moffett
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Serpas
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Overbay
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Kastner
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ridgie Louque
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Charles
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Orfanello
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Stewart
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Woodward
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robbie Maas, Sr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Stelly
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armand Mataya, Sr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Swible, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Daggs, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daisy Valle
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Lee
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Malbrough
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Mitchell
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Moreno
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Stewart, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Price, Sr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edith Williams
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Zeringue
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Tisdale
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Zamjahn
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Young
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita Kastner
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois Tate
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michell Vogel
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Mosley
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Jones
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Price
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Talbert
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Lofton
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Stewart
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynne Wilhelm
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judas Littleton
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Schexnaydre
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debby Jones
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Williamson
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Lee, Sr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Norman Serpas
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Zamjahn
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Martinez
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadette Patin
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Stelly
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Quey
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred Young
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Luquette
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Vercher
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda McGee
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geraldine Marcotte
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Rodrigue
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vivian Albert Overbay
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Luquette
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Quick
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Jones
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlene Rodrigue
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mytrice Perry
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobbie Sue Pierce
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janette Savoie
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Morales
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Martinez, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Woodridge
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Mataya
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne Salvant
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Swanner
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Parker
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Romair
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan McMullen
Represented By: Douglas Robert Plymale
Represented By: Frank Jacob D'Amico, Jr.
Represented By: Reed Gillmor Bowman
Represented By: James R. Dugan, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel B. Passaretti-Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Biopharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generics International (US PARENT), Inc.
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel B. Passaretti-Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aaiPharma Inc
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Represented By: Russell Stanfield Sayre
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Chad R. Ziepfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generics International (US), Inc.
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel B. Passaretti-Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NeoSan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Represented By: Russell Stanfield Sayre
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Chad R. Ziepfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generics Bidco I, LLC
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel B. Passaretti-Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanodyne Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly Lewis Beck
Represented By: Joseph P. Thomas
Represented By: Joshua A. Klarfeld
Represented By: Gina M. Saelinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien Inc.
Represented By: Deborah A. Moeller
Represented By: Bryan T. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AAI Development Services, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Represented By: Russell Stanfield Sayre
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Chad R. Ziepfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: P. Edward Pratt
Represented By: Sam B. Blair, Jr.
Represented By: Summer H. McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley A. Matta
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Represented By: James A. Comodeca
Represented By: Colin Hugh Lindsay
Represented By: Emily Jane Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: aaiPharma LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J. Pieczonka
Represented By: Russell Stanfield Sayre
Represented By: Ryan Christian Edwards
Represented By: Chad R. Ziepfel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenn Manufacturing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Victoria D. Lockard
Represented By: Lori G. Cohen
Represented By: Jose A. Isasi, II
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel B. Passaretti-Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah A. Moeller
Represented By: Bryan T. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Covidien PLC
Represented By: Deborah A. Moeller
Represented By: Bryan T. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generics Bidco II, LLC
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel B. Passaretti-Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Represented By: Audra Jae Ferguson-Allen
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Adamson
Represented By: Mary Nold Larimore
Represented By: Dominique C. Price
Represented By: Kimberly C. Metzger
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Represented By: Charles H. Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenn Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Steven Cheffo
Represented By: Rachel B. Passaretti-Wu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Bradley A. Matta
Represented By: Clem C. Trischler
Represented By: James A. Comodeca
Represented By: Colin Hugh Lindsay
Represented By: Emily Jane Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Propst Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?