Coleman et al v. Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees Featured Case

Plaintiff: Charlie Coleman, John P. Roth, Jr. and Erik Hermes
Defendant: Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees
Case Number: 2:2012cv00030
Filed: February 1, 2012
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Covington Office
County: Campbell
Presiding Judge: David L. Bunning
Referring Judge: J. Gregory Wehrman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2012 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: re MOTION to Dismiss by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees (ECO)
May 4, 2012 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re MOTION to Dismiss by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees filed by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Hawkins, Michael)
May 4, 2012 19 REPLY to 11 Motion to Dismiss, 16 Response in Opposition Defendant's Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Mando, Jeffrey) Modified text on 5/7/2012 (ECO).
April 20, 2012 18 Featured Case VIRTUAL ORDER granting 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees, Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees. Defendants shall file their Reply to Plaintiffs Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss not later than 5/4/2012. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 04/20/2012.(TED)cc: COR
April 17, 2012 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman for review: re 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees, Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees (LST)
April 17, 2012 17 MOTION for Extension of Time by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees, Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees Motions referred to J. Gregory Wehrman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Michael)
April 9, 2012 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Brandon Voelker re 16 Response in Opposition to Motion; Error: Exhibit was filed together with the Response instead of as separate attachment. Entry by Attorney; Correction: Clerk added the exhibit as separate attachment. In the future, file each exhibit separately from one another and separate from the main document. No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (TED)
April 6, 2012 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re MOTION to Dismiss by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees, 11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees filed by Charlie Coleman, Erik Hermes. (Voelker, Brandon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2012: # 1 Exhibit Kentucky Public Library Trustee Manual 2009) (TED).
March 23, 2012 15 Featured Case VIRTUAL ORDER; 1)granting 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by their response; 2)Pla's response to be filed by 4/6/2012; 3)Defs replies to be filed by 4/23/2012. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 3/23/2012.(LST)cc: COR
March 23, 2012 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge David L. Bunning for review: re 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Charlie Coleman, Erik Hermes (LST)
March 22, 2012 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Charlie Coleman, Erik Hermes Motions referred to J. Gregory Wehrman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Agreed Order for Extension of Time)(Voelker, Brandon)
March 5, 2012 Motions Taken Under Advisement: MOTION for Order by Garth Kuhnhein (ECO)
March 2, 2012 13 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/2/2012 before Judge David L. Bunning: 1) Pltf's motions for order for Defts to excrow payments are stayed pending adjudication of the pending motions to dismiss filed herein; 2) Pltf's motion for order to bar ex-parte contact 6 filed in 2:12-cv-30-DLB-JGW is denied as withdrawn by counsel for Pltf; 3) Pltfs shall have up to and including 3/23/2012 to file their response to Motion to Dismiss 11 . Defts' reply shall be filed by 4/6/2012 at which time the motions shall stand submitted; 4) The parties having no objections, 2: 12-cv-30-DLB-JGW and 2:12-cv-35-DLB-JGW are hereby consolidated for all purposes. Case No. 2:12-cv-30-DLB-JGW is herby designated the LEAD ACTION and all further filings shall use that case caption and be docketed therein. No further filings shall be made in case no. 2:12-cv-35-DLB-JGW. (Court Reporter LISA WIESMAN.) (ECO)cc: COR
February 23, 2012 MOTION to Dismiss by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees Filed as part of Member Case # 2:12-cv-35. (ECO)
February 23, 2012 12 NOTICE OF FILING by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mando, Jeffrey)
February 23, 2012 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO JEFFREY MANDO re 11 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees ; Attorney failed to submit a proposed order as an electronic attachment to the motion. Entry by attorney. Within 7 calendar days, prepare a pleading entitled "Notice of Filing" (with a certificate of service), file the Notice using the event "Notice of Filing", attach the proposed order and create a link to the related docket entry. cc: COR (TED)
February 22, 2012 11 MOTION to Dismiss with memorandum in support for failure to state a claim by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees (Mando, Jeffrey) Modified to add memo in support on 2/23/2012 (TED). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2012: # 1 Proposed Order) (ECO).
February 22, 2012 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 MOTION for Order to Bar Ex-Parte Contacts and the Reckless Expenditure of Funds Owed as Refunds to make said contact by Charlie Coleman, Erik Hermes, John P. Roth, Jr filed by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Cincinnati Enquirer Article)(Mando, Jeffrey)
February 22, 2012 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re MOTION for Order by Charlie Coleman, Erik Hermes, John P. Roth, Jr filed by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Resolution Authorizing Library District, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Asst Atty Gen Carter)(Mando, Jeffrey)
February 16, 2012 8 Featured Case ORDER; 1)The PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE originally set for 3/6/2012 is advanced to 3/2/2012 at 10:00 AM in COVINGTON before Judge David L. Bunning. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/16/2012.(LST)cc: COR
February 14, 2012 7 Featured Case ORDER; 1)A PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE is set for 3/6/2012 at 11:00 AM in COVINGTON before Judge David L. Bunning; 2)In advance of the conference, parties to confer and discuss whether consolidation of the two cases is warranted. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/14/2012.(LST)cc: COR
February 10, 2012 6 MOTION for Order to Bar Ex-Parte Contacts and the Reckless Expenditure of Funds Owed as Refunds to make said contact by Charlie Coleman, Erik Hermes, John P. Roth, Jr Motions referred to J. Gregory Wehrman. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order Granting)(Voelker, Brandon) Modified to better describe on 2/13/2012 (LST).
February 2, 2012 5 Featured Case ORDER: It is ordered that on or before February 22, 2012 Defendants shall file an Answer or other responsive pleading as well as a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Order of Escrow. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/2/2012.(TED)cc: COR
February 1, 2012 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge David L. Bunning for review: re MOTION for Order by Charlie Coleman, Erik Hermes, John P. Roth, Jr (LST)
February 1, 2012 Conflict Check run. (LST)
February 1, 2012 4 Featured Case STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court.. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(LST)cc: COR
February 1, 2012 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees. (LST)
February 1, 2012 MOTION for Order Requiring Escros by Charlie Coleman, Erik Hermes, John P. Roth, Jr Filed as Part of State Court RecordMotions referred to J. Gregory Wehrman. (LST)
February 1, 2012 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE J. GREGORY WEHRMAN chosen by random selection to handle matters that may be referred in this case.. (LST)
February 1, 2012 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Campbell Circuit Court, case number 12-CI-89. ( Filing fee $350; receipt number 2255959), filed by Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 State Court Record Class Action Complaint, # 2 State Court Record Motion for Order Requiring Escrow, # 3 State Court Record Filing of Additional Legal Authority, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Case Assignment)(LST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlie Coleman
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John P. Roth, Jr.
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Hermes
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell County Public Library Board of Trustees
Represented By: Louis D. Kelly
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?