Kuhnhein v. Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees Featured Case
Plaintiff: Garth Kuhnhein
Defendant: Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees
Case Number: 2:2012cv00035
Filed: February 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Covington Office
County: Kenton
Presiding Judge: David L. Bunning
Presiding Judge: J. Gregory Wehrman
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2012 Filing 15 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR STATUS CONFERENCE held on 3/2/2012 before Judge David L. Bunning: 1) Plaintiff's motions for order for defendants to escrow payments are stayed pending adjudication of the pending motions to dismiss filed herein; 2) Plaintiff's motion for order to bar ex-parte contact 6 filed in 2:12-cv-30-DLB-JGW is denied as withdrawn by counsel for plaintiff; 3) Plaintifffs shall have up to and including March 23, 2012 to file their Response to motions to dismiss 11 and 13 . Defendants' reply shall be filed no later than April 6, 2012 at which time the motions shall stand submitted; 4) Parties having no objection, 2;12-cv-30-DLB-JGW and 2:12-cv-35-DLB-JGW are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a)(2). Case Number 2:12-cv-30-DLB-JGW is hereby designated the LEAD ACTION and all further filings shall use that case caption and shall be docketed therein. No further filings shall be made in Case Number 2:12-cv-35-DLB-JGW. (Court Reporter Lisa Wiesman.) (TED)cc: COR
March 2, 2012 Cases associated: Create association to 2:12-cv-00030-DLB-JGW. (ECO)
February 24, 2012 NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Michael Hawkins re 14 Response in Opposition to Motion; Error: Attachments were insufficiently described as "Exhibit 1", "Exhibit 2". Entry by attorney; Correction: Clerk renamed the attachments. Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect); Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required by counsel. cc: COR (TED)
February 23, 2012 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re MOTION for Order by Garth Kuhnhein filed by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Resolution dated 7/5/67, # 2 Exhibit 2-Letter 5/8/95 to Banks from Carter)(Hawkins, Michael) Modified text to describe exhibits on 2/24/2012 (TED).
February 23, 2012 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hawkins, Michael)
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 12 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Cori R. Stirling to appear pro hac vice for Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman on 2/17/2012. (TED)cc: COR, Cori Stirling w/copy of ECF Attorney Registration Form and ECF Mandatory Order Modified spelling error on 2/22/2012 (TED).
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: It is ordered that Preliminary STATUS CONFERENCE originally scheduled for March 6, 2012 is hereby advanced to 3/2/2012 at 10:00 AM in COVINGTON before Judge David L. Bunning. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/16/2012.(TED)cc: COR
February 15, 2012 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of MAGISTRATE WEHRMAN for review: re 10 MOTION for Cori R. Stirling to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 2269537) (TED)
February 15, 2012 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Cori R. Stirling re 10 MOTION for Cori R. Stirling to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 2269537). (TED)
February 15, 2012 Filing 10 MOTION for Cori R. Stirling to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees ( Filing fee $95; receipt number 2269537)Motions referred to J. Gregory Wehrman. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Cori Stirling, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Permission to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Hawkins, Michael)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is ordered that a Preliminary STATUS CONFERENCE is set for 3/6/2012 at 11:00 AM in COVINGTON before Judge David L. Bunning. In advance of the conference, the parties shall confer and discuss whether consolidation of the two cases is warranted. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/14/2012.(TED)cc: COR
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Magistrate Judge. It is ordered that the Magistrate Judge designation for this matter is hereby REASSIGNED to the Honorable J. Gregory Wehrman in accordance with paragraph 10 of General Order 10-14 governing civil and criminal magistrate judge case assignments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 2/10/2012.(TED)cc: COR
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: By agreement of parties, the Defendant Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees shall have up to and including 3/29/2012 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 2/10/2012.(TED)cc: COR
February 10, 2012 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Magistrate Smith for review: re 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees, Garth Kuhnhein (TED)
February 9, 2012 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation for Extension of Time To Respond to Complaint by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees, Garth Kuhnhein. (Hawkins, Michael)
February 6, 2012 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of JUDGE BUNNING for review: re MOTION for Order by Garth Kuhnhein (TED)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge David L. Bunning for all further proceedings. Judge William O. Bertelsman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 2/6/2012.(TED)cc: COR
February 2, 2012 Conflict Check run. (TED)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case will revert back to the undersigned to hold final pretrial conference and trial; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of Court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(TED)cc: COR
February 2, 2012 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees. (TED)
February 2, 2012 MOTION for Order Requiring Kenton County Library Board of Trustees to escrow all tax payments Received in Excess of $0.60 Per Thousand of Assessed Value by Garth Kuhnhein. Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. Filed as part of State Court Record. (TED)
February 2, 2012 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CANDACE J. SMITH chosen by random selection to handle matters that may be referred in this case. (TED)
February 2, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Kenton Circuit Court, Division No. 4, Case number 12-CI-178. ( Filing fee $350; receipt number 2257758), filed by Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees. (Attachments: # 1 State Court Record including Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Case Assignment)(TED) Modified text to describe state court record on 2/2/2012 (TED).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuhnhein v. Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garth Kuhnhein
Represented By: Brandon N. Voelker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenton County Public Library Board of Trustees
Represented By: Michael W. Hawkins
Represented By: Mary Ann Stewart
Represented By: Cori R. Stirling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?