Little v. Carl et al
Plaintiff: |
Timothy Ray Little |
Defendant: |
Sargeant Landrum, Sargeant Bell, Terry Carl, Kathy Boyle and John Doe |
Case Number: |
2:2013cv00154 |
Filed: |
August 21, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Covington Office |
County: |
Kenton |
Presiding Judge: |
PSO |
Presiding Judge: |
William O. Bertelsman |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 15, 2014 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Defs' motion for summary judgment 16 is GRANTED; 2) Plf's motion to request items/information 19 is DENIED; 3) A Judgment will enter concurrently herewith. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/15/2014.(ECO)cc: COR, cc mailed to Timothy Ray Little, Pro Se Pltf, at address on the docket sheet.
|
March 10, 2014 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: It is ordered 1) Claims against Terry Carl, Jailer, Kenton County Detention Center, individually and in his official capacity are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE and Terry Carl is dismissed as a party to this action; 2) Plf' ;s claims for monetary relief against the remaining named defendants, Boyle, Bell and Landrum in their official capacities are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; 3) Plf's claims against Boyle, Bell, and Landrum in their individual capacities shall procee d; 4) Clerk shall prepare documents for service on Boyle, Bell, Landrum; 5) Clerk shall prepare Service packet; 6) Clerk shall provide service packet to USMS in Covington, KY. 7) Service to be conducted by USMS Covington, KY; 8) Plf shall notify cler k of any change in mailing address, Court will disregard any correspondence sent directly to judge's chambers and plf shall include certificate of service. The court will disregard any notice or motion that does not include this certification. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 3/10/2014.(TED)cc: COR, Timothy Ray Little via U.S. Mail
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?