Winter, Jr. v. Wolnitzek et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert A. Winter, Jr. |
Defendant: |
Steven D. Wolnitzek, Janet L. Stumbo, Eddy Coleman, David P. Bowles, Diane E. Logsdon, Joyce King Jennings and Jimmy Shaffer |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00119 |
Filed: |
June 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky |
Office: |
Covington Office |
County: |
Kenton |
Presiding Judge: |
Candace J. Smith |
Presiding Judge: |
Amul R. Thapar |
Nature of Suit: |
Constitutional - State Statute |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 13, 2016 |
Filing
124
AMENDED MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: (1) The defendants motion for summary judgment, 92 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (2) The plaintiffs motion for summary judgment, 94 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. (3) The defenda nts are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing Canon 5(A)(1)(a). (4) The defendants are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing the portion of Canon 5(A)(1)(c) that prohibits judges and judicial candidates from mak[ing] speeches for or agai nst a political organization or candidate. (5) The defendants are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing the portion of Canon 5(A)(1)(d) that forbids a judge or judicial candidate to pay an assessment or make a contribution to a political organ ization or candidate. (6) The defendants are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing Canon 5(A)(4).(7) The defendants are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing those portions of Canon 5(B)(1)(c) that prohibit a judge or judicial candidate to make pledges, promises or commitments with respect to issues and that prohibit a judge or judicial candidate to make any misleading statements. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 5/13/2016.(TJZ)cc: COR
|
May 12, 2016 |
Filing
122
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Defendants' motion for summary judgment 92 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. 2) Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment 94 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. 3) Defendants are < b> PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing Canon 5(A)(1)(a). 4) The defendants are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing the portionof Canon 5(A)(1)(c) that prohibits judges and judicial candidates frommak[ing] speeches for or against a poli tical organization or candidate.5) The defendants are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing the portionof Canon 5(A)(1)(d) that forbids a judge or judicial candidate to pay anassessment or make a contribution to a political organization or can didate.6) The defendants are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing Canon5(A)(4). 7) The defendants are PERMANENTLY ENJOINED from enforcing thoseportions of Canon 5(A)(1)(c) that prohibit a judge or judicial candidate to make pledges, promises or commitments with respect to issues and that prohibit a judge or judicial candidate to make any misleading statements. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 5/12/2016.(TJZ)cc: COR
|
October 29, 2014 |
Filing
60
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: The Court GRANTS the temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction 46 . The order and injunction prohibit the enforcement of the Kentucky Code of Judicial Conduct Canon 5(A)(1)(a) in its entirety and Canon 5(B)1)(c), as it relates to "misleading" speech. Signed by Judge Amul R. Thapar on 10/29/2014.(TJZ)cc: COR
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?