Doe v. Northern Kentucky University et al
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Defendant: Northern Kentucky University, Geoffrey S, Mearns, Les Kachurek, Kathleen Roberts and Ann James
Case Number: 2:2016cv00028
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Office: Covington Office
County: Campbell
Presiding Judge: William O. Bertelsman
Presiding Judge: Candace J. Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 317 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) Kachurek's Motion for Summary Judgment 164 is GRANTED; 2) Plf's Motion to disregard matters first raised in a reply brief 214 is DENIED; 3) Because this opinion removes the final pending claims against Kachurek, Kachurek's Motion in Limine 228 will be stricken as moot. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 8/2/2017.(ECO)cc: COR
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 293 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) That the defamation claim against the defendant Kachurek be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 2) The Title IX retaliation claim against defendant Kachurek remains pending, and the parties should be prepared to argue its merits at the hearing set for 8/1/2017. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 7/18/2017.(TJZ)cc: COR
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 244 OPINION AND ORDER: That the motions to recuse and to stay ( 202 , 203 , 206 ) be, and are hereby, DENIED. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/2/2017.(ECO)cc: COR
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 198 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1) NKU's motion for summary judgment 165 is DENIED; 2) Plf's motion to strike NKU's motion for summary judgment 169 is DENIED AS MOOT; and 3) The motion for summary judgment by Def Kachurek 164 continues UNDER ADVISEMENT. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/6/2017.(ECO)cc: COR
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: 1. Defendants' NKU, Mearns, Roberts, and James' motion to dismiss Counts II and V 82 be, and is hereby GRANTED, and said Counts are now dismissed as to those defendants. Count V remains pending as to De fendant Kachurek; 2. Section 1983 and common law claims against defendant Northern Kentucky University, be, and are hereby, DISMISSED as barred by the Eleventh Amendment. It is noted that Title IX claims remain; 3. Count VII of the FAC is dism issed as to the moving defendants, but remains pending as to defendant Kachurek; 4. The state defamation claim against defendant Kachurek (Count VI) remains, pending further orders of the Court; and 5. Count VIII seeking punitive damages against all defendants be, and is hereby DISMISSED, except for the punitive damages sought in the defamation claim against defendant Kachurek. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 11/03/2016.(KRB)cc: COR
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: 1. The Motion to intervene 72 & 90 be, and are hereby GRANTED, for the purposes described above; 2. The Motions for a gag order and to seal 53 & 54 be, and are hereby, DENIED As to the motion to sea l, this denial is without prejudice; 3. On or before Monday, October 24, 2016, the parties shall tender to the Court a proposed order regarding the production of student records, as discussed above. If the parties fail to do so, or if the Or der is insufficient, the Court will enter its own order; 4. Plaintiff's motion to compel 71 and motion for sanctions 70 be, and are hereby, GRANTED. Within thirty (30) days, plaintiffs counsel shall submit a motion for fees and costs , accompanied by an appropriate affidavit and documentation; 5. Defendants motion for partial summary judgment 26 be, and is hereby, GRANTED, and Count II of the Amended Complaint be, and is hereby, DISMISSED; and 6. Plaintiff's motion to modify subpoena 98 be, and is hereby, GRANTED. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/24/2016.(KRB)cc: COR
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Northern Kentucky University et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Kevin L. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Kentucky University
Represented By: Katherine M. Coleman
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey S, Mearns
Represented By: Katherine M. Coleman
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Les Kachurek
Represented By: Katherine M. Coleman
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Roberts
Represented By: Katherine M. Coleman
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann James
Represented By: Katherine M. Coleman
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?