Michaels v. Grant County Animal Shelter et al

Plaintiff: Patricia Michaels
Defendant: Stephen Wood, Kathleen Ritzi, Grant County Animal Shelter and Grant County
Case Number: 2:2018cv00121
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: Kentucky Eastern District Court
Office: Covington Office
County: Grant
0 Judge: David L Bunning
1 Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2018 9 REPLY to #8 RESPONSE TO PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood. (Salsburey, Joshua)
August 2, 2018 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood filed by Patricia Michaels. (Bucher, Anthony)
July 31, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER: that the Motion for Extension of Time #6 is granted. Defendants shall have up to and including twenty-one (21) days after the Court has entered a ruling on Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss #5 within which to answer or otherwise respond to any remaining claims in Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 07/31/2018. (KRB)cc: COR Modified text on 8/2/2018 (KRB).
July 23, 2018 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Salsburey, Joshua)
July 23, 2018 5 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter, Kathleen Ritzi, Kathleen Ritzi, Stephen Wood, Stephen Wood (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1-Counts to be Dismissed Against Each Defendant, #2 Proposed Order)(Salsburey, Joshua)
July 16, 2018 4 Featured Case STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
July 16, 2018 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
July 16, 2018 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grant County, Grant County Animal Shelter. (ECO)
July 16, 2018 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Grant County Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-00194. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4120306), filed by Grant County Animal Shelter, Grant County, Stephen Wood individually, Stephen Wood officially, Kathleen Ritziindividually, Kathleen Ritzi officially. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Record, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michaels v. Grant County Animal Shelter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Michaels
Represented By: Anthony J. Bucher
Represented By: Barbara D. Bonar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Wood
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Ritzi
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant County Animal Shelter
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant County
Represented By: Lyndol Scott Miller
Represented By: Joshua Michael Salsburey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?