USA v. Pinales

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Karen R. Pinales
Case Number: 2:2018cv00169
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
0 Judge: David L Bunning
1 Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR SHOW CAUSE HEARING held on 11/8/2018 before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith: 1) Respondent's oral motion for extension of time is GRANTED. Respondent shall provide materials to Revenue Officer by 12/10/2018. 2) United States to file a Status Report by 12/21/2018. 3) Clerk to mail a copy of minute entry to respondent. (Tape #KYED-COV_2-18-cv-169-DLB-CJS_20181108_101922.) (TJZ)cc: COR, Karen Pinales via US Mail
October 9, 2018 Filing 5 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN by USM. (TJZ)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Respondent Karen R. Pinales shall appear on 11/8/2018 at 10:30 a.m. to SHOW CAUSE why she should not be compelled to testify and produce the records demanded in the Petition to Enforce. 2) Respondent shall file a statement of any and all written objections no later than 11/1/2018. 3) The USM shall personally serve the respondent a copy of this order and the Petition and exhibits by 10/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/25/2018.(TJZ)cc: COR, USM w/Petition & Exhibits
September 18, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons (ECO)
September 18, 2018 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Declaration of RO Todd Malton, #2 Exhibit B-IRS Summons, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 USM-285)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Pinales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Thomas Lee Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen R. Pinales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?