Johnson v. Deputy Tromos et al

Plaintiff: Lamont B. Johnson and Lamont Brandon Johnson
Defendant: Deputy Fritz, Deputy John Doe 2, Deputy Eibeck, Deputy Tromos, Deputy John Doe 1 and John Does
Case Number: 2:2018cv00176
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 CLERK'S VIRTUAL NOTICE TO Lamont Johnson re #5 Letter : In response to a request for the status of your case, a courtesy copy of the docket sheet in the above-styled case is enclosed. The docket sheet provides a timeline of the activity in your case with a list of filings in the case to date. cc: Lamont Johnson by US Mail (TJZ)
October 30, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Lamont Johnson, pro se (Attachments: #1 envelope postmarked 10-29-18) (TJZ)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1) Plaintiff Lamont Brandon Johnson's complaint in the above-styled action Johnson v. Deputy Tromos, et al., 2:18-cv-176-DLB (E.D. Ky. 2018), is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 2) The Clerk of the Court shall re-file Johnson's Complaint filed in this case (Doc. #1) as an Amended Complaint in Johnson v. Tromos, et al., 2:18-cv-153-DLB (E.D. Ky. 2018). 3) Johnson's claims will proceed in Johnson v. Tromos, et al., 2:18-153-DLB (E.D. Ky. 2018), and Johnson is directed to make all future filings related to this matter in that action. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 10/12/2018.(ECO)cc: COR w/copy of Order mailed to Lamont Brandon Johnson, pro se, at address listed on the docket sheet.
October 9, 2018 Filing 3 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Caption page) Lamont Johnson Via US Mail(KRB)
October 4, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #1 Complaint (KRB)
October 4, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KRB)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED)., filed by Lamont B. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Various Attachments, #2 Envelope Post Marked 10-3-18)(KRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Deputy Tromos et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Fritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Eibeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Tromos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Brandon Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?