Blanchet v. Charter Communications, (DE) INC.
Plaintiff: Kelly Blanchet
Defendant: Charter Communications, (DE) INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00188
Filed: November 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101et
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: Clerk's Note (ECO)
January 3, 2019 Clerk's Note: Defendant Charter Communications, (DE) Inc.: identifies themselves as Charter Communications, Inc. re #11 Answer to Complaint, #12 Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCP 7.1, (ECO)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Charter Communications, (DE) INC.. (Craig, Robert)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Charter Communications, (DE) INC..(Craig, Robert)
December 27, 2018 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Linda Smith Agent on 12/12/2018, filed by Kelly Blanchet. (Croskery, Robert)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Charter Communications, (DE) INC.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF FILING by Kelly Blanchet re #1 Complaint Notice of Filing Request for Service of Summons (Attachments: #1 Summons Request for Summons)(Croskery, Robert)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 VIRTUAL ORDER: granting #4 MOTION for Robert F. Croskery to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Kelly Blanchet, the requirements of Joint Local Rule 83.2 having been satisfied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/27/2018. (KRB)cc: COR
November 27, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #6 RESPONSE to #4 MOTION for Robert F. Croskery to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Blanchet ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4208396) re: #5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (ECO)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 , #5 Supplement to Motion to Admit Robert F. Croskery Kentucky Bar 86204 Pro Hac Vice filed by Kelly Blanchet. (Croskery, Robert)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: that the Motion for Robert F. Croskery's Admission Pro Hac Vice #4 is hereby taken under advisement, pending counsel filing by not later than November 26, 2018, a supplement providing the necessary additional information.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 11/15/2018. (KRB)cc: COR Modified text on 11/15/2018 (KRB).
November 6, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #4 MOTION for Robert F. Croskery to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Blanchet ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4208396) (ECO)
November 6, 2018 BAR STATUS Check completed as to Robert F. Croskery re #4 MOTION for Robert F. Croskery to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Blanchet ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4208396). (ECO)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Robert F. Croskery to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kelly Blanchet ( Filing fee $125; receipt number 0643-4208396)Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order)(Croskery, Robert)
November 6, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KRB)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Mag. Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case to revert back to undersigned to hold final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge to conduct all pretrial/status conferences and rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine to be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial also to be before the undersigned. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/18/2010.(KRB)cc: COR
November 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4208188), filed by Kelly Blanchet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1. Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit 2. Notice of Rights)(KRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchet v. Charter Communications, (DE) INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Blanchet
Represented By: Robert F. Croskery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Communications, (DE) INC.
Represented By: Robert B. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?