Pelfrey v. Club Chef, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Pelfrey
Defendant: Grace Ho and Club Chef, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv00202
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacqueline Pelfrey. All Defendants. (Keyser, Gregory)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 REDACTION to #1 Complaint, Exhibit A by Jacqueline Pelfrey. (Keyser, Gregory)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: That plaintiff shall file properly redacted copies of the attachments to the complaint #1 on or before December 14, 2018. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 12/6/2018.(ECO)cc: COR
December 6, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jacqueline Pelfrey. (Keyser, Gregory)
December 5, 2018 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of District Judge William O. Bertelsman for review: #1 Complaint, Clerk's Note (KRB)
December 5, 2018 Clerk's Note: re #1 Complaint: Clerk sealed Exhibit A as it has personal/confidential information about Plaintiff and submitted to Chambers (KRB)
December 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Mag. Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Case to revert back to undersigned to hold final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge to conduct all pretrial/status conferences and rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine to be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial also to be before the undersigned. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/18/2010.(KRB)cc: COR
December 5, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KRB)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (NO PROCESS REQUESTED). ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4232034), filed by Jacqueline Pelfrey. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KRB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2018: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B. EEOC Notice of Rights) (KRB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2018: #5 REDACTED Ex. A-EEOC Document) (ECO).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pelfrey v. Club Chef, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grace Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Club Chef, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Pelfrey
Represented By: Gregory A. Keyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?