Stratman v. Gubser

Plaintiff: James Stratman
Defendant: Scott Gubser
Case Number: 2:2018cv00209
Filed: December 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Defendant's motion for extension of time #13 is granted. Defendant shall have up to 3/1/2019 within which to answer or other plead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 2/6/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
February 6, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Scott Gubser (TJZ)
February 5, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #13 DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME filed by James Stratman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion)(Pugh, Benjamin)
February 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Scott Gubser Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mando, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James Stratman via Certified Mail to (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Certified Mail Return for Scott Gubser)(Pugh, Benjamin)
January 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #11 Summons Returned Executed was an INCOMPLETE PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the corrected Summons Returned Executed within seven (7) calendar days. *(ta)* cc: COR (TJZ)
January 14, 2019 Filing 11 STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD: Incomplete Document Pursuant to Notice of Action Striking Document filed on 1/15/2019. (TJZ).
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Scott Gubser; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (TJZ)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING by James Stratman re #7 Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 Summons for Scott Gubser)(Roach, Christopher)
January 7, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 1/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith: Counsel will be filing an amended complaint. (Tape #KYED-COV_2-18-cv-209-WOB-CJS-20190107_112522.) (TJZ)cc: COR
January 7, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by James Stratman.(Roach, Christopher)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE set for 1/7/2019 at 11:30 AM in COVINGTON before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith. Counsel shall connect 5 minutes before the conference is scheduled to begin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 1/4/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
January 2, 2019 Clerk's Note: re #5 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Per chambers case reassigned to CJS. (TJZ)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(TJZ)cc: COR
December 27, 2018 Conflict Check run. (TJZ)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Scott Gubser; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (TJZ)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4247965), filed by James Stratman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(TJZ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stratman v. Gubser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Stratman
Represented By: Christopher D. Roach
Represented By: Benjamin T.D. Pugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Gubser
Represented By: Jeffrey C. Mando
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?