Campbell v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Laura E. Campbell
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00011
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: That the call of this matter at Docket Call scheduled for Wednesday, April 10, 2019 at 1:00 p.m., be, and hereby is, cancelled and reset for DOCKET CALL ON WEDNESDAY, MAY 8, 2019 AT 1:00 P.M. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 3/21/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
March 21, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Susan Johnson on 02/20/19, filed by Laura E. Campbell. (Turner, James)
March 19, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: DOCKET CALL set for 4/10/2019 at 01:00 PM in COVINGTON before Judge William O. Bertelsman. (ECO)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: That said DOCKET CALL be, and hereby is, set for WEDNESDAY, APRIL 10, 2019 AT 1:00 PM, to be held at the United States Courthouse, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky in the 5th Floor Courtroom. The parties shall confer and file a proposed scheduling order at least three (3) days before docket call. Counsel must attend the docket call in person and be sufficiently familiar with the case to answer any inquires the Court may have. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 3/19/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
March 19, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for First Supplemental FRCP 26(A)(1) Initial Disclosures and Plaintiff's Answers to Interrogatories and Responses to Requests for Production by Laura E. Campbell.(Turner, James)
March 13, 2019 Filing 14 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company.. (Cetrulo, Robert)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Robert Cetrulo. #9 Answer to Amended Complaint has been filed by Allstate Property & Casualty Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (ECO)
March 12, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for FRCP 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Laura E. Campbell by Laura E. Campbell.(Turner, James)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for FRCP 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Cetrulo, Robert)
March 11, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (ECO)
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cetrulo, Robert)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company.(Cetrulo, Robert)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Laura E. Campbell.(Turner, James)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: That plaintiff file a Second Amended Complaint correcting these deficiencies within five (5) business days from entry of this Order. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 2/12/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
February 11, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Laura E. Campbell.(Turner, James)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: That plaintiff file an Amended Complaint correcting these deficiencies within five (5) business days from entry of this Order. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 2/11/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
February 8, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4281003), filed by Laura E. Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons -Allstate)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura E. Campbell
Represented By: James Ryan Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert B. Cetrulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?