Brewer v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gary Brewer
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00015
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: 1) Within 21 days counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f) to discuss the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case and to develop a proposed case management plan. 2) At the time of the meeting, counsel for the parties shall determine whether action is exempt from the Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1)(B)(i). If the action is not exempt, the parties shall make the required disclosures within the time frame required by the Rules and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3) Within 10 days after the meeting, the parties shall file a joint status report containing:(a) the identity of each participant and the party each participant represents in this action; (b) the parties views and proposals required by Rule 26(f), where applicable; (c) whether settlement is a possibility; (d) whether the parties agree as to the exact nature of this action under "ERISA, 29 U.S.C. 1001; (e) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary tofile the administrative record and other relevant plan documents; (f) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary to join other parties and to amend the pleadings; (g) whether the parties agree concerning discovery beyond that contained in the administrative record or information submittedduring the administrative appeals process; (h) the length of time counsel reasonably believe will be necessary to file dispositive motions; (i) whether the parties agree as to the applicable standard of review they believe should be applied by this Court; (j) whether the parties desire a scheduling conference before entry of a scheduling order; (k) identify any other additional issues the parties believe are unique to this action; (l) whether the parties will consent to the jurisdiction of the presiding Magistrate Judge (Smith) for all further proceedings. 4) Should the parties find that a joint report is not possible, the parties shall each file individual reports. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 4/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 MJ Consent Form)(TJZ)cc: COR
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Gary Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - SSA Notice of Award)(Hagerman, Bartley)
February 22, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge David L. Bunning for review: #6 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (LST)
February 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gary Brewer by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Wallace, Chad)
February 21, 2019 NOTICE OF FEE REFUND APPROVED re #5 Request for Fee Refund ; the fee transaction involving Receipt No. 0643-4286800 having been erroneously paid, the Clerk APPROVES the refund by processing a credit through the electronic credit card system. The credit refund transaction in the amount of $ 400.00 was successfully completed on 2/11/2019 at 11:34:19 AM cc: COR (LST)
February 15, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Finance for review: #5 Request for Fee Refund (ECO)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR FEE REFUND TO CREDIT CARD by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (ECO) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/20/2019) (SKV).
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR
February 15, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Mutual of Omaha Insurance Company for United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.. (ECO)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pendleton Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-00004. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4286849), filed by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Record - Ex. A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-LTD Policy, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Record, #4 Exhibit D- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Chad E. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Brewer
Represented By: Bartley K. Hagerman
Represented By: Philip G. Fairbanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?