Little v. Carl et al

Plaintiff: Timothy Ray Little
Defendant: Terry Carl, Hopple Rae Grisby, Kittle, Deputy (ies) Unknown, Grisby, Rae and Hopple
Case Number: 2:2019cv00018
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: P SO
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Terry Carl, Grisby, Hopple, Rae,. Summons issued and delivered to U.S. Marshal with a completed USM-285 form and service packet for each defendant to be served. (ECO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2019: #1 USMS Summons Time Stamped) (ECO).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: 1. Little's claims against Defendant Deputy Kittle are DISMISSED without prejudice. 2. A Deputy Clerk shall prepare four Service Packets for service upon Defendants Jailer Terry Carl, Colonel/Captain Grigsby, Sergeant Hopple, and Sergeant Rae. The Service Packets shall include: a. a completed summons form; b. Little's operative complaint #8 ; c. a copy of this Order; and d. a completed USM Form 285. 3. The Deputy Clerk shall send the Service Packets to the United States Marshals Service (USMS) in Lexington, Kentucky, and shall note the date of delivery in the docket. 4. The USMS shall personally serve a Service Packet upon Defendants Jailer Terry Carl, Colonel/Captain Grigsby, Sergeant Hopple, and Sergeant Rae at the Kenton County Detention Center, 3000 Decker Crane Lane, Covington, Kentucky, 41017, through arrangement with the Kenton County Detention Center. 5. Within 21 after being served with the summons and complaint, the defendants must answer or otherwise respond to Little's complaint. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. 6. Little must immediately advise the Clerk's Office of any change in his current mailing address. If Little fails to do so, the Court will dismiss his case. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/16/2019.(ECO)cc: COR w/copy of Order mailed to Timothy Ray Little, pro se, at address listed on the docket sheet.
April 5, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #8 Amended Complaint re #6 Order (ECO)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Terry Carl, Deputy (ies) Unknown, Grisby, Hopple, Rae, filed by Timothy Ray Little. (Attachments: #1 Various Attachments, #2 Envelope post marked 4/2/2019)(ECO)
March 22, 2019 Filing 7 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Pro Se Caption Page)(KRB)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) The Clerk of the Court shall send Little another Court-approved civil rights complaint form, also known as the E.D. Ky. 520 Form. 2) Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Little must fully complete the E.D. Ky. 520 Form and file it with this Court. Little must complete the entire form and, in doing so, he must fully describe the facts of his case; identify the people, dates, places, and actions which are relevant to his claims; explain specifically what each defendant did or failed to do to cause him harm; and explain exactly what he wants the Court to do. It is important for Little to complete the E.D. Ky. 520 Form in its entirety because that completed form will replace his first submission #2 for all purposes. 3) If Little fails to complete and file the E.D. Ky. 520 Form within 30 days from the entry of this latest Order, the Court will dismiss his case. See Local Rule 5.2(b). 4) Finally, Little must also keep the Clerk of the Court informed of his current mailing address. Failure to notify the Clerk of any address change may result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 3/22/2019.(ECO)cc: COR w/copy of Order and EDKY 520 Form mailed to Timothy Ray Little, pro se, at address listed on the docket sheet.
March 18, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #5 Letter from Tim Little (ECO)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Tim Little, pro se (Attachments: #1 Envelope post-marked 3/15/19) (ECO)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: 1) Little's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #1 is GRANTED. Payment of the $50.00 administrative fee is WAIVED. However, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), Little must pay the $350.00 filing fee in the manner set forth below. 2) Payment of the initial partial filing fee is WAIVED. 3) The Clerk of the Court shall open an account in Little's name for receipt of the filing fee. The Clerk shall complete a Notice of Payment Form [E.D. Ky. 525 Form] with (a) Little's name, (b) his inmate registration number, and (c) this case number. The Clerk shall then send a copy of this Order and the Notice of Payment Form to the Warden of the institution in which Little is currently confined. 4) Little's custodian shall send the Clerk of this Court a payment each month out of Little's inmate trust fund account. This payment should be in an amount equal to 20% of Little's income from the preceding month; that said, the custodian shall only send a monthly payment if the amount in Little's account exceeds $10.00. Ultimately, the custodian shall continue the monthly payments until Little's entire $350.00 filing fee is paid. See 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). 5) The Clerk of the Court shall send Little a Court-approved civil rights complaint form, also known as the E.D. Ky. 520 Form. 6) Within 30 days from the entry of this Order, Little must fully complete the E.D. Ky.520 Form and file it with this Court. Little must complete the entire form and, in doing so, he must fully describe the facts of his case; identify the people, dates, places, and actions which are relevant to his claims; explain specifically what each defendant did or failed to do to cause him harm; and explain exactly what he wants the Court to do. It is important for Little to complete the E.D. Ky. 520 Form in its entirety because that completed form will replace his first submission #2 for all purposes. 7) If Little fails to complete and file the E.D. Ky. 520 Form within 30 days from the entry of this Order, the Court will dismiss his case. See Local Rule 5.2(b). 8) Finally, Little must also keep the Clerk of the Court informed of his current mailing address. Failure to notify the Clerk of any address change may result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 3/11/2019.(ECO)cc: COR w/copy of Order and E.D.Ky. 520 Form to Timothy Ray Little, pro se, at address listed on the docket sheet; Copy of Order and E.D. Ky. 525 Form to Jailer/Warden, Grant County Detention Center 212 Barnes Road, Williamstown, KY 41097.
February 19, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: #2 Complaint, #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Ray Little (KRB)
February 19, 2019 Conflict Check run. (KRB)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT, filed by Timothy Ray Little. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Various Attachments, #3 Envelope No Post Mark)(KRB)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Ray Little Motions referred to P SO. (KRB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Little v. Carl et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Carl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopple Rae Grisby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy (ies) Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grisby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Ray Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?