USA v. Stoeckinger

Petitioner: USA
Respondent: John Stoeckinger
Case Number: 2:2019cv00022
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David L Bunning
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: 1. Matter is dismissed and stricken from the Court's docket. The Show cause hearing scheduled for April 18, 2019 at 10:30am is cancelled. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 4/17/2019.(LST)cc: COR, Respondent via U.S. Mail
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by USA and Notice of Compliance (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gentry, Thomas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 USM 285 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN re #1 Petition and #4 Order served to Respondent on March 5, 2017 at 14:30pm (LST)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER; 1)Respondent John Stoeckinger shall appear before the undersigned, third floor Magistrate Judges Courtroom of the U.S. District Courthouse, Eastern District of Kentucky, 35 West Fifth Street, Covington, Kentucky, on April 18, 2019, at 10:30 a.m. TO SHOW CAUSE why he should not be compelled to testify and produce the records demanded in the Internal Revenue Service summons as set forth in the Petition to Enforce. 2)Respondent shall file any statement of all written objections or reasons the Court should not grant the Petition by no later than April 8, 2019. 3)The United States Marshal shall personally serve upon Respondent a copy of this Order, together with a copy of the Petition to Enforce and exhibits thereto, by March 18, 2019.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 3/4/2019.(LST)cc: COR, USM w/Petition & exhibits and USM 285
February 26, 2019 Conflict Check run. (LST)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER; 1)Case referred to Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, case will revert back to undersigned to hold the final pretrial conference and trial; 2)Mag. Judge authorized to conduct all pretrial/status conferences, to hold hearings as may be required and to rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred to the undersigned. Final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Mag. Judge; 3)Discovery disputes to be resolved in following manner: (1)Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2)If unable to resolve disputes, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreement by telephone conference w/Mag. Judge; 3)If still unable to resolve their disputes, they may file appropriate written motions with the court. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011(LST)cc: COR
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Todd Malton, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Proposed Order)(LST)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Stoeckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Stoeckinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: USA
Represented By: Thomas Lee Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?