Sweeney et al v. Crigler et al

Plaintiff: Kyle Hugenberg, Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky, John Kyle Sweeney, Cristi Kendrick and John Hicks
Defendant: Marilyn Howard, Dwight Sears, Emily Shelton, Michael Helmig, George Russell, Albert B. Chandler, III, Justin Crigler, Alison Lundergan Grimes, Andrew Beshear, Jared Dearing, Katrina Fitzgerald, Joshua Givens Branscum, Deanna Brangers, Sherry Rene Whitehouse and David L. Osborne
Case Number: 2:2019cv00046
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: William O Bertelsman
Referring Judge: Candace J Smith
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re #37 MOTION to modify consent order re #34 Order by Katrina Fitzgerald (ECO)
July 2, 2019 Filing 39 REPLY BRIEF to #37 filed by Katrina Fitzgerald. (Iaccarino, Carmine)
June 18, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #37 MOTION to modify consent order re #34 Order by Katrina Fitzgerald filed by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiest, Christopher) Modified text on 6/19/2019 (ECO).
June 13, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION to modify consent order re #34 Consent Order by Katrina Fitzgerald . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Iaccarino, Carmine) Modified text to take out referral language on 6/14/2019 (ECO).
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: The Court, being fully apprised, and for the reasons stated in Plaintiffs' Motion, hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend/Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 15 and 21 #35 . Jared Dearing is hereby dismissed from this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/6/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
June 4, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Amend/Correct by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky amending complaint to remove Jared Dearing as a Defendant in this matter, MOTION for Order by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky Under Rule 21 dismissing Jared Dearing as a Defendant in this matter. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wiest, Christopher) Modified text to take out referral language on 6/5/2019 (ECO).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CONSENT ORDER: 1. The Board Member Defendants have been duly served as of April 17, 2019, this Court has jurisdiction over this matter and these Board Member Defendants, and venue is proper. 2. The Board Member Defendants do not wish to further answer, defend or otherwise participate in these proceedings, or the defense of 2019 HB 114 or 2019 SB 60, and Plaintiffs agree they need not do so. 3. The Board Defendants hereby withdraw their prior motions to dismiss #21 and to transfer venue #20 . 4. The Board Member Defendants agree to be bound by any final determinations of this Court, to be a party bound by any injunction(s) or declaratory relief that may be issued in this matter under FRCP 65, and to abide by any such orders or determinations. The Board Member Defendants will not be served with any further pleadings except any such injunctions or declaratory relief or other final orders, shall not serve any further memoranda in the litigation, and will otherwise be terminated as parties to this litigation. 5. The Plaintiffs and Board Member Defendants agree that the Plaintiffs will not seek 42 USC 1988 Attorney Fees or Costs from the Board Member Defendants, and will instead look solely to the Secretary of State and Defendant Dearing in this matter for such fees (or any intervening Defendants). Given that the Board Member Defendants are not participating any further in the defense of 2019 HB 114 or 2019 SB 60, it is equitable and appropriate that Defendants other than the Board Member Defendants be held liable for such fees, to the extent such fees are appropriate or awarded. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/31/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: The following procedure be used to address discovery disputes: 1) Parties shall first meet in good faith and attempt to resolve discovery disputes between themselves; 2) If the parties are unable to resolve a dispute after conferring directly, they shall call the undersigneds chambers to schedule a telephone conference; 3) If, and only if, the parties are unable to resolve their discovery impasse after telephone conference, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/30/2019.(TJZ)cc: COR
May 29, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re #32 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation as to State Board Defendants (except Defendant Dearing) by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, David L. Os (ECO)
May 29, 2019 Filing 32 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation as to State Board Defendants (except Defendant Dearing) by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky, Sherry Rene Whitehouse. (Wiest, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING ORDER: Deadline to submit any agreed stipulations of fact/law: June 28, 2019; Discovery cutoff: August 2, 2019; Deadline for dispositive motions: August 16, 2019; Response due: September 6, 2019; Reply due: September 20, 2019; Summary Judgment/Bench Trial/Permanent Injunction Hearing: At the convenience of the Court, in October/November, 2019IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/28/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
May 28, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re #30 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation as to schedule by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Ann Cormican, Jared Dearing, Katrina Fitzgerald, Joshua Gilpin, Alison Lundergan Grimes, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Ke (ECO)
May 24, 2019 Filing 30 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation as to schedule by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Ann Cormican, Jared Dearing, Katrina Fitzgerald, Joshua Gilpin, Alison Lundergan Grimes, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky, Sherry Rene Whitehouse. (Wiest, Christopher)
May 23, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jared Dearing (ECO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jared Dearing filed by Jared Dearing. (Iaccarino, Carmine)
May 22, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Katrina Fitzgerald, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, Sherry Rene Whitehouse (ECO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Katrina Fitzgerald, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, Sherry Rene Whitehouse filed by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Katrina Fitzgerald, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, Sherry Rene Whitehouse. (Scutchfield, Jennifer)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AGREED ORDER: By agreement of the parties, the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order on or before May 24, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED this 21st day of May, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 5/21/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
May 20, 2019 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #25 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by all parties regarding extension of scheduling order in light of primary election held next week by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Ann Cormican, Justin Crigler, Jared Dearin (ECO)
May 17, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Katrina Fitzgerald, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, Sherry Rene Whitehouse filed by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky. (Wiest, Christopher)
May 17, 2019 Filing 25 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by all parties regarding extension of scheduling order in light of primary election held next week by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Ann Cormican, Justin Crigler, Jared Dearing, Katrina Fitzgerald, Joshua Gilpin, Alison Lundergan Grimes, Michael Helmig, John Hicks, Marilyn Howard, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, Emily Shelton, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky, Sherry Rene Whitehouse. (Wiest, Christopher)
May 9, 2019 Filing 24 MINUTE ENTRY ORDER FOR MOTION HEARING held on 5/9/2019 before Judge William O. Bertelsman: Parties present as noted. IT IS ORDERED that: (1) defendants' motions to change venue ( #15 , #20 ) be, and are hereby, DENIED; and (2) the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order on or before May 17, 2019. (Court Reporter JOAN AVERDICK.) Signed by William O. Bertelsman. (ECO)cc: COR, cc Atty Jennifer Scutchfield. Modified text on 5/9/2019 (ECO).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S EMERGENCY MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #13 : 1) Defendant shall process the statements of candidacy that were filed by Plaintiffs on or before April 1, 2019, for the 2019 election cycle. 2) Defendants shall likewise process the certificates of nomination and filing fees of Plaintiffs that are filed on or before June 4, 2019, for the 2019 election cycle, and place Plaintiffs that make this filing on the General Election Ballot (or, to the extent this order is entered within ten days of the June 4, 2019 deadline or after that deadline, Defendants shall accept and process such filings made within ten days of this order); 3) Pursuant to FRCP 65, this Preliminary Injunction shall be binding upon the official capacity Defendants, and their officers, agents, servants, employees, and attorneys, and on other persons who are in active concert or participation with anyone described in FRCP 65(d)(2)(A) or (B); and 4) This is a final order under FRCP 54(b), and there is no just reason for delay. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/8/2019. (ECO)cc: COR, cc mailed to Attorney Scutchfield, App pending. Modified on 5/9/2019 (ECO).
May 8, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky filed by Jared Dearing. (Iaccarino, Carmine)
May 8, 2019 Clerk's Note: re #21 MOTION to Dismiss. Counsel verified with Clerk that the memorandum to the Motion to Dismiss pages are incorrectly numbered as 1,3,etc. and that the memorandum is a complete document. (ECO)
May 8, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Katrina Fitzgerald, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, Sherry Rene Whitehouse (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(ECO)
May 8, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Albert B. Chandler, III, Katrina Fitzgerald, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, Sherry Rene Whitehouse (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(ECO)
May 8, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #14 Defendant Dearing's Motion to Dismiss filed by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wiest, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE to #15 Defendant Dearing's Motion for Transfer of Venue filed by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Declaration of Cristi Kendrick, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Transfer)(Wiest, Christopher)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: That a HEARING on this motion #13 is set for 5/9/2019 at 9:15 AM in COVINGTON. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 5/7/2019.(ECO)cc: COR Modified underline on 5/7/2019 (ECO).
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alison Lundergan Grimes.(Salomon, Jonathan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Change Venue by Jared Dearing (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Iaccarino, Carmine)
May 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for failure to state a claim by Jared Dearing (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Iaccarino, Carmine)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky , EMERGENCY MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky . (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Cristi Kendrick, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Declaration of John Hicks, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - certified 2019 HB 114, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - certified 2019 SB 60, #6 Proposed Order)(Wiest, Christopher) Modified text on 5/7/2019 (ECO).
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Albert B. Chandler, III; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky of Proposed Summons to Albert B. Chandler, III (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons)(Wiest, Christopher)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT ORDER: 1. The County Defendants have been duly served as of April 16, 2019, this Court has jurisdiction over this matter and these County Defendants, and venue is proper. 2. The County Defendants do not wish to answer, defend or otherwise participate in these proceedings, or the defense of 2019 HB 114 or 2019 SB 60, and Plaintiffs agree they need not do so. 3. The County Defendants agree to be bound by any final determinations of this Court,to be a party bound by any injunction(s) or declaratory relief that may be issued in this matter under FRCP 65, and to abide by any such orders or determinations. The County Defendants will not be served with any further pleadings except any such injunctions or declaratory relief or other final orders and will otherwise be terminated as parties to this litigation.4. The Plaintiffs and County Defendants agree that the Plaintiffs will not seek 42 USC 1988 Attorney Fees or Costs from the County Defendants, and will instead look solely to the other Defendants in this matter for such fees (and/or any intervening Defendants). Given that the County Defendants are not participating in the defense of 2019 HB 114 or 2019 SB 60, it is equitable and appropriate that Defendants other than the County Defendants be held liable for such fees, to the extent such fees are appropriate or awarded. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 4/24/2019.(ECO)cc: COR
April 22, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re #9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Consent Order with County Defendants by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky (TJZ)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation Consent Order with County Defendants by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky. (Wiest, Christopher)
April 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alison Lundergan Grimes. (Salomon, Jonathan)
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Hugenberg, Ann Cormican, John Kyle Sweeney, John Hicks, Joshua Gilpin, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky, Cristi Kendrick via Personal/Certified Mail, RRR to Andrew Beshear served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; Deanna Brangers served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; Joshua Givens Branscum served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; Albert B. Chandler, III served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; Jared Dearing served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; Katrina Fitzgerald served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; Alison Lundergan Grimes served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; David L. Osborne served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; George Russell served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; Dwight Sears served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019; Sherry Rene Whitehouse served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. (Wiest, Christopher)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kyle Hugenberg, Ann Cormican, John Kyle Sweeney, John Hicks, Joshua Gilpin, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky, Cristi Kendrick via Personal/Certified Mail, RRR to Justin Crigler served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019; Michael Helmig served on 4/15/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; Marilyn Howard served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019; Emily Shelton served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019. (Wiest, Christopher)
April 17, 2019 ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: #5 Stipulation, (ECO)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION as to service and extension of time to answer between Plaintiffs and Secretary Grimes by Ann Cormican, Joshua Gilpin, John Hicks, Kyle Hugenberg, Cristi Kendrick, John Kyle Sweeney, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky. (Wiest, Christopher)
April 11, 2019 Conflict Check run. (ECO)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings as required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010.(ECO)cc: COR
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Deanna Brangers, Joshua Givens Branscum, Justin Crigler, Jared Dearing, Katrina Fitzgerald, Alison Lundergan Grimes, Michael Helmig, Marilyn Howard, David L. Osborne, George Russell, Dwight Sears, Emily Shelton, Sherry Rene Whitehouse; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (ECO)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4332545), filed by Kyle Hugenberg1, Ann Cormican, John Kyle Sweeney, John Hicks, Joshua Gilpin, The Libertarian Party of Kentucky, Cristi Kendrick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Letter from SOS, #2 Exhibit B-2019 HB 114, #3 Exhibit C-2019 SB 60, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons Proposed)(ECO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sweeney et al v. Crigler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Howard
Represented By: Robert D. Neace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Sears
Represented By: Jennifer S. Scutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emily Shelton
Represented By: Robert D. Neace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Helmig
Represented By: Robert D. Neace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Russell
Represented By: Jennifer S. Scutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert B. Chandler, III
Represented By: Jennifer S. Scutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Crigler
Represented By: Robert D. Neace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alison Lundergan Grimes
Represented By: Jonathan T. Salomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Beshear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Dearing
Represented By: Carmine G. Iaccarino
Represented By: Jared L. Downs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Fitzgerald
Represented By: Jennifer S. Scutchfield
Represented By: Carmine G. Iaccarino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Givens Branscum
Represented By: Jennifer S. Scutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Brangers
Represented By: Jennifer S. Scutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Rene Whitehouse
Represented By: Jennifer S. Scutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L. Osborne
Represented By: Jennifer S. Scutchfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Hugenberg
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Cormican
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Gilpin
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Libertarian Party of Kentucky
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kyle Sweeney
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristi Kendrick
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hicks
Represented By: Robert A. Winter, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher David Wiest
Represented By: Thomas B. Bruns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?